This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 11:06:54 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/21/2012 IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDREW Y. S. CHENG, PAUL H. ALVARADO, PETER J. BUSCH, LILLIAN K. SING, JOHN K. STEWART, ANDREW Y.S. CHENG, MARY E. WISS and JOHN DEARMAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6344

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

ANDREW Y. S. CHENG

PAUL H. ALVARADO

PETER J. BUSCH

LILLIAN K. SING

JOHN K. STEWART

ANDREW Y.S. CHENG

MARY E. WISS

JOHN DEARMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Others

FOOTE, BETTY L.

San Francisco, CA 94109

DOLCH, DEBRA J.

BRANDON, MARJORIE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST

100 North Point, Apt. 908

San Francisco, CA 94109

BRANDON, MARJORIE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST 100 NORTH POINT, APT.

FOOTE, BETTY L. 1000 NORTH POINT APT.

Others and Petitioners

PHILADELPHIA INSURANCE COMPANIES

2300 Clayton Road, Ste. 1330

Concord, CA 94420

FOOTE, BETTY L.

San Francisco, CA 94109

BRANDON, MARJORIE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST

100 North Point, Apt. 908

San Francisco, CA 94109

BRANDON, MARJORIE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST 100 NORTH POINT, APT.

PHILADELPHIA INSURANCE COMPANIES 2300 CLAYTON ROAD, STE.

FOOTE, BETTY L. 1000 NORTH POINT APT.

Petitioner and Trustee

DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Trustee Attorneys

DE VRIES, LIZABETH N.

Attorney at SCOTT LAW FIRM

100 Pine St, #1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

JONAS, CHARLES ALFRED

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES A. JONAS

351 California Street, 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Petitioner and Other Attorney

JONAS, CHARLES ALFRED

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES A. JONAS

351 California Street, 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 64630414): DE VRIES, LIZABETH N. SUBSTITUTED FOR DE VRIES, LIZABETH N. AS ATTORNEY FOR DOLCH, DEBRA J. DOLCH, DEBRA J.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 64630414): DE VRIES, LIZABETH N. SUBSTITUTED FOR DE VRIES, LIZABETH N. AS ATTORNEY FOR DOLCH, DEBRA J. DOLCH, DEBRA J.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 63293964) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 63293964) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

JUDICIAL COUNCIL SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT FORMS IN SUPPORT OF THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED ON OCTOBER 1, 2018: (1) START-OF-ACCOUNT DATE JUNE 1, 2016 TO DATE OF DEATH (DECEMBER 14, 2016) AND 2 - DATE OF DEATH (DECEMBER 15,

JUDICIAL COUNCIL SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT FORMS IN SUPPORT OF THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED ON OCTOBER 1, 2018: (1) START-OF-ACCOUNT DATE JUNE 1, 2016 TO DATE OF DEATH (DECEMBER 14, 2016) AND 2 - DATE OF DEATH (DECEMBER 15, 2016) TO END OF ACCOUNT DATE (JULY 31, 2018) (TRANSACTION ID # 63214362) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 63186297) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 63186297) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

FIRST AMENDMENT TO THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ORDERS (1) SETTLING AND ALLOWING ACCOUNT; (2) APPROVING AND CONFIRMING ALL ACTS OF TRUSTEE; (3) AWARDING TRUSTEES AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND AUTHORIZING REIMBURSE

FIRST AMENDMENT TO THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ORDERS (1) SETTLING AND ALLOWING ACCOUNT; (2) APPROVING AND CONFIRMING ALL ACTS OF TRUSTEE; (3) AWARDING TRUSTEES AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND AUTHORIZING REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS ADVANCED; (4) AUTHORIZING ESTABLISHMENT OF RESERVE; (5) DETERMINING BENEFICIARIES AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION; (6) REDUCING BOND; AND (7) REMOVING TRUST FROM CONTINUING COURT SUPERVISION (TRANSACTION ID # 63186297) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Declaration of Trustee in Support of Trustees Third and Final Report a

