This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/31/2022 at 20:36:59 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS C. MOODY, RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, JOSEPH M. QUINN, MURLENE J. RANDLE, CECILIA CASTELLANOS, ANDREW Y.S. CHENG, MARY E. WISS and VEDICA PURI. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3941

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

ROSS C. MOODY

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

JOSEPH M. QUINN

MURLENE J. RANDLE

CECILIA CASTELLANOS

ANDREW Y.S. CHENG

MARY E. WISS

VEDICA PURI

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Others and Respondents

DOLCH, DEBRA J.

MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

Appellant, Other, Petitioner and Respondent

MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

Others, Respondents and Petitioners

MARKS, KENNETH II AS BENEFICIARY TO THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI TRUST

MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

Other and Conservatee

PICETTI, BENJAMIN M.

Others, Trustees, Petitioners and Respondents

BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE

KASOLAS, MICHAEL

MARKS, KENNETH II AS BENEFICIARY TO THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI TRUST

MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

PICETTI, BENJAMIN M.

PICETTI, JAMES

U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

601 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other and Trustee

KASOLAS, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Other, Respondent and Appellant Attorneys

DE VRIES, LIZABETH N.

Attorney at DE VRIES LAW, P.C.

100 Pine St, #1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

MELBOSTAD, PAUL HOWARD

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN, GELLMAN, MELBOSTAD AND GIBSON- HARRIS,LLP

1388 Sutter Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94109

CLAUSEN, MARK T.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MARK T. CLAUSEN

1325 Crestview Court

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

GALLAGHER, CHRISTINA ANNASTACIA

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

345 California St, Ste 2200

San Francisco, CA 94104

WISCH, CHARLES JEROME

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES J. WISCH

275 Battery Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

HINSHAW, CAROLINE K

Attorney at BRYAN HINSHAW

235 Montgomery St., 30Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

KOPLOWITZ, EDWARD ALLAN

Attorney at MACINNIS, DONNER & KOPLOWITZ

465 California Street, Suite 888

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other and Conservatee Attorney

HINSHAW, CAROLINE K

Attorney at BRYAN HINSHAW

235 Montgomery St., 30Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other and Trustee Attorneys

GALLAGHER, CHRISTINA ANNASTACIA

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

345 California St, Ste 2200

San Francisco, CA 94104

WISCH, CHARLES JEROME

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES J. WISCH

275 Battery Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 68271033) FILED BY PETITIONER MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 68271033) FILED BY PETITIONER MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE?S COUNSEL (1) IN SUPPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE?S OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR THE SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF FORMER SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE PAUL H. MELBOSTAD?S ACCOUNTING FOR THE SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020

DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE?S COUNSEL (1) IN SUPPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE?S OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR THE SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF FORMER SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE PAUL H. MELBOSTAD?S ACCOUNTING FOR THE SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 AND (2) IN RESPONSE TO FORMER TRUSTEE MELBOSTAD?S REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 (TRANSACTION ID # 68253132) FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 68228942) FILED BY PETITIONER MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 68228942) FILED BY PETITIONER MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

MEMORANDUM RE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (TRANSACTION ID # 68140541) FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL

MEMORANDUM RE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (TRANSACTION ID # 68140541) FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL

REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE COMPENSATION FOR HIS ATTORNEY SERVICES PROVIDED WHILE SERVING AS TRUSTEE; ALSO APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY FEES REQUESTED FOR ATTORNEY SERVI

REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE COMPENSATION FOR HIS ATTORNEY SERVICES PROVIDED WHILE SERVING AS TRUSTEE; ALSO APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY FEES REQUESTED FOR ATTORNEY SERVICES PROVIDED AFTER SUCCEEDED AS TRUSTEE [PROBATE CODE SECTIONS 15687, 17200 (B)(9) AND 17200(B)(21) (TRANSACTION ID # 68105092) FILED BY RESPONDENT MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

JOINDER OF BENJAMIN M. PICETTI, JR. IN MICHAEL KASOLAS? OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR THE SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF FORMER SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE PAUL H. MELBOSTAD?S ACCOUNTING FOR THE SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 AN

JOINDER OF BENJAMIN M. PICETTI, JR. IN MICHAEL KASOLAS? OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR THE SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF FORMER SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE PAUL H. MELBOSTAD?S ACCOUNTING FOR THE SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 AND FOR APPROVAL OF FEES PAID AND FEES OWED FOR LEGAL SERVICES PROVIDED TO THE TRUST AS REASONABLE; REQUEST FOR ORDERS; REQUEST FOR DISGORGEMENT AND SURCHARGE (TRANSACTION ID # 68102702) FILED BY BENEFICIARY PICETTI, BENJAMIN M.

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 68093142) FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 68093142) FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL

VERIFIED PETITION FOR ORDER TO CHARGE PARTNERS INTEREST (TRANSACTION ID # 68065108) FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL HEARING SET FOR DEC-07-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

VERIFIED PETITION FOR ORDER TO CHARGE PARTNERS INTEREST (TRANSACTION ID # 68065108) FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL HEARING SET FOR DEC-07-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

PROBATE OPPOSITION/OBJECTION TO ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 68051677) FILED BY OBJECTOR KASOLAS, MICHAEL

PROBATE OPPOSITION/OBJECTION TO ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 68051677) FILED BY OBJECTOR KASOLAS, MICHAEL

DECLARATION OF FORMER TRUSTEE PAUL H. MELBOSTAD IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF HIS SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE COMPENSATION FOR HIS ATTORNEY SERVICES PROVIDED WH

DECLARATION OF FORMER TRUSTEE PAUL H. MELBOSTAD IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF HIS SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 AND APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE COMPENSATION FOR HIS ATTORNEY SERVICES PROVIDED WHILE SERVING AS TRUSTEE; ALSO APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY FEES REQUESTED FOR ATTORNEY SERVICES AFTER SUCCEEDED AS TRUSTEE (TRANSACTION ID # 67975996) FILED BY PETITIONER MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

DECLARATION OF CHARLES J WISCH IN SUPPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE'S APPLIATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL

DECLARATION OF CHARLES J WISCH IN SUPPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE'S APPLIATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL AS TO RESPONDENT MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST OEX HEARING SET FOR SEP-21-2022 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514

Association of Attorneys

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 67922973): WISCH, CHARLES JEROME ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR KASOLAS, MICHAEL

ORDER

ORDER APPROVING AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING HIRING OF COUNSEL

Notice of Hearing with Completed Proof of Service

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67862621) FILED BY PETITIONER MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

PETITION FOR THE SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF FORMER SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE P

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 67847957) FILED BY PETITIONER MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST HEARING SET FOR SEP-19-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

CERTIFICATION NOTICE

CERTIFICATION NOTICE

Notice of Hearing With Completed Proof of Service for Amended Ex Parte

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67835132) FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL

149 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): Verified Petition For Order To Charge Partners Interest; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: ROSS C. MOODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #2, Report, Fees; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): Petition For Recovery Of Possession And Control Of Real And Personal Property And For Remedies For Elder Abuse For Failure To Return Property Of Elder After Demand Made And False Imprisonment; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: JOSEPH M. QUINN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES CONTINUED FROM OCT-19-2022 TO NOV-16-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #2, Report, Fees Off Calendar Oct-19-2022 Continued To Nov-16-22 At 09:00 A.M. In Dept 204; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: JOSEPH M. QUINN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 68271033) FILED BY PETITIONER MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE?S COUNSEL (1) IN SUPPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE?S OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR THE SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF FORMER SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE PAUL H. MELBOSTAD?S ACCOUNTING FOR THE SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 AND (2) IN RESPONSE TO FORMER TRUSTEE MELBOSTAD?S REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNTING PERIOD JUNE 1, 2020 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021 (TRANSACTION ID # 68253132) FILED BY TRUSTEE KASOLAS, MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 68228942) FILED BY PETITIONER MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED Off Calendar Sep-28-2022 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 514; Judge Name: MURLENE J. RANDLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialPayment: WRIT ISSUED; Amount: $40; Payment Type: CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number: W2222929W014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
286 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JOSEPH A. PIASTA II IN OPPOSITION TO THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE SCHEDULED HEARING OF THE COURT FILED BY DEBRA J. DOLCH AT TO BENJAMIN M. PICETTI REVOCABLE TRUST, AND IF NEEDED, FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION ID # 66147396) FILED BY RESPONDENT MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PAUL H. MELBOSTAD, TRUSTEE , IN OPPOSITION TO EX-PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE SCHEDULED HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66147103) FILED BY RESPONDENT MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JOSEPH A. PIASTA II IN OPPOSITION TO THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE SCHEDULED HEARING OF THE COURT FILED BY DEBRA J. DOLCH AT TO BENJAMIN M. PICETTI REVOCABLE TRUST, AND IF NEEDED, FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION ID # 66147103) FILED BY RESPONDENT MELBOSTAD, PAUL H AS TRUSTEE OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF CAROLINE K. HINSHAW RE SERVICE OF NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE SCHEDULED HEARING OF PETITION FOR ORDER BRINGING TRUST UNDER THE CONTINUING SUPERVISION OF THE COURT FILED BY DEBRA J. DOLCH AS TO BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST AND, IF NEEDED, FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME INSTRUCTIONS FOR APPEARANCE AT EX PARTE MATTERS VIA ZOOM OR COURTCALL (TRANSACTION ID # 66144721) FILED BY CONSERVATEE PICETTI, BENJAMIN M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • FinancialPayment: PROBATE EX PARTE; Amount: $60; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W2220B23P007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE SCHEDULED HEARING OF PETITION FOR ORDER BRINGING TRUST UNDER THE CONTINUING SUPERVISION OF THE COURT FILED BY DEBRA J. DOLCH AS TO BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST AND, IF NEEDED, FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION ID # 66132840) REQUESTED BY CONSERVATEE PICETTI, BENJAMIN M. HEARING SET FOR DEC-01-2020 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66127924) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER BRINGING UNDER THE CONTINUING SUPERVISION OF TBE COURT CONTINUED FROM FEB-02-2021 TO FEB-04-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialPayment: PETN AND OPP RE INTERNAL AFFAIRS OF 17200 TRUST; Amount: $450; Payment Type: CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number: W2220A06P006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER BRINGING UNDER THE CONTINUING SUPERVISION OF TBE COURT FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. AS TO TRUSTOR BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE HEARING SET FOR FEB-02-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204; Fee: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JAN-17-2023 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Recovery Of Possession And Control Of Real And Personal Property And For Remedies For Elder Abuse For Failure To Return Property Of Elder After Demand Made And False Imprisonment
Rulings:off calendar.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JAN-11-2023 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Verified Petition For Order To Charge Partners Interest
Rulings:Continued to 2/21/23 per judicial officer. The court does not understand this petition to be properly filed in the probate division. Petitioner is instructed to file a memorandum of points and authorities explaining why the petition can/should be heard in the probate division, rather than the civil division. In addition, if the petition is properly before the probate division, it must be noticed as a trust petition and proof of proper notice and service must be filed.All required documents to be filed and provided by 2/6/23.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JAN-03-2023 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #2, Report, Fees
Rulings:Continued to 1/11/23 to be heard by Judge Quinn.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:DEC-20-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #2, Report, Fees
Rulings:Continued to 1/3/23 for matter to be prepped for hearing.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:DEC-14-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Recovery Of Possession And Control Of Real And Personal Property And For Remedies For Elder Abuse For Failure To Return Property Of Elder After Demand Made And False Imprisonment
Rulings:Continued to 1/17/23 due to full hearing calendar.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:DEC-07-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Verified Petition For Order To Charge Partners Interest
Rulings:Continued to 1/3/23 to be heard by Judge Quinn.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:NOV-16-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #2, Report, Fees
Rulings:Continued to 12/20/22.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:NOV-02-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Recovery Of Possession And Control Of Real And Personal Property And For Remedies For Elder Abuse For Failure To Return Property Of Elder After Demand Made And False Imprisonment
Rulings:Continued to 12/14/22 due to full hearing calendar.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:OCT-19-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #2, Report, Fees
Rulings:Continued to 11/16/22 for further review and for filings in the e-file queue to be processed. Filed stamped copy of the accounting petition, as well as any other documents not yet delivered, to be provided at least 2 weeks prior.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:SEP-21-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Recovery Of Possession And Control Of Real And Personal Property And For Remedies For Elder Abuse For Failure To Return Property Of Elder After Demand Made And False Imprisonment
Rulings:Continued to 11/02/22.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:SEP-19-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #2, Report, Fees
Rulings:Continued to 10/19/22 to be heard by Judge Quinn.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:AUG-24-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Recovery Of Possession And Control Of Real And Personal Property And For Remedies For Elder Abuse For Failure To Return Property Of Elder After Demand Made And False Imprisonment
Rulings:Continued to 9/21/22.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:AUG-16-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Final Account
Rulings:off calendar (duplicate entry)


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:AUG-02-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Final Account From Jun-01-2020 Through Date All Assets Were Transferred To The Successor Trustee
Rulings:off calendar.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JUL-19-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Final Account From Jun-01-2020 Through Date All Assets Were Transferred To The Successor Trustee
Rulings:Appearance required. Remote appearances should be made whenever possible. Please review Local Rule 14.1. The following information pertains to appearances by Zoom:WHEN ENTERING "YOUR NAME" ON ZOOM, BOTH THE FIRST AND LAST NAME, AS WELL THE CASE NUMBER, MUST BE INCLUDED.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833, and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above. Information regarding appearance by CourtCall can be found in the 11th amended general order.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JUN-29-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Recovery Of Possession And Control Of Real And Personal Property And For Remedies For Elder Abuse For Failure To Return Property Of Elder After Demand Made And False Imprisonment
Rulings:Continued to 8/24/22 per stipulation of counsel.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JUN-07-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Final Account From Jun-01-2020 Through Date All Assets Were Transferred To The Successor Trustee
Rulings:Continued to 7/19/22 due to full hearing calendar.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JUN-01-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Recovery Of Possession And Control Of Real And Personal Property And For Remedies For Elder Abuse For Failure To Return Property Of Elder After Demand Made And False Imprisonment
Rulings:Continued to 6/29/22.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:MAY-04-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Recovery Of Possession And Control Of Real And Personal Property And For Remedies For Elder Abuse For Failure To Return Property Of Elder After Demand Made And False Imprisonment
Rulings:Continued to 6/1/22.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:FEB-15-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For The Settlement And Approval Of The First Annual Trustees Account Of Management Of The Assets Of The Trust For The First Year May 21 2019 Through May 30 2020 Request For Orders
Rulings:Continued to 2/23/22 for processing of e-filings.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JAN-18-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For The Settlement And Approval Of The First Annual Trustees Account Of Management Of The Assets Of The Trust For The First Year May 21 2019 Through May 30 2020 Request For Orders
Rulings:Continued to 2/15/22. The Court's review of Mr. Melbostad and his law firm's billing records indicate that the lion's share of the time billed was for services in his capacity as "Trustee" for "trust administration services" and not for "legal services provided for trust administration" (see letter attached as Exhibit G to Supplemental Declaration filed on 8/18/21). What standard should the Court use to distinguish time spent on legal services for trust administration, compensaable at $525/hour under the contract with the temporary conservator, from services Mr. Melbostad provided in his capacity as Trustee, which are not compensable under the agreement with the temporary conservator?A verified declaration addressing this issue must be filed, and a filed stamped copy delivered, at least two weeks prior to the continuance date. Any responses must be filed, and a filed stamped copy delivered, at least 1 week prior.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:DEC-21-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For The Settlement And Approval Of The First Annual Trustees Account Of Management Of The Assets Of The Trust For The First Year May 21 2019 Through May 30 2020 Request For Orders
Rulings:Continued to 1/18/22. Examiner's Notes emailed on 12/14/21. Note: tentative ruling continuances are final and uncontestable and are not subject to Local Rule 14.10.B.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:NOV-30-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Approving Third Amendment Of Trust
Rulings:Appearance required. Court to determine whether amendment should be approved and finding that a GAL is not required should be made. Remote appearances should be made whenever possible. Please review the 10th amended general order.The following information pertains to appearances by Zoom:WHEN ENTERING "YOUR NAME" ON ZOOM, BOTH THE FIRST AND LAST NAME, AS WELL THE CASE NUMBER, MUST BE INCLUDED.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833, and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above. Information regarding appearance by CourtCall can be found in the 10th amended general order.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:NOV-23-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For The Settlement And Approval Of The First Annual Trustees Account Of Management Of The Assets Of The Trust For The First Year May 21 2019 Through May 30 2020 Request For Orders
Rulings:Continued to 12/21/21. Examiner's Notes will be sent.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:SEP-07-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of An Ex Parte Petition To Set Bond
Rulings:off calendar


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:AUG-09-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For The Settlement And Approval Of The First Annual Trustees Account Of Management Of The Assets Of The Trust For The First Year May 21 2019 Through May 30 2020 Request For Orders
Rulings:Continued to 9/7/21. Examiner's Notes sent to petitioner. Note: tentative ruling continuances are final and uncontestable and are not subject to Local Rule 14.10.B.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JUL-20-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of An Ex Parte Petition To Set Bond
Rulings:Continued to 8/10/21.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:JUN-29-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of An Ex Parte Petition To Set Bond
Rulings:Continued to 7/20/21. Ex parte petition has been submitted for filing but has not yet been filed.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:MAY-18-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Bringing Under The Continuing Supervision Of Tbe Court
Rulings:Appearance required. Remote appearances should be made whenever possible. Please review the 9th amended general order.The following information pertains to appearances by Zoom:WHEN ENTERING "YOUR NAME" ON ZOOM, BOTH THE FIRST AND LAST NAME, AS WELL THE CASE NUMBER, MUST BE INCLUDED.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833, and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above. Information regarding appearance by CourtCall can be found in the 9th amended general order.


Case Number:*******3941
Case Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE BENJAMIN M. PICETTI 2007 REVOCABLE TRUST
Court Date:APR-20-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Bringing Under The Continuing Supervision Of Tbe Court
Rulings:Continued to 5/18/21. Examiner's Notes emailed to counsel on 4/16/21.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINSHAW CAROLINE K.