This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/27/2016 at 03:09:00 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE KATHRYN C. QVALE NONEXEMPT MARITAL TRUST, DATED 1-31-2006

Case Summary

On 08/14/2013 IN THE MATTER OF THE KATHRYN C QVALE NONEXEMPT MARITAL TRUST, DATED 1-31-2006 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7017

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Petitioners

HIURA, LAURA

QVALE, BRUCE H.

QVALE, JEFFREY

QVALE, MILES JEFFREY

QVALE AUTO GROUP

Trustees, Others and Respondents

QVALE, MILES JEFFREY

QVALE, JEFFREY

QVALE, CONNOR

DELL'OSSO, MONICA

Oakland, CA 94612

QVALE, CHRISTOPHER

DUFORD, KENDEL QVALE

QVALE, BLAKE

QVALE, KATHRYN C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Petitioner and Trustee Attorneys

KEKER, JOHN WATKINS

Attorney at KEKER & VAN NEST LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

MYERS, PETER SCOTT

625 Market St., Fourth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

CAMPISI, DOMINIC JOHN

Attorney at EVANS LATHAM ET AL

1 Post St #600

San Francisco, CA 94104

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

KEKER, JOHN WATKINS

Attorney at KEKER & VAN NEST LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

MYERS, PETER SCOTT

625 Market St., Fourth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Petitioner, Other and Trustee Attorneys

CAMPISI, DOMINIC JOHN

Attorney at EVANS LATHAM ET AL

1 Post St #600

San Francisco, CA 94104

FOREMAN, STEWART HARVEY

Attorney at FREELAND COOPER & FOREMAN LLP

150 Spear St. Ste. 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

DELL'OSSO, MONICA

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

1901 Harrison Street, 14Th Flo

Oakland, CA 94612

ROSE, JORDAN PAYMAN

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

1 Embarcadero Center, 30Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

KOPLOWITZ, EDWARD ALLAN

Attorney at MACINNIS, DONNER & KOPLOWITZ

465 California Street, Suite 222

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 55061028) FILED BY OBJECTOR QVALE, MILES JEFFREY

Petitioner Bruce H. Qvale, Family Trustees Opposition to Miles Jeffrey Qvales Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

OPPOSITION [PETITIONER BRUCE H. QVALE, FAMILY TRUSTEE'S] TO MILES JEFFREY QVALES MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 55028371) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

Notice of Motion in Support of Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings

NOTICE OF MOTION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 54961959) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, JEFFREY HEARING SET FOR MAR-05-2014 AT 02:30 PM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:60.00)

SUBSEQUENT PROBATE PETITION

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR INDEPENDENT TRUSTEE TO FILL VACANCY FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H. AS TO TRUSTOR QVALE, KATHRYN C. HEARING SET FOR NOV-18-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

Notice of Hearing-Decedents Estate or Trust IMO The Kathryn C. Qvale Nonexempt Marital Trust, dated January 31, 2006

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54124036) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

Petition for Instructions

PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 54299836) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H. HEARING SET FOR JAN-13-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

Consent to Granting of Petition for Instructions and Waiver of Notice-PTR-13-297017

CONSENT TO GRANTING OF PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS AND WAIVER OF NOTICE-PTR-13-297017 (TRANSACTION ID # 54299948) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

Declaration Supporting Setting Expedited Hearing Date for Ex Parte Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad LItem

DECLARATION SUPPORTING SETTING EXPEDITED HEARING DATE FOR EX PARTE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (TRANSACTION ID # 54357083) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

Ex Parte Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem-Probate

EX PARTE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-PROBATE (TRANSACTION ID # 54357083) REQUESTED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H. HEARING SET FOR OCT-11-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:60.00)

Declaration Regarding Notice of Ex Parte Hearing

DECLARATION REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54364047) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

Ex Parte Petition Requesting Advancement of Hearing Date

EX PARTE PETITION REQUESTING ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 54374572) REQUESTED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H. HEARING SET FOR OCT-16-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:60.00)

Declaration Supporting Setting Expedited Hearing Date for Ex Parte Petition Requesting Advancement of Hearing Date

DECLARATION DECLARATION SUPPORTING SETTING EXPEDITED HEARING DATE FOR EX PARTE PETITION REQUESTING ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 54374572) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (TRANSACTION ID # 54381392) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

Declaration Regarding Notice of Ex Parte Hearing

DECLARATION REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54384197) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

TRUST ORDER

EX PARTE ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE

TRUST ORDER

EX PARTE ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Notice of Hearing-Decedents Estate or Trust

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54418500) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

Petitioners Ex Parte App for Order Shortening Time to Notice Hearing on Motion to File Records Under Seal re Petition for Instructions; [Proposed ] Order

PETITIONERS EX PARTE APP FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO NOTICE HEARING ON MOTION TO FILE RECORDS UNDER SEAL RE PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS; [PROPOSED ] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 54472065) REQUESTED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H. HEARING SET FOR NOV-04-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:60.00)

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-04-2015 - CASE ASSIGNED TO COURT SETTLEMENT OFFICER PANG LY FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT TRIAL CALL. CASE SETTLED. (MOVING PARTY: MILES QVALE) (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-04-2015 - CASE ASSIGNED TO COURT SETTLEMENT OFFICER PANG LY FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT TRIAL CALL. CASE SETTLED. (MOVING PARTY: MILES QVALE) (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketMASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-02-2015 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR COURT (CONTINUED) ON MAR-04-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN 206. CASE DID NOT SETTLE WITH COURT SETTLEMENT OFFICER, PANG LY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketMASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-02-2015 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR COURT (CONTINUED) ON MAR-04-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN 206. CASE DID NOT SETTLE WITH COURT SETTLEMENT OFFICER, PANG LY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DocketDEMURRER, CALENDAR OF OCT-22-2014 CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH PTR-13-297016, SEE MINUTES IN THAT CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE VALIDITY, CALENDAR OF OCT-22-2014 CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH PTR-13-297016, SEE MINUTES IN THAT CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS, ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR ALL PURPOSES (TRANSACTION ID # 56056459) FILED BY RESPONDENT QVALE, BRUCE H. QVALE, MILES JEFFREY HIURA, LAURA QVALE AUTO GROUP (Fee:20.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEES., CALENDAR OF AUG-27-2014, DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (SEE ORDER IN CASE NUMBER 297016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR BENEFICIARIES KENDEL QVALE DUFORD, BLAKE QVALE AND CONNOR QVALE (TRANSACTION ID # 55998587) FILED BY BENEFICIARY DUFORD, KENDEL QVALE QVALE, BLAKE QVALE, CONNOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
183 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION DECLARATION SUPPORTING SETTING EXPEDITED HEARING DATE FOR EX PARTE PETITION REQUESTING ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 54374572) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE PETITION REQUESTING ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 54374572) REQUESTED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H. HEARING SET FOR OCT-16-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-PROBATE CONTINUED TO OCT-21-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54364047) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-PROBATE (TRANSACTION ID # 54357083) REQUESTED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H. HEARING SET FOR OCT-11-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION SUPPORTING SETTING EXPEDITED HEARING DATE FOR EX PARTE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (TRANSACTION ID # 54357083) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO GRANTING OF PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS AND WAIVER OF NOTICE-PTR-13-297017 (TRANSACTION ID # 54299948) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 54299836) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H. HEARING SET FOR JAN-13-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54124036) FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR INDEPENDENT TRUSTEE TO FILL VACANCY FILED BY PETITIONER QVALE, BRUCE H. AS TO TRUSTOR QVALE, KATHRYN C. HEARING SET FOR NOV-18-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7017
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE KATHRYN C. QVALE NONEXEMPT MARITAL TRUST, DATED 1-31-2006
Court Date:AUG-04-2014 10:30 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition To Remove, Suspend And Instruct Co-Trustee (Probate Code u00C2u00A7u00C2u00A7 15642(B), 17200(B)(6), (B)(7), (B)(10), And (B)(12)
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******7017
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE KATHRYN C. QVALE NONEXEMPT MARITAL TRUST, DATED 1-31-2006
Court Date:JUL-24-2014 14:00 PM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:ANDREW Y.S. CHENG
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike Petition To Remove, Suspend, And Instruct Co-Trustee
Rulings:Bruce Qvale's Motion to Strike is DENIED.Counsel for Miles Jeffrey Qvale shall prepare the order.Any party who wishes to contest the ruling shall notify the court and opposing counsel no later than 3:00 p.m. on 7/23/2014.



Case Number:*******7017
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE KATHRYN C. QVALE NONEXEMPT MARITAL TRUST, DATED 1-31-2006
Court Date:MAR-10-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition For Appointment Of Successor Independent Trustee To Fill Vacancy
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******7017
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE KATHRYN C. QVALE NONEXEMPT MARITAL TRUST, DATED 1-31-2006
Court Date:DEC-11-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS
Rulings: OFF CALENDAR at request of Petitioner's Counsel.


Case Number:*******7017
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE KATHRYN C. QVALE NONEXEMPT MARITAL TRUST, DATED 1-31-2006
Court Date:DEC-09-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition For Appointment Of Successor Independent Trustee To Fill Vacancy
Rulings: Continued to 12/30/13 at Counsel's request.


Case Number:*******7017
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE KATHRYN C. QVALE NONEXEMPT MARITAL TRUST, DATED 1-31-2006
Court Date:NOV-20-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS
Rulings: Continued to 12/11/13 at Counsel's request.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QVALE AUTO GROUP, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPISI, DOMINIC JOHN