This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/17/2016 at 08:27:56 (UTC).

IN RE: CEDDRIC ANTONIO WILCOX

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 IN RE CEDDRIC ANTONIO WILCOX was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9263

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILCOX, CEDRIC ANTONIO

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant

CEDDRIC ANTONIO WILCOX

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER WILCOX, CEDRIC ANTONIO JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:IFP)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER) FEB 2, 18, 25, MAR 4, 2013

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME/GENDER

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER WILCOX, CEDRIC ANTONIO HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME/GENDER

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER WILCOX, CEDRIC ANTONIO HEARING SET FOR JUN-25-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2013
  • UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF JUN-25-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME OFF CALENDAR - NO APPEARANCE. PROOF OF PUBLICATION ON FILE. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: SONIA WONG, CSR#11288. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER WILCOX, CEDRIC ANTONIO HEARING SET FOR JUN-25-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF APR-04-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME OFF CALENDAR. NO APPEARANCE. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: SONIA WONG, CSR#11288. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER) FEB 2, 18, 25, MAR 4, 2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER WILCOX, CEDRIC ANTONIO HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PETITIONER WILCOX, CEDRIC ANTONIO (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER WILCOX, CEDRIC ANTONIO ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER WILCOX, CEDRIC ANTONIO JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less