This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 06:25:00 (UTC).

IN RE: SUSAN C HILL

Case Summary

On 02/07/2008 IN RE SUSAN C HILL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8085

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HILL, SUSAN C

Defendant

NAVISTAR, INC., FKA INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION

Respondents

SAM'S AUTOMOTIVE PARTS & MACHINE SHOP, INC.

INTERNATIONAL TRUCK & ENGINE CORPORATION

AUTO PARTS WHOLESALE

CENTRAL VALLEY SUPPLY COMPANY, INC.

CRANE, CO.

BERCHTOLD EQUIPMENT COMPANY

SPECIAL MATERIALS, INC. - WISCONSIN

NONE

WATTENBARGER-STAHL DEVELOPMENT CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

KELLY, DANIEL J.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 19095859) FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF NAVISTAR,INC. AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT NAVISTAR, INC., FKA INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 19095859) FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • DocketDISCOVERY 612, PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED. ORDER WAS SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. COMM: EVERETT A. HEWLETT. MATTER NOT REPORTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • DocketMINI-MINUTES FOR MAR-18-2008 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 612

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketPROOFS OF SERVICE OF PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION; CD ENTITLED "RAYMOND HILL" FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C SERVED FEB-20-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT BERCHTOLD EQUIPMENT COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION; CD ENTITLED "RAYMOND HILL" FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C SERVED FEB-21-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT SPECIAL MATERIALS, INC. - WISCONSIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C SERVED FEB-21-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT AUTO PARTS WHOLESALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION; CD ENTITLED "RAYMOND HILL" FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C SERVED FEB-20-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CRANE, CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION; CD ENTITLED "RAYMOND HILL" FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C SERVED FEB-20-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT INTERNATIONAL TRUCK & ENGINE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION; CD ENTITLED "RAYMOND HILL" FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C SERVED FEB-27-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT SAM'S AUTOMOTIVE PARTS & MACHINE SHOP, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION; CD ENTITLED "RAYMOND HILL" FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C SERVED FEB-20-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CENTRAL VALLEY SUPPLY COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION OF SUSAN C. HILL TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION; CD ENTITLED "RAYMOND HILL" FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C SERVED FEB-20-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT WATTENBARGER-STAHL DEVELOPMENT CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • DocketPETITION FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C AS TO RESPONDENT NONE (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • DocketPETITION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OF RAYMOND HILL BY VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, SUSAN C HEARING SET FOR MAR-18-2008 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 612 (Fee:40.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less