This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/28/2016 at 02:01:45 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE NELSON KOBAYASHI ET AL TRUST

Case Summary

On 02/25/2015 IN THE MATTER OF THE NELSON KOBAYASHI TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8559

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Trustee

KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

Others

KOBAYASHI, NELSON

KOBAYASHI, MIYUKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Trustee Attorney

LAM, RICHARD C.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD LAM

961 Ygnacio Valley Road

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING MODIFICATION OF TRUST TERMS

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT (TRANSACTION ID # 57594592) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT (TRANSACTION ID # 57594592) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT (TRANSACTION ID # 57594592) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

Consents and Waiver of Notice on Petition

CONSENTS AND WAIVER OF NOTICE ON PETITION (TRANSACTION ID # 57545095) FILED BY PETITIONER KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

Notice of Hearing- Decedents Estate or Trust

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 57545095) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

Declaration of Nelson Kobayashi

DECLARATION OF NELSON KOBAYASHI (TRANSACTION ID # 57319059) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

Notice of Hearing

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 57313427) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

SUBSEQUENT PROBATE PETITION

PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING MODIFICATION OF TRUST TERMS FILED BY PETITIONER KOBAYSAHI, NELSON AS TO TRUSTOR KOBAYASHI, NELSON KOBAYASHI, MIYUKI HEARING SET FOR MAY-26-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING MODIFICATION OF TRUST TERMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING MODIFICATION OF TRUST TERMS, CALENDAR OF AUG-04-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT (TRANSACTION ID # 57594592) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT (TRANSACTION ID # 57594592) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT (TRANSACTION ID # 57594592) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENTS AND WAIVER OF NOTICE ON PETITION (TRANSACTION ID # 57545095) FILED BY PETITIONER KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 57545095) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING MODIFICATION OF TRUST TERMS CONTINUED FROM JUL-01-2015 TO AUG-04-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING MODIFICATION OF TRUST TERMS CONTINUED FROM JUN-09-2015 TO JUL-01-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NELSON KOBAYASHI (TRANSACTION ID # 57319059) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 57313427) FILED BY TRUSTEE KOBAYSAHI, NELSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING MODIFICATION OF TRUST TERMS CONTINUED FROM MAY-26-2015 TO JUN-09-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING MODIFICATION OF TRUST TERMS FILED BY PETITIONER KOBAYSAHI, NELSON AS TO TRUSTOR KOBAYASHI, NELSON KOBAYASHI, MIYUKI HEARING SET FOR MAY-26-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8559
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE NELSON KOBAYASHI ET AL TRUST
Court Date:AUG-04-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Approving Modification Of Trust Terms
Rulings:grant without hearing


Case Number:*******8559
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE NELSON KOBAYASHI ET AL TRUST
Court Date:JUN-09-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Approving Modification Of Trust Terms
Rulings:continued to July 1, 2015 at Counsel's request.


Case Number:*******8559
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE NELSON KOBAYASHI ET AL TRUST
Court Date:MAY-26-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Approving Modification Of Trust Terms
Rulings:continued to June 9, 2015 to allow time for the examiner to complete her review. Notes will be sent to Counsel Friday, May 22, 2015. Response will be due by Thursday, June 4, 2015.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAM, RICHARD C