This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/27/2016 at 08:06:33 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE MARGARET JANE CARTER TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/25/2014 IN THE MATTER OF THE MARGARET JANE CARTER TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7925

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Others

CRUZ, RUFINA S.

BARKDOLL, JUDITH M.

CARTER, MARGARET JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorney

LAMAR, HILARY LOUISE

 

Court Documents

TRUST ORDER

ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING-DECEDENTS ESTATE OR TRUST

NOTICE OF HEARING [AMENDED] (TRANSACTION ID # 55824444) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE CRUZ, RUFINA S. BARKDOLL, JUDITH M.

SUBSEQUENT PROBATE PETITION

PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED BY PETITIONER CRUZ, RUFINA S. BARKDOLL, JUDITH M. AS TO TRUSTOR CARTER, MARGARET JANE HEARING SET FOR SEP-03-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS, CALENDAR OF SEP-23-2014, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS CONTINUED FROM SEP-03-2014 TO SEP-23-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING [AMENDED] (TRANSACTION ID # 55824444) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE CRUZ, RUFINA S. BARKDOLL, JUDITH M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED BY PETITIONER CRUZ, RUFINA S. BARKDOLL, JUDITH M. AS TO TRUSTOR CARTER, MARGARET JANE HEARING SET FOR SEP-03-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7925
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE MARGARET JANE CARTER TRUST
Court Date:SEP-03-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Confirming Trust Assets
Rulings: Continued to 9/23/14. Notes sent.