This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/17/2016 at 08:27:50 (UTC).

IN RE: CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA ROSALES

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 IN RE CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA ROSALES was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9262

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROSALES, CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA

San Francisco, CA 94109

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER) 2/11, 2/18, 2/25, 3/4, 2013

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME/GENDER

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER ROSALES, CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER ROSALES, CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:IFP)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2013
  • UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF AUG-06-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME OFF CALENDAR. NO APPEARANCE. PROOF OF PUBLICATION ON FILE. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: SONIA WONG, CSR#11288. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF APR-04-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME CONTINUED TO AUG-06-2013 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 514. PETITIONER CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA ROSALES PRESENT IN