This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/28/2016 at 05:36:38 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/30/2015 IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST OCT 1, 1992 TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9007

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Others

LOWE, ADRIENNE

LOWE, STUART

LOWE, CURTIS

San Francisco, CA 94121

LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST.

Defendant

THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FEDER, BRUCE ALLEN

685 Market Street Ste. 540

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

BANK STATEMENTS FILED BY OTHER LOWE, CURTIS

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

RESPONSE TO INTERIM ORDER AFTER HEARING, ETC. AND PROBATE EXAMINER NOTED DATED DECEMBER 22, 2015 FILED BY OTHER LOWE, CURTIS

ORDER

ORDER - INTERIM ORDER AFTER HEARING RE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

DECLARATION OF BRUCE A. FEDER RE: APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ORDER AFTER HEA

DECLARATION OF BRUCE A. FEDER RE: APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ORDER AFTER HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 58453895) FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART

Objections to Trustee Curtis Lowes First and Final Account

PROBATE OPPOSITION/OBJECTION TO ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT (TRANSACTION ID # 58335830) FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART (Fee:450.00)

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE:

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, CURTIS HEARING SET FOR DEC-28-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

TRUST ORDER

ORDER COMPELLING TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART

Notice of Hearing Decedents Estate or Trust

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 57653534) FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART

SUBSEQUENT PROBATE PETITION

PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART AS TO TRUSTOR LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 HEARING SET FOR SEP-01-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • BANK STATEMENTS FILED BY OTHER LOWE, CURTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT CONTINUED FROM MAR-14-2016 TO MAR-28-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT CONTINUED FROM FEB-22-2016 TO MAR-14-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO INTERIM ORDER AFTER HEARING, ETC. AND PROBATE EXAMINER NOTED DATED DECEMBER 22, 2015 FILED BY OTHER LOWE, CURTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - INTERIM ORDER AFTER HEARING RE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BRUCE A. FEDER RE: APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ORDER AFTER HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 58453895) FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT CONTINUED FROM JAN-11-2016 TO FEB-22-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 HEARING HELD - SEE MINI-MINUTES FOR THIS DATE. PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-11-2016 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT CONTINUED FROM DEC-28-2015 TO JAN-11-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROBATE OPPOSITION/OBJECTION TO ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT (TRANSACTION ID # 58335830) FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, CURTIS HEARING SET FOR DEC-28-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON FILING ACCOUNTING CONTINUED FROM OCT-13-2015 TO NOV-24-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 HEARING HELD - SEE MINI-MINUTES FOR THIS DATE. PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-13-2015 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER COMPELLING TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT, CALENDAR OF SEP-01-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT, CALENDAR OF SEP-01-2015, GRANTED SUBJECT TO WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON FILING ACCOUNTING HEARING SET FOR OCT-13-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-01-2015 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 57653534) FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT FILED BY PETITIONER LOWE, ADRIENNE LOWE, STUART AS TO TRUSTOR LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 HEARING SET FOR SEP-01-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:JUN-13-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:MAY-30-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 6/13/18 - Notes emailed 5/25/18


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:MAY-16-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 5/30/18 - Examiner needs more time to review complicated issues. Please file a Supplement that provides the name and address of each beneficiary as required by CRC 7.902.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:MAR-26-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of The Co-Trustees' Accounting And Proposed Form Of Distribution
Rulings:off calendar


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:FEB-26-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of The Co-Trustees' Accounting And Proposed Form Of Distribution
Rulings:Appearance required.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:JAN-22-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of The Co-Trustees' Accounting And Proposed Form Of Distribution
Rulings:Appearance required.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:OCT-16-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition To Allow First Forensic Accounting Of Successor Co-Trustees For The Period September 2, 2014 To February 27, 2015, And For Approval Of Payment To Forensic Accountant For Services Rendered
Rulings: Hearing. Appearance required.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:SEP-25-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition To Allow First Forensic Accounting Of Successor Co-Trustees For The Period September 2, 2014 To February 27, 2015, And For Approval Of Payment To Forensic Accountant For Services Rendered
Rulings: Continued to 10/16/17. No courtesy copy of opposition. No proof of service of opposition.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:AUG-23-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition To Allow First Forensic Accounting Of Successor Co-Trustees For The Period September 2, 2014 To February 27, 2015, And For Approval Of Payment To Forensic Accountant For Services Rendered
Rulings: Hearing. Appearance required.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:JUL-10-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition To Allow First Forensic Accounting Of Successor Co-Trustees For The Period September 2, 2014 To February 27, 2015, And For Approval Of Payment To Forensic Accountant For Services Rendered
Rulings: Continued to 8/23/17 at Counsel's request. Not yet reviewed.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:JUN-05-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: OFF CALENDAR


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:APR-24-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:MAR-27-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 4/24/17. Final continuance without an appearance.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:MAR-06-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 3/27/17 per stipulation of parties.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:FEB-06-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 3/6/17 at Counsel's request. Accounting almost complete.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:JAN-09-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 2/6/17 at Counsel's request and without objection from opposing party.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:DEC-05-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 1/9/17 as stipulated, to give accountant more time to prepare accounting.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:OCT-24-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 12/5/16 at Counsel's request, per Judge Cheng.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:AUG-15-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:AUG-01-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 8/15/16 to be heard by Judge Cheng.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:JUN-27-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Hearing. Appearance required.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:MAY-16-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:MAY-02-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:MAR-28-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 5/2/16, as stipulated (in part) by parties.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:MAR-14-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 3/28/16. Notes sent.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:FEB-22-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 3/14/16 pursuant to interim order.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:JAN-11-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Hearing. Appearance required.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:DEC-28-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT
Rulings: Continued to 1/11/16. Notes sent.


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:NOV-24-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Accounting
Rulings:Off calendar


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:OCT-13-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Accounting
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******9007
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE LOWE FAMILY TRUST, EST. OCT 1, 1992 TRUST
Court Date:SEP-01-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition To Compel Trustee To Account
Rulings:Appearance required


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Larry E Lowe, Co-Trustee of the Lowe Family Trust - 2006 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEDER, BRUCE ALLEN