This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/17/2016 at 08:28:11 (UTC).

IN RE: LINDSEY YVONNE SELVOG

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 IN RE LINDSEY YVONNE SELVOG was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9265

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE

San Francisco, CA 94109

 

Court Documents

DECREE CHANGING NAME AND GENDER

DECREE CHANGING NAME AND GENDER FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME/GENDER

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE HEARING SET FOR JUN-25-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME AND GENDER

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME AND GENDER FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:IFP)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME/GENDER

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER) 2/11, 2/18, 2/25, 3/4, 2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME AND GENDER FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • COPYING FEES (3 PAGE, 3 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF JUN-25-2013, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: SONIA WONG, CSR#11288. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-25-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE HEARING SET FOR JUN-25-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF APR-04-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME OFF CALENDAR. NO APPEARANCE. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: SONIA WONG, CSR#11288. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER) 2/11, 2/18, 2/25, 3/4, 2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME AND GENDER FILED BY PETITIONER SELVOG, LINDSEY YVONNE JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less