This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 15:35:56 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE VALERIY ALBOROV LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE VALERIY ALBOROV LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH M. QUINN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4235

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOSEPH M. QUINN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEREZOVSKAYA, SVETLANA

Other

VALERIY ALBOROV LIVING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KALLER, JAMES LANCE

344 Thomas L. Berkley Way, #220B

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

SUBSEQUENT PROBATE PETITION

PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND TRUST ASSETS FILED BY PETITIONER BEREZOVSKAYA, SVETLANA AS TO TRUSTOR VALERIY ALBOROV LIVING HEARING SET FOR MAY-04-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): Petition For Order Confirming Successor Trustee And Trust Assets; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: JOSEPH M. QUINN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialPayment : PETN AND OPP RE INTERNAL AFFAIRS OF 17200 TRUST; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2221224P005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND TRUST ASSETS FILED BY PETITIONER BEREZOVSKAYA, SVETLANA AS TO TRUSTOR VALERIY ALBOROV LIVING HEARING SET FOR MAY-04-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4235
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE VALERIY ALBOROV LIVING TRUST
Court Date:MAY-04-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Confirming Successor Trustee And Trust Assets
Rulings: Continued to 6/15/2021.1) 30 days' notice must be given on the mandatory judicial council form DE-115. Matter continued for proper notice.2) Whenever an instrument written in a foreign language is attached as an exhibit to a pleading, it must always be accompanied by a copy translated into English. All translations must be accompanied by a declaration setting forth the translator's qualifications and/or credentials. [LRSF 14.15 D.]3) Please file evidence showing the accounts not listed on schedule a were in existence prior to execution of the trust on 03/30/2018.An endorsed-filed single sided hard copy of all documents filed in response to these notes, as well as any other documents required must be received by this Examiner in room 202 no later than 4 pm on 6/1/2021 [LRSF 14.7 B.]


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaller, James Lance