This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/27/2016 at 08:37:57 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST

Case Summary

On 08/29/2014 IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8038

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Others and Conservatees

DER, ERNEST

THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST

CARRILLO, LUIS

DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Respondents and Others

NELSON, MARK

SANCHEZ, WILLIAM

Others, Trustees and Conservatees

RICHARDS-BROWN, DARIN

NELSON, MARK

SANCHEZ, WILLIAM

MARK NELSON DEVELOPMENT, LLC

CARRILLO, LUIS

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE

2999 Oak Road, Suite 820

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Others and Trustees

RICHARDS-BROWN, DARIN

DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Not Classified By Court

CAMERA, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other, Petitioner and Conservatee Attorneys

DER, ERNEST F

Attorney at SKOOTSKY & DER LLP

90 New Montgomery St., Ste 600

San Francisco, CA 94105

LAWLESS, MARIA ISABEL

Attorney at EVANS, LATHAM, HARRIS & CAMPISI

One Post St. #600

San Francisco, CA 94104

RASCH, NANCY DORIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF NANCY D. RASCH

165 South Park

San Francisco, CA 94107

Other and Respondent Attorneys

NELSON, DARYL ROSEMARY

Attorney at NELSON LAW FIRM

235 Moulton Street

San Francisco, CA 94123

SMITH, HAROLD PALMER

Attorney at SMITH LLP

469 9Th St #200

Oakland, CA 94607

FEDER, BRUCE ALLEN

685 Market Street Ste. 540

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other, Trustee and Conservatee Attorneys

NORMAN, WILLIAM HANSON

Attorney at COOPER, WHITE & COOPER LLP

201 California Street, 17Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

NELSON, DARYL ROSEMARY

Attorney at NELSON LAW FIRM

235 Moulton Street

San Francisco, CA 94123

SMITH, HAROLD PALMER

Attorney at SMITH LLP

469 9Th St #200

Oakland, CA 94607

FEDER, BRUCE ALLEN

685 Market Street Ste. 540

San Francisco, CA 94105

DER, ERNEST F

Attorney at SKOOTSKY & DER LLP

90 New Montgomery St., Ste 600

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other and Trustee Attorneys

NORMAN, WILLIAM HANSON

Attorney at COOPER, WHITE & COOPER LLP

201 California Street, 17Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

LAWLESS, MARIA ISABEL

Attorney at EVANS, LATHAM, HARRIS & CAMPISI

One Post St. #600

San Francisco, CA 94104

RASCH, NANCY DORIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF NANCY D. RASCH

165 South Park

San Francisco, CA 94107

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ASIANO, PHILIP LEONARD

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF PHILIP L. ASIANO P.C.

P.O. Box 121937

San Diego, CA 92112-1937

 

Court Documents

SUBSEQUENT PROBATE PETITION

PETITION TO REMOVE WILLIAM SANCHEZ, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO COMPEL AN ACCOUNTING AND TO APPOINT DEBRA J. DOLCH AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED BY PETITIONER THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST AS TO TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS HEARING SET FOR OCT-28-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

Ex Parte Petition to Suspend the Powers of William Sanchez, Successor Trustee, To Appoint Debra J. Dolch as Temporary Successor Trustee, and to Bring the Trust Under Court Supervision

EX PARTE PETITION TO SUSPEND THE POWERS OF WILLIAM SANCHEZ, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, TO APPOINT DEBRA J. DOLCH AS TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, AND TO BRING THE TRUST UNDER COURT SUPERVISION (TRANSACTION ID # 55965892) REQUESTED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS HEARING SET FOR SEP-09-2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:60.00)

Notice of Hearing-Petition to Remove William Sanchez, Successor Trustee, to Compel an Accounting, and to Appoint Debra J. Dolch as Successor Trustee

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 55969988) FILED BY PETITIONER CARRILLO, LUIS

Notice of Hearing Decedents Estate or Trust

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 55972946) FILED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS

Consent of Debra J. Dolch to Serve as Temporary Successor Trustee and Successor Trustee

CONSENT OF DEBRA J. DOLCH TO SERVE AS TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE (TRANSACTION ID # 55976187) FILED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS

Declaration By Ernest F. Der, Esq. Re: Notice

DECLARATION BY ERNEST F. DER, ESQ. RE: NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55979582) FILED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS

