This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/26/2021 at 20:53:16 (UTC).

IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG

Case Summary

On 12/04/2009 IN RE STANLEY CHONG KWONG was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG, ROSS C. MOODY, JOSEPH M. QUINN, VEDICA PURI, MARY E. WISS, PETER J. BUSCH, RICHARD B. ULMER, JOHN K. STEWART, PANG LY, ANDREW Y.S. CHENG, TERI L. JACKSON, PAUL H. ALVARADO, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CYNTHIA M. LEE, KATHERINE FEINSTEIN and SUE M. KAPLAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3019

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

ROSS C. MOODY

JOSEPH M. QUINN

VEDICA PURI

MARY E. WISS

PETER J. BUSCH

RICHARD B. ULMER

JOHN K. STEWART

PANG LY

ANDREW Y.S. CHENG

TERI L. JACKSON

PAUL H. ALVARADO

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

CYNTHIA M. LEE

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

SUE M. KAPLAN

 

Party Details

Appellants, Others, Petitioners, Respondents and Trustees

KWONG, AMY

KWONG, JEANNE

KWONG, LARRY

KWONG, LAU

KWONG, SARA

KWOK, JENNIFER

OUYANG, FENG

CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL MORTGAGE CORPORATION

KWONG, STANLEY CHONG

GON, KIMBERLY

San Francisco, CA 94121

BERNHARD, DANIEL T

COOPER AND FOREMAN LLP

FREELAND, KATE C

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant, Other, Petitioner, Respondent and Trustee Attorneys

FOSTER, PHIL

Attorney at TOUR-SARKISSIAN LAW OFFICES

211 Gough Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

LIPPENBERGER, DON CARL

Attorney at LIPPENBERGER, THOMPSON, WELCH, SOROKO & GILBERT LLP

201 Tamal Vista Blvd.

Corte Madera, CA 94925

TOUR-SARKISSIAN, PAUL

Attorney at TOUR-SARKISSIAN LAW OFFICES

211 Gough St., Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

ROBBINS, B. DOUGLAS

Attorney at TONG ROBBINS LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

EPSTEIN, MARK WARREN

Attorney at SEILER EPSTEIN LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 1600

San Francisco, CA 94111

BRYAN, RICHARD MELONE

Attorney at BRYAN HINSHAW

425 California Street, Suite 810

San Francisco, CA 94104

BERNHARD, DANIEL THORNTON

Attorney at FREELAND COOPER & FOREMAN LLP

150 Spear St., Ste 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #8 (TRANSACTION ID # 64180347) FILED BY TRUSTEE KWONG, JEANNE HEARING SET FOR DEC-04-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #8 (TRANSACTION ID # 64180347) FILED BY TRUSTEE KWONG, JEANNE HEARING SET FOR DEC-04-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION RE: RETURN OF TRIAL EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF HEARING - DECEDENTS ESTATE OR TRUST

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 59006913) FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE

Declaration of Counsel Daniel T Bernhard in Opposition to Ex Parte Pet

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL DANIEL T BERNHARD IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ON PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING TRUSTEES NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 59576861) FILED BY RESPONDENT KWOK, JENNIFER

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER

MINUTES FOR JUL-02-2015 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR JUL-02-2015 9:00 AM

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 64820874) FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 64820874) FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION RESPONDENT JEAN KWONG'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER JENNIFER KWOK'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER

573 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): Petitioner Jennifer Kwoks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel The Production Of Documents; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: ROSS C. MOODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT Off Calendar Jul-27-2021 Continued To Nov-01-21 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT Off Calendar Jul-27-2021 Continued To Nov-01-21 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT Off Calendar Jul-27-2021 Continued To Nov-01-21 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RE TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Responses To Written Discovery Off Calendar Sep-16-2021 Denied MINI MINUTES: Appearances: Phil Foster appeared by zoom for Jeanne Kwong (Respondent). Douglas Robbins appeared by zoom for Jennifer Kwok (Petitioner). Daniel Bernhard appeared by zoom for the non-parties. Counsel presented oral argument to support their positions with respect to the issue of whether or not the petitioner is going for double recovery, whether the petitioner is going for damages that have already been paid, whether the damages are the same or different, whether the causes of action are the same or different, whether or not the facts of both cases are different, the issue of maintaining confidentiality with respect to the settlement agreement, etc. Upon conclusion of argument, the Court confirms its tentative ruling. Respondent's Motion to Compel Further Response to Written Discovery is denied. There is insufficient showing that Respondent and Non-parties Freeland Cooper & Foreman, LLP, Daniel T. Bernhard and Kate C. Freeland are joint tortfeasors for purposes of Code of Civil Procedure section 877. The claims in Petitioner's malpractice action (Kwok, et al. v. Freeland, Cooper & Foreman LLP, et. al. SCSF Case No. CGC-19-576188) and Petitioner's Verified Second Amended Petition for Breach of Trust, Constructive Fraud, and Removal of Trustee are not for the same wrong or injury as required to receive credit under Code of Civil Procedure section 877. See In re JTS Corp (2016) 617 F.3d 1102 and Lafayette v. County of Los Angeles (1984) 162 Cal. App.3d 547. Petitioner's sanctions request is denied. Judge: Ross C. Moody. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Deputy: R. Rosado. Not reported.; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: JOSEPH M. QUINN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY, CALENDAR OF SEP-16-2021, DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,060 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2010
  • FinancialPayment : PETN COMMENCING OTHER PROBATE PROCEEDINGS AND OPP; Amount : $370; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2710115P009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBATE RESPONSE/ANSWER TO PETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROMISSORY NOTES AND FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING EXECUTOR FILED BY TRUSTEE KWOK, JENNIFER (Fee:$370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROMISSORY NOTES AND FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING EXECUTOR CONTINUED FROM JAN-04-2010 TO JAN-19-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • HearingMatter(s): Petition To Determine Ownership Of Promissory Notes And For Order Authorizing And Directing Executor Off Calendar Jan-04-2010 Continued To Jan-19-10 At 09:00 A.M. In Dept 204; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: SUE M. KAPLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROMISSORY NOTES AND FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING EXECUTOR JENNIFER KWOK TO TRANSFER PROMISSORY NOTES TO STAN KWONG TRUST FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AND SERVICE LIST FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • FinancialPayment : PETN COMMENCING OTHER PROBATE PROCEEDINGS AND OPP; Amount : $370; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2709C04P018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROMISSORY NOTES AND FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING EXECUTOR FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE AS TO RESPONDENT KWONG, STANLEY CHONG HEARING SET FOR JAN-04-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:$370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:APR-05-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #8
Rulings:Hearing appearance required. Remote appearance by video or telephone should be made whenever possible. Please review the 9th amended general order for more information. To appear by Zoom, go to Zoom.com and click Join Meeting, and use the ID and password below.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833 and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above.Parties appearing should check in for the hearing using their full name.ISSUES (may be addressed at hearing):1) Matter set for hearing for the court to determine how to proceed.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:MAR-19-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:ELIF SONMEZ
Calendar Matter:Petitioner Jennifer Kwoks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Temporarily Suspend The Trustee Of The Stan Kwong Trust On In The Alternative Limit Trustees Power
Rulings:This tentative ruling is issued by Judge Ross C. Moody.ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE HEARING IS CONTINUED FROM 9:00 AM TO 11:00 AM ON FRIDAY MARCH 19, 2021.The court grants Respondent's unopposed Request for Judicial Notice. The court grants Petitioner's unopposed Request for Judicial Notice. Notice is limited to the relevant facts properly subject to notice given the materials presented and does not, for example, extend to the truth of assertions in pleadings or transcripts. (See Richtek USA, Inc. v. UPI Semiconductor Corp. (2015) 242 Cal.App.4th 651, 659-660.)Petitioner Jennifer Kwok's Motion to Temporarily Suspend Respondent/Trustee Jeanne Kwong, or in the alternative, Limit Trustee's Powers is DENIED. There is no showing that a motion is the correct procedural vehicle with which to seek this relief. Probate Code section 15642 allows the court to remove a trustee "on its own motion" or "on petition of a settlor, cotrustee, or beneficiary under Section 17200," or order a trustee to surrender trust property "on [the court's] own motion or on petition of a cotrustee or beneficiary" (sub. (e)). A petition is the correct vehicle with which to seek the requested relief, and Petitioner has had one pending for over a year, since December 2019. It has been before the court on regular hearing twice, in October 2020 and January 2021, and will be again on April 5, 2021. Petitioner's allegations in support of her requests to remove or suspend the Trustee for failure to distribute the remaining Trust assets have not changed materially since the Petition was filed in 2019. The court is aware of the pending Petition's allegations, and declined to enter a ruling on the Petition at both the October 2020 and January 2021 hearings. The court also denied Petitioner's January 5, 2021 Ex Parte Application to Suspend Trustee, which is almost identical to the text of this motion's memorandum of points and authorities.Insofar as Petitioner invites the court to consider this motion as a motion for reconsideration under CCP section 1008, the motion is denied as procedurally defective (see CCP section 1008(b)).This motion is denied without comment on the relative or potential merits of the pending Verified Petition for Order Suspending, or in the Alternative Removing Trustee, or on the terms of the 2017 Stipulation between the parties.Respondent shall prepare and lodge with the court clerk in Department 204 a hard-copy proposed order consistent with this tentative ruling. Any party wishing to contest this tentative ruling by appearing at the scheduled hearing must so advise other parties and the courtroom clerk (415-551-3702) no later than 4:00 p.m. on March 18, 2021. ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE HEARING IS CONTINUED FROM 9:00 AM TO 11:00 AM ON FRIDAY MARCH 19, 2021.Remote appearance is strongly encouraged, in conformity with the current General Order of the Probate and Mental Health Division, available on the court's website at https: sfsuperiorcourt.org/divisions/probate. To appear by Zoom, go to zoom.us and click "Join Meeting." Enter Meeting ID number 87580177925 and passcode 722809. Parties appearing via Zoom should use their full names in the "Your Name" section. To appear telephonically through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833 and follow the prompts. Enter Meeting ID number 87580177925#, participant ID 0#, and passcode 722809#. Counsel and parties may appear by audio-only telephone through CourtCall by calling CourtCall at 1-888-882-6878 and obtaining an appearance access code for the hearing's scheduled date and time in Department 204.



Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:MAR-08-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of The Order Regarding The Stipulation To Extend The Five Year Statute
Rulings: OFF CALENDAR. Parties need to follow the local rules for ex parte procedures. [LRSF 14.11 B.]


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:JAN-25-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Amended Petition For Breach Of Trust
Rulings:Hearing appearance required. Remote appearance by video or telephone should be made whenever possible due to the recent stay at home order issued by the mayor. Please review the 8th amended general order for more information. To appear by Zoom, go to Zoom.com and click Join Meeting, and use the ID and password below.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833 and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above.Parties appearing should check in for the hearing using their full name.ISSUES:1) Matter set for hearing for the court to determine how to proceed.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:DEC-14-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Amended Petition For Breach Of Trust
Rulings: Continued to 01/25/2021.Issues:1) Examiner received 2 unfiled copies of the Joint Status Statement and they have been recycled. File stamped single sided courtesy copies are required for any papers filed with the court and must be received by Examiner in room 202 at the Superior Court no later than 4pm on 01/11/2021. (LRSF 2.7, 14.6).2) Examiner has not received the required courtesy copy of the 11/05/2020 Respondent Jeanne Kwong's Response. File stamped single sided courtesy copies are required for any papers filed with the court and must be received by Examiner in room 202 at the Superior Court no later than 4pm on 01/11/2021. (LRSF 2.7, 14.6).3) Has not filed notice of the 8th account.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:OCT-26-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Verified Petition For Order Suspending, Or In The Alternative, Removing Trustee Of The Stanley Chong Kwong Trust
Rulings:hearing. appearance required. remote appearance highly encouraged. Please review the 6th amended general order for more information. To appear by Zoom, go to Zoom.com and click Join Meeting, and use the ID and password below.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833 and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above.PARTIES APPEARING SHOULD CHECK IN FOR THE HEARING WITH THEIR FIRST INITIAL AND LAST NAME.ISSUES (to be addressed at hearing):1) The court is treating this hearing as a case management conference.2) Does not appear to have filed Notice of Hearing for the 8th account.3) Does not appear to be filed response to Verified Petition For Order Suspending, Or In The Alternative, Removing Trustee of the Stanley Chong Kwong Trust


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:OCT-15-2020 14:00 PM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:ELIF SONMEZ
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Rulings:The Court grants Respondents' Request for Judicial Notice. Notice is limited to the relevant facts properly subject to notice given the materials presented and does not, for example, extend to the truth of assertions in pleadings or transcripts. (See Richtek USA, Inc. v. UPI Semiconductor Corp. (2015) 242 Cal.App.4th 651, 659-660.) Respondent and Trustee Jeanne Kwong's Motion for Summary Adjudication of the Second Amended Petition is denied. Under CCP section 437c(f)(1), "A motion for summary adjudication shall be granted only if it completely disposes of a cause of action, an affirmative defense, a claim for damages, or an issue of duty." Even assuming, arguendo, that there is a valid statute of limitations defense under Probate Code section 16460 to the breach of duty and constructive fraud claims arising from the acts disclosed in the Seventh Accounting, summary adjudication of these claims would not dispose of an entire "cause of action, an affirmative defense, a claim for damages, or an issue of duty" pleaded in the Second Amended Petition. Were the Court to grant this motion, the pleaded causes of action and damage claims for breach of duty and constructive fraud would remain, based on the other allegations and the actions described in the Eighth and Ninth Accountings - which the motion does not challenge. At most, granting the requested summary adjudication would merely exclude a category of evidence rather than a cause of action. (See Hindin v. Rust (2004) 118 Cal.App.4th 1247, 1255 [in malicious prosecution case, trial court erred in granting defendant summary adjudication on ground that defendant had probable cause to bring one of its two claims in underlying case because that determination did not dispose of plaintiff's entire cause of action].)Unlike in Lilienthal & Fowler v. Superior Court (1993) 12 Cal. App. 4th 1848, 1854, cited in the Reply, here damages are not sought based on "matters [that] have no relation to each other" and which are "distinct and separate." The Second Amended Petition alleges breach of the duty of loyalty, breach of the duty of care, and constructive fraud based on allegations of years of mismanagement and intentional malfeasance committed by Trustee to the detriment of the beneficiary, up to and including the time periods covered by the Seventh, Eighth, and Ninth accountings, and as allegedly evidenced by the accountings. In light of the rationale for this ruling, it is not necessary to reach Petitioner's relation-back, tolling, and equitable estoppel arguments.Any party wishing to contest this tentative ruling by appearing at the scheduled hearing must so advise other parties and the courtroom clerk (415-551-3702) no later than 4:00 p.m. on October 14, 2020. Remote appearance is strongly encouraged, in conformity with the current General Order of the Probate and Mental Health Division, available on the court's website at https: sfsuperiorcourt.org/divisions/probate.



Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:SEP-17-2020 14:00 PM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:ELIF SONMEZ
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Responses To Request For Production Of Documents And Request For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Respondent's Motion for Further Response to Request for Document Production and for Sanctions is denied. There is insufficient showing that the amount of attorney's fees Petitioner has accrued over the previous twelve years is relevant to determining whether the amount of attorney's fees Respondent is seeking to have borne by the Trust is reasonable and necessary (Donahue v. Donahue (2010) 182 Cal. App. 4th 259). Further, per case law, the contents of the requested invoices is entirely covered by the attorney-client communications privilege (Los Angeles Cty. Bd. of Supervisors v. Sup. Ct (2016) 2 Cal. 5th 282). The competing sanctions requests are both denied. Respondent did not prevail on this motion, and is therefore not entitled to sanctions. Because Petitioner failed to comply with CCP section 2031.240, the establishment of the privilege claim was left to this motion. Accordingly, Petitioner's request for sanctions is also denied.Any party wishing to contest this tentative ruling by appearing at the scheduled hearing must so advise other parties and the courtroom clerk (415-551-3702) no later than 4:00 p.m. on September 16, 2020. Remote appearance is strongly encouraged, in conformity with the current General Order of the Probate and Mental Health Division, available on the court's website at https: sfsuperiorcourt.org/divisions/probate.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:AUG-26-2020 14:00 PM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:ELIF SONMEZ
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Responses To Request For Production Of Documents And Request For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:This motion will be continued to September 17, 2020 at 2:00 pm on the court's own motion.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:JUN-29-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Verified Petition For Order Suspending, Or In The Alternative, Removing Trustee Of The Stanley Chong Kwong Trust
Rulings: Continued to 10/26/2020 to be heard after 10/15/2020 motion.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:DEC-16-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Amended Petition For Breach Of Trust
Rulings: Hearing. appearance required. No examiner notes sent. Issue: case management hearing.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:DEC-04-2019 14:00 PM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:ELIF SONMEZ
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Requiring Petitioner Jennifer Shuk-Han Kwok To Furnish Security As Vexatious Litigant
Rulings:This tentative ruling is issued by Judge Joseph M. Quinn. Respondent Jeanne Kwong's Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. The court takes judicial notice of the thirty documents that are pleadings, orders, judgments and oppositions on file with this court, as well as the December 23, 2013 reporter's transcript. (See Evid. Code, u00A7452, subd. (d).) Notice is limited to the relevant facts properly subject to notice given the materials presented and does not, for example, extend to the truth of assertions in pleadings or transcripts. Respondent's Motion for Order Requiring Petitioner Jennifer Shuk-Han Kwok to Furnish Security as Vexatious Litigant is DENIED. Respondent has not shown that Petitioner falls within one of the definitions of a "vexatious litigant" under CCP u00A7 391. Without having made such a determination, the court cannot order Petitioner to furnish a security under CCP u00A7 391.1. In any event, on this showing the court would not order Petitioner to furnish the requested security under CCP u00A7 391.1Petitioner shall lodge with the clerk in Department 204 by the time set for this hearing a proposed order consistent with this tentative. Any party wishing to contest this tentative ruling by appearing at the scheduled hearing must so advise other parties and the courtroom clerk (415-551-3702) no later than 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, December 3, 2019.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:NOV-13-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Amended Petition For Breach Of Trust
Rulings: Continued to 12/4/19.No response to examiner's email.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:OCT-16-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings: Continued to 12/04/19.Examiner needs more time to complete review.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:SEP-04-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings: Hearing. appearance required.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:AUG-28-2019 14:00 PM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:ELIF SONMEZ
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion Seeking Leave To Amend First Amended Petition
Rulings:This tentative ruling is issued by Judge Joseph M. Quinn. Petitioner's belated request for single assignment of this case is DENIED. The request, which was never noticed and first made in the reply brief on the motion for leave to amend, is not properly before the court. Petitioner's unopposed motion for leave to amend is GRANTED. The court notes, however, that amendment will not excuse prompt adjudication of the petition. Petitioner shall file and serve the Second Amended Petition (as proposed) within 5 days of the date this order is filed. Respondent shall file her responsive pleading within 30 days of the date that Petitioner files and serves the Second Amended Petition. Petitioner shall lodge with the clerk in Department 204 by the time set for this hearing a proposed order consistent with this tentative. Any party wishing to contest this tentative ruling by appearing at the scheduled hearing must so advise other parties and the courtroom clerk (415-551-3702) no later than 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 27, 2019.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:JUL-24-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Amended Petition For Breach Of Trust
Rulings: Continued to 9/11/19.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:JUN-12-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings: Continued to 07/24/19. The parties have stipulated to a continuance.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:DEC-13-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Judgment Creditors Petition To Compel Trustee To Pay Judgment And To Convey Property In Payment Of Judgment
Rulings:continued to january 27, 2017 to be heard by Judge Cheng in 606.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:DEC-05-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition By Jennifer Kwok For Instructions And Damages Re: Trustee'S Sale Of Assets
Rulings:continued to january 27, 2017 to be heard by Judge Cheng in 606.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:OCT-17-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS
Rulings:continued to december 5, 2016 by agreement of counsel.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:APR-13-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Directing Respondent Trustee To Distribute Separate Trust Assets To Trustee Of The Marital Trust
Rulings:OFF CALENDAR. All matters singly assigned to Dept. 613.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:MAR-09-2011 10:30 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Directing Respondent Trustee To Distribute Separate Trust Assets To Trustee Of The Marital Trust
Rulings:Continued to 3/23/11.


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:JAN-19-2011 10:30 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition For Order Directing Respondent Trustee To Distribute Separate Trust Assets To Trustee Of The Marital Trust
Rulings:Hearing


Case Number:*******3019
Case Title:IN RE: STANLEY CHONG KWONG
Court Date:JAN-04-2011 10:30 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:Petition To Determine Ownership Of Promissory Notes And For Order Authorizing And Directing Executor
Rulings:Hearing


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL MORTGAGE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBBINS, B. DOUGLAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRYAN, RICHARD MELONE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOUR-SARKISSIAN, PAUL