DECLARATION OF TRUSTEE IN SUPPORT OF TRUSTEES THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT; ETC. RE COIN COLLECTION RETAINED IN RESERVE AND REQUEST FOR REDUCTION OF AMOUNT OF TRUSTEES BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 63159901) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ACCOUNT SCHEDULES (3 FORMATS) IN SUPPORT OF THIRD

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ACCOUNT SCHEDULES (3 FORMATS) IN SUPPORT OF THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ORDERS (1) SETTLING AND ALLOWING ACCOUNT; (2) APPROVING AND CONFIRMING ALL ACTS OF TRUSTEE; (3) AWARDING TRUSTEES AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND AUTHORIZING REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS ADVANCED; (4) AUTHORIZING ESTABLISHMENT OF RESERVE; (5) DETERMINING BENEFICIARIES AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION; (6) REDUCING BOND; AND (7) REMOVING TRUST FROM CONTINUING COURT SUPERVISION FILED ON 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 62957880) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

START-OF-ACCOUNT TO DATE-OF-DEATH ACCOUNT SCHEDULES IN SUPPORT OF THIR

START-OF-ACCOUNT TO DATE-OF-DEATH ACCOUNT SCHEDULES IN SUPPORT OF THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ORDERS (1) SETTLING AND ALLOWING ACCOUNT; (2) APPROVING AND CONFIRMING ALL ACTS OF TRUSTEE; (3) AWARDING TRUSTEES AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND AUTHORIZING REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS ADVANCED; (4) AUTHORIZING ESTABLISHMENT OF RESERVE; (5) DETERMINING BENEFICIARIES AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION; (6) REDUCING BOND; AND (7) REMOVING TRUST FROM CONTINUING COURT SUPERVISION FILED ON (TRANSACTION ID # 62957880) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

DATE-OF-DEATH TO END-OF-ACCOUNT ACCOUNT SCHEDULES IN SUPPORT OF THIRD

DATE-OF-DEATH TO END-OF-ACCOUNT ACCOUNT SCHEDULES IN SUPPORT OF THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ORDERS (1) SETTLING AND ALLOWING ACCOUNT; (2) APPROVING AND CONFIRMING ALL ACTS OF TRUSTEE; (3) AWARDING TRUSTEES AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND AUTHORIZING REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS ADVANCED; (4) AUTHORIZING ESTABLISHMENT OF RESERVE; (5) DETERMINING BENEFICIARIES AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION; (6) REDUCING BOND; AND (7) REMOVING TRUST FROM CONTINUING COURT SUPERVISION FILED O (TRANSACTION ID # 62957880) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

ACCOUNT SCHEDULES IN SUPPORT OF THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF

ACCOUNT SCHEDULES IN SUPPORT OF THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ORDERS (1) SETTLING AND ALLOWING ACCOUNT, (2) APPROVING AND CONFIRMING ALL ACTS OF TRUSTEE, (3) AWARDING TRUSTEES AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND AUTHORIZING REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS ADVANCED, (4) AUTHORIZING ESTABLISHMENT OF RESERVE, (5) DETERMINING BENEFICIARIES AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION, (6) REDUCING BOND, AND (7) REMOVING TRUST FROM CONTINUING COURT SUPERVISION FILED ON 10-01-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 62957880) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Original End-of-Account Statements [End-of-Account Date - July 31, 201

ORIGINAL END-OF-ACCOUNT STATEMENTS [END-OF-ACCOUNT DATE - JULY 31, 2018] IN SUPPORT OF TRUSTEES THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT (TRANSACTION ID # 62939535) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Original End-of-Account Statements [Trustors Date-of-Death - December

ORIGINAL END-OF-ACCOUNT STATEMENTS [TRUSTORS DATE-OF-DEATH - DECEMBER 14, 2016] IN SUPPORT OF TRUSTEES THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT (TRANSACTION ID # 62939535) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Declaration of Retention of Original Date-of-Death and End-of-Account

DECLARATION OF RETENTION OF ORIGINAL DATE-OF-DEATH AND END-OF-ACCOUNT STATEMENTS IN SUPPORT OF TRUSTEES THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT (TRANSACTION ID # 62939535) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

NOTICE OF HEARING RE THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR T

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 62794858) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Verification of Lizabeth N. de Vries, Counsel for Petitioner, Trustee

VERIFICATION OF LIZABETH N. DE VRIES, COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER, TRUSTEE DEBRA J. DOLCH, OF THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ORDERS (1) SETTLING AND ALLOWING ACCOUNT; (2) APPROVING AND CONFIRMING ALL ACTS OF TRUSTEE; (3) AWARDING TRUSTEES AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND AUTHORIZING REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS ADVANCED; ETC. (TRANSACTION ID # 62512365) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Third and Final Report and Account of Successor Trustee and Petition f

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 62505479) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. HEARING SET FOR JAN-30-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 64630414): DE VRIES, LIZABETH N. SUBSTITUTED FOR DE VRIES, LIZABETH N. AS ATTORNEY FOR DOLCH, DEBRA J. DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 63293964) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES, CALENDAR OF MAY-21-2019, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • HearingMatter(s): ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES Off Calendar May-21-2019 Granted Per Written Order; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: PETER J. BUSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDICIAL COUNCIL SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT FORMS IN SUPPORT OF THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED ON OCTOBER 1, 2018: (1) START-OF-ACCOUNT DATE JUNE 1, 2016 TO DATE OF DEATH (DECEMBER 14, 2016) AND 2 - DATE OF DEATH (DECEMBER 15, 2016) TO END OF ACCOUNT DATE (JULY 31, 2018) (TRANSACTION ID # 63214362) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 63186297) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST AMENDMENT TO THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ORDERS (1) SETTLING AND ALLOWING ACCOUNT; (2) APPROVING AND CONFIRMING ALL ACTS OF TRUSTEE; (3) AWARDING TRUSTEES AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND AUTHORIZING REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS ADVANCED; (4) AUTHORIZING ESTABLISHMENT OF RESERVE; (5) DETERMINING BENEFICIARIES AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION; (6) REDUCING BOND; AND (7) REMOVING TRUST FROM CONTINUING COURT SUPERVISION (TRANSACTION ID # 63186297) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • HearingMatter(s): ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES Off Calendar Apr-16-2019 Continued To May-21-19 At 09:00 A.M. In Dept 204; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: PETER J. BUSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES CONTINUED FROM APR-16-2019 TO MAY-21-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
294 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[EX PARTE] ORDER FOR REMOVAL OF CURRENT TRUSTEE DUE TO INCAPACITY AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY SOLE SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF CURRENT TRUSTEE DUE TO INCAPACITY AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY SOLE SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE HEARD BY AND GRANTED BY JUDGE PETER J. BUSCH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • HearingMatter(s): Ex Parte Petition For Removal Of Current Trustee Due To Incapacity And For Appointment Of Temporary Sole Successor Trustee Off Calendar Jan-04-2013 Granted Per Written Order; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL FILING IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF CURRENT TRUSTEE DUE TO INCAPACITY AND FOR PPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY SOLE SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE RE: MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL ADMISSION RECORDS AND DOCTORS' NOTES (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • FinancialPayment: PROBATE EX PARTE; Amount: $60; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W2512C21P009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF CURRENT TRUSTEE DUE TO INCAPACITY AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY SOLE SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE REQUESTED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. HEARING SET FOR JAN-04-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202; Fee: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • FinancialPayment: PETN AND OPP RE INTERNAL AFFAIRS OF 17200 TRUST; Amount: $450; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W2512C21P008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR:(1) REMOVAL OF MARJORIE A. BRANDON AS TRUSTEE DUE TO INCAPACITY; (2) APPOINTMENT OF DEBRA DOLCH AS SOLE SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE; (3) CONTINUED COURT SUPERVISION; AND (4) APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE REFEREE FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. AS TO TRUSTOR BRANDON, MARJORIE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 16, 2007; HEARING SET FOR FEB-27-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204; Fee: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:FEB-27-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition For:(1) Removal Of Marjorie A. Brandon As Trustee Due To Incapacity; (2) Appointment Of Debra Dolch As Sole Successor Trustee; (3) Continued Court Supervision; And (4) Appointment Of Probate Referee
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:OCT-19-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 11/16/16. Examiner's Notes e-mailed on 10/17/16.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:APR-16-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 5/21/19 - No response to Issue 2 filed by deadline. Examiner notes that an amendment was required by Examiner's Notes; therefore, there will be a notice issue unless the amendment is filed (not just uploaded for filing) with time for 30 days' notice.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:MAR-13-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 4/16/19 - Notes sent 3/11/19


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:JAN-30-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 3/13/19. Please submit endorsed filed copies of all pleadings and a proposed order to Room 202 no later than 3/6/19.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:OCT-02-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:FUTURE ACCOUNTING
Rulings: OFF CALENDAR


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:SEP-18-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:FUTURE ACCOUNTING
Rulings: Hearing. Appearance required.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:AUG-07-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:FUTURE ACCOUNTING
Rulings: Continued to 9/18/18 at Counsel's request.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:DEC-06-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY (1333 Jones Street, #1003b, San Francisco, Ca 94109)
Rulings:Appearance required.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:JUL-03-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Authorizing And Directing Successor Trustee To Sell Real Property Of The Trust Located At 1333 Jones Street, No. 1003b, San Francisco, California, Including Related Parking Space [239 Shares Of The Comstock Apartment Corporation] And To Enter Into Exclusive Listing Agreement For The Sale Thereof
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:DEC-14-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Appearance required.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:NOV-30-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 12/14/16 for further review.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:NOV-16-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 11/30/16. Response to Examiner's Notes were not received at least 3 court days prior to hearing.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:SEP-27-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY (1333 Jones Street, T321, San Francisco, Ca 94109)
Rulings:hearing. appearance required. as any bidder must be a current shareholder of Comstock Apart. Corp., the Court expects Counsel to know who those persons are so she can confirm that the current bidders and any potential overbidders meet that requirement.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:JUN-19-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Authorizing And Directing Successor Trustee To Sell Real Property Of The Trust Located At 1358 Lincoln Ave., Calistoga, And To Enter Into Exclusive Listing Agreement.
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:SEP-20-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Second Account And Report
Rulings:Off calendar


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:AUG-30-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Second Account And Report
Rulings:Hearing.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:AUG-17-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:FUTURE ACCOUNTING
Rulings:Off calendar, status calendared for 8/30/16


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:AUG-16-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY (277 E. Alejo Road, #214, Palm Springs, Ca 92262)
Rulings:Hearing.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:AUG-09-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Second Account And Report
Rulings:Continued to 8/30/16 at request of counsel


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:JUL-26-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY (277 E. Alejo Road, #214, Palm Springs, Ca 92262)
Rulings:Hearing-Appearance required.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:MAY-31-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:FUTURE ACCOUNTING
Rulings:Continued to 8/17/16; court error in calendaring status hearing on filing of 2nd account for the period from 6/1/14 through 5/31/16.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:MAY-23-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Authorizing And Directing Successor Trustee To Sell Two Parcels Of Real Property Of The Trust Located At (1) 277 East Alejo, #214, Palm Springs, California [Apn: 009-600-545]; And (2) 1333 Jones Street, Apt. T321, San Francisco, California [35 Shares Of The Comstock Apartment Corporation]; And To Enter Into Exclusive Listing Agreements For The Sales Thereof
Rulings:Hearing.


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:NOV-18-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:NOV-04-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 11/18/14


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:OCT-14-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 11/4/14 - Courtesy copies received after deadline


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:JUN-30-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Sucessor Trustee'S First Account
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******6344
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARJORIE BRANDON TRUST
Court Date:MAY-21-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Grant without hearing


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Philadelphia Insurance Companies is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONAS, CHARLES ALFRED