TRUST ORDER

EX PARTE ORDER SUSPENDING THE POWERS OF WILLIAM SANCHEZ. SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, AND APPOINTING DEBRA J. DOLCH AS TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, AND BRINGING THE TRUST UNDER COURT SUPERVISION

BOND

BOND #23222 IN THE AMOUNT OF $500,000.00 FILED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE

Ex Parte Application for Authority to Retain Litigation Counsel and for Approval of Fee Agreement

PROBATE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR AUTHORITY TO RETAIN LITIGATION COUNSEL AND FOR APPROVAL OF FEE AGREEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56059674) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J. (Fee:60.00)

Declaration of Attorney Re: Notice

DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE: NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56060333) FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

ORDER

ORDER FOR AUTHORITY TO RETAIN LITIGATION COUNSEL AND FOR APPROVAL OF FEE AGREEMENT

Ex Parte Application for Authority to Complete Assignment of Deed of Trust

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AUTHORITY TO COMPLETE ASSIGNMENT OF DEED OF TRUST (TRANSACTION ID # 56087462) REQUESTED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J. HEARING SET FOR OCT-01-2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:60.00)

Notice of hearing & Proof of service by mail

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 56091370) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

TRUST ORDER

EX PARTE GRANTING TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AUTHORITY TO COMPLETE ASSIGNMENT OF DEED OF TRUST

Petition To Compel Return Of Real Property To Trust, And For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Financial Elder Abuse, Conversion, And Imposition Of Constructive Trust

PETITION TO COMPEL RETURN OF REAL PROPERTY TO TRUST, AND FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE, CONVERSION, AND IMPOSITION OF CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST (TRANSACTION ID # 56158812) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. HEARING SET FOR DEC-17-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

Notice of Pendency of Action

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 56178805) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Notice of Association of Counsel

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 56182151): LAWLESS, MARIA ISABEL ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR DOLCH, DEBRA J.

Supplemental Declaration By Ernest F. Der, Esq., Court-Appointed Counsel, In Response to Examiners Notes Dated November 18, 2014

DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION BY ERNEST F. DER, ESQ., COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL, IN RESPONSE TO EXAMINERS NOTES DATED NOVEMBER 18, 2014 (TRANSACTION ID # 56393852) FILED BY PETITIONER CARRILLO, LUIS

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketFUTURE ACCOUNTING CONTINUED FROM MAR-08-2016 TO APR-05-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON FILING OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE'S FIRST ACCOUNT CONTINUED FROM MAR-08-2016 TO APR-05-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES CONTINUED FROM FEB-08-2016 TO APR-25-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 HEARING HELD - SEE MINI-MINUTES FOR THIS DATE. PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR FEB-08-2016 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RE: FEES FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FEES TO LITIGATION COUNSEL, CALENDAR OF FEB-01-2016, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FEES TO LITIGATION COUNSEL, CALENDAR OF FEB-01-2016, GRANTED SUBJECT TO WRITTEN ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR FEB-01-2016 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF HAROLD P. SMITH REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION (TRANSACTION ID # 58485566) FILED BY RESPONDENT SANCHEZ, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER [EX PARTE] APPROVING FEES AND COSTS TO COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL AND FOR DISCHARGE DUE TO DEATH OF SETTLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2014
  • DocketCOPYING FEES (2 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS (Fee:26.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • DocketEX PARTE PETITION TO SUSPEND THE POWERS OF WILLIAM SANCHEZ, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, TO APPOINT DEBRA J. DOLCH AS TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, AND TO BRING THE TRUST UNDER COURT SUPERVISION HEARD BY AND GRANTED BY JUDGE ANDREW Y.S. CHENG.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND #23222 IN THE AMOUNT OF $500,000.00 FILED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE ORDER SUSPENDING THE POWERS OF WILLIAM SANCHEZ. SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, AND APPOINTING DEBRA J. DOLCH AS TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, AND BRINGING THE TRUST UNDER COURT SUPERVISION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION BY ERNEST F. DER, ESQ. RE: NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55979582) FILED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT OF DEBRA J. DOLCH TO SERVE AS TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE (TRANSACTION ID # 55976187) FILED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 55972946) FILED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 55969988) FILED BY PETITIONER CARRILLO, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE PETITION TO SUSPEND THE POWERS OF WILLIAM SANCHEZ, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, TO APPOINT DEBRA J. DOLCH AS TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, AND TO BRING THE TRUST UNDER COURT SUPERVISION (TRANSACTION ID # 55965892) REQUESTED BY TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS HEARING SET FOR SEP-09-2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO REMOVE WILLIAM SANCHEZ, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO COMPEL AN ACCOUNTING AND TO APPOINT DEBRA J. DOLCH AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED BY PETITIONER THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST AS TO TRUSTOR CARRILLO, LUIS HEARING SET FOR OCT-28-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUL-23-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Allowance Of Compensation To Attorney
Rulings:grant without hearing. no objections filed.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:APR-09-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAR-26-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 4/9/19. Needs to be heard by Judge Busch, who is not taking the calendar on 3/26/19.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAR-04-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:FUTURE ACCOUNTING
Rulings:off calendar.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:FEB-19-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 3/26/19 - petitioner to amend petition so SNT conforms to California law.Endorsed-filed copies of all filings must be received in Room 202 no later than 3/19/19.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:FEB-05-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 2/19/19. If Petitioner decides to go forward as is, appearance will be required. If Petitioner decides to amend the Petition, please advise Examiner no later than 2/13/19.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:FEB-04-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 2/5/19 to be heard by Judge Busch.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JAN-14-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 2/4/19 - First review of 2d Amendment. Examiner needs more time for review of revised SNT terms and NY trustee.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:DEC-05-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 1/14/19 at request of counsel. Amendment will be filed in time to give 30 days' notice of the continued hearing date. Examiner must receive endorsed filed courtesy copies no later than 1/8/19.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:NOV-07-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 12/5/18 at request of counsel - still working on issue with CCSF Treasurer.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:SEP-26-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:SEP-12-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 9/26/18. Examiner unable to complete hearing notes by deadline. Notes will be completed and sent by 9/11/18.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:AUG-29-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 9/12/18 for further review and preparation of hearing notes.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:AUG-15-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 8/29/18 - notes will be sent 8/14/18


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:AUG-01-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 8/15/18 - matter inadvertently set on a day when examiner is not available for review


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUN-20-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 8/1/18 for notice of amended accounting.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAY-09-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:Continued to 6/20/18 - Notes emailed 5/7/18


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUL-17-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUL-03-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 7/17/17 - Notes emailed 6/29/17


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUN-05-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 7/3/17 at request of counsel


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAY-22-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 6/5/17 - No response to Issues 1 & 3 of Examiner's Notes emailed 5/4/17.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAY-08-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 5/22/17 - Notes emailed 5/4/17


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:APR-24-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 5/8/17 for filing of Amended Accounting.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAR-27-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 4/24/17 - Notes emailed 3/23/17


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:FEB-27-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 3/27/17 - Notes emailed 2/24/17. N.B. An amended accounting will be required once the beginning assets on hand have been established.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:FEB-06-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 2/27/17 - Notes emailed 2/2/17


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JAN-30-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 2/6/17 at request of counsel


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JAN-09-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 1/30/17 - Examiner will complete review after Judge Alvarado has signed the order re the Sanchez accounting


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:DEC-12-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 1/9/17 to be reviewed after Mr. Sanchez's accounting.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:DEC-05-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Short continuance to 12/12/16 for Examiner to finish review and hearing notes. Notes will be sent out no later than 12/6/16.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:NOV-07-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 11/21/16 - No response to Examiner's Notes emailed 9/29/16


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:OCT-03-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 11/7/16 - appearance will be required on that date


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:AUG-31-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:continued to october 3, 2016 skh for tv


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUL-27-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 8/31/16 - Notes emailed 7/25/16


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUL-13-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 7/27/16


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUN-29-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:continued to july 13, 2016. assigned examiner not available for review. skh for tv.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAY-09-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 6/8/16 - Notes emailed 5/5/16


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAY-04-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FIRST ACCOUNTING OF TRUSTEE
Rulings:Continued to 6/8/16 at request of counsel.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:APR-25-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 5/9/16 - declaration in response to examiner's notes filed after deadline.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:APR-05-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Successor Trustee'S First Account
Rulings:Off calendar


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAR-08-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:FUTURE ACCOUNTING
Rulings:continued to april 5, 2016 at counsel's request


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:FEB-08-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:FEB-01-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Approval Of Fees To Litigation Counsel
Rulings:Hearing-Appearance required.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:DEC-21-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 2/8/16 at request of counsel


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:NOV-23-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 12/21/15 - no response to Examiner's Notes emailed 11/5/15


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:OCT-26-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 11/9/15 - Notes emailed 10/22/15


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:SEP-29-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Compel Return Of Real Property To Trust, And For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Financial Elder Abuse, Conversion, And Imposition Of Constructive Trust
Rulings:Off calendar pursuant to Settlement Agreement


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:SEP-28-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 10/26/15 at request of counsel


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:SEP-15-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Compel Return Of Real Property To Trust, And For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Financial Elder Abuse, Conversion, And Imposition Of Constructive Trust
Rulings:Continued to 9/29/15


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:AUG-25-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Compel Return Of Real Property To Trust, And For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Financial Elder Abuse, Conversion, And Imposition Of Constructive Trust
Rulings:Continued to 9/15/15


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:AUG-24-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ORDER OF STATUS HEARING
Rulings:Off calendar


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUL-29-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Mr. Sanchez'S Final Account
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUL-13-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY (2263 Alum Rock, San Jose, Ca)
Rulings:Hearing-Appearance required.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUN-16-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Compel Return Of Real Property To Trust, And For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Financial Elder Abuse, Conversion, And Imposition Of Constructive Trust
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JUN-03-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Mr. Sanchez'S Final Account
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:APR-16-2015 14:30 PM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRIANNA K. MANNION
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion Of Respondent Mark Nelson To Compel Obedience To Subpoena By Third-Party Witness, Paul Camera, And For Imposition On Paul Camera Of Monetary Sanctions Pursuant To Ccp 2030.030
Rulings:The Respondent's motion to compel subpoenaed business records is GRANTED in part. The subpoenaed records are discoverable under CCP section 2017.010. The subpoena was properly served, and Camera, the subpoenaed party, has not filed a motion to quash, motion for protective order, or other proper objection to the subpoena. Camera must produce to Respondent responsive documents within his custody or control that he has not already produced to Respondent, including documents on his personal computer. The Court rejects Camera's unilateral narrowing of the information requested given the liberal scope of discoverable material. The Court is not convinced that the burden of making a full production is unreasonable under the circumstances. Given that Camera had access to the Savvy server now controlled by a third party while this subpoena was pending but did not use that access to provide all required responsive documents to Respondent, Camera must also inform that third party that he does not object to production of responsive documents to Respondent, and Camera must cooperate with the third party to the extent necessary for the third party to access Camera's documents on the server (including providing any needed password to the third party or unlocking access to the information by inputting the password himself). To the extent Camera contends that responsive documents would include privileged financial information of other third parties (a fact of which he has not convinced the Court on these papers), this order is without prejudice to the parties negotiating a protective order allowing redaction or limiting the use of any such information. The Respondent's request for sanctions is GRANTED in part in the amount of $1,400. The subpoenaed party has misused the discovery process, inter alia, by failing to comply fully with the subpoena, making evasive responses to the subpoena, and prematurely cutting off the meet and confer process. Any party wishing to contest this tentative ruling must so advise all other parties and the courtroom clerk (415-551-3702) no later than 4:30 p.m. on Wednesday, April 15, 2015. Counsel for the moving party is directed to submit a proposed order consistent with this tentative ruling.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:MAR-04-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Bond For Successor Trustee
Rulings:Off calendar


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:JAN-27-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Compel Return Of Real Property To Trust, And For Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Financial Elder Abuse, Conversion, And Imposition Of Constructive Trust
Rulings: Continued to 2/10/15. Examiner unavailable.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:DEC-24-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Remove William Sanchez, Successor Trustee To Compel An Accounting And To Appoint Debra J. Dolch As Successor Trustee
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:DEC-17-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Remove William Sanchez, Successor Trustee To Compel An Accounting And To Appoint Debra J. Dolch As Successor Trustee
Rulings:Continued to 12/24/14 - Examiner need more time for review


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:DEC-02-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Remove William Sanchez, Successor Trustee To Compel An Accounting And To Appoint Debra J. Dolch As Successor Trustee
Rulings:Continued to 12/17/14 - Courtesy copies received fewer than 3 court days prior to hearing.


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:NOV-18-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Remove William Sanchez, Successor Trustee To Compel An Accounting And To Appoint Debra J. Dolch As Successor Trustee
Rulings:Continued to 12/2/14 - Notes to follow


Case Number:*******8038
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LUIS CARRILLO TRUST
Court Date:OCT-28-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Remove William Sanchez, Successor Trustee To Compel An Accounting And To Appoint Debra J. Dolch As Successor Trustee
Rulings:Continued to 11/18/14 - Notes emailed 10/24/14


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DER, ERNEST F