This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/30/2018 at 15:37:23 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K. STEWART. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2250

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K. STEWART

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MORTORANA, DIANE

MARTORANA, ANTHONY

Other

THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAMAR, HILARY LOUISE

Attorney at WEINTRAUB GENSHLEA CHEDIAK TOBIN & TOBIN

475 Sansome St., Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

SUBSEQUENT PROBATE PETITION

PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS (PROBATE CODE SECTION 850(A)(3)) FILED BY PETITIONER MARTORANA, ANTHONY MORTORANA, DIANE AS TO TRUSTOR THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D 3/28/12 HEARING SET FOR DEC-17-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketPayment : PETN AND OPP RE INTERNAL AFFAIRS OF 17200 TRUST; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2518925P009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS (PROBATE CODE SECTION 850(A)(3)) FILED BY PETITIONER MARTORANA, ANTHONY MORTORANA, DIANE AS TO TRUSTOR THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D 3/28/12 HEARING SET FOR DEC-17-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:$450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******2250
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D TRUST
Court Date:JUN-10-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets (Probate Code Section 850(A)(3))
Rulings:hearing. appearance required for the court to determine whether the petition can go forward notwithstanding the failure to file proof of service for the remaining heir.


Case Number:*******2250
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D TRUST
Court Date:MAY-13-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets (Probate Code Section 850(A)(3))
Rulings:hearing. appearance required for the Court to determine whether to dispense with proper proof of service of notice to the one heir in Germany who did not sign a Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt.


Case Number:*******2250
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D TRUST
Court Date:APR-15-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets (Probate Code Section 850(A)(3))
Rulings:continued to may 13, 2019 as no additional proof of service filed. an appearance will be required on that date to discuss taking the petition off calendar unless the proof of service is filed by noon on may 6, 2019.


Case Number:*******2250
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D TRUST
Court Date:MAR-11-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets (Probate Code Section 850(A)(3))
Rulings:continued to april 15, 2019. as noted in prior tentative rulings and examiner notes, notice was not proper. new deadline for filing proof of proper service in order to avoid an automatic continuance is noon on wednesday, april 10, 2019.


Case Number:*******2250
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D TRUST
Court Date:FEB-11-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets (Probate Code Section 850(A)(3))
Rulings:continued to march 11, 2019 (first available date). still no proof of proper service on file. new deadline for filing the POS in order to avoid an automatic continuance is monday, march 4, 2019.


Case Number:*******2250
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D TRUST
Court Date:JAN-28-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets (Probate Code Section 850(A)(3))
Rulings:continued to february 11, 2019 at counsel's request.


Case Number:*******2250
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE THE GERTRUD RESCHELEIT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D TRUST
Court Date:DEC-17-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets (Probate Code Section 850(A)(3))
Rulings:continued to january 28, 2019 for proper notice. examiner notes emailed to counsel on 12/12/18 at 10:00 a.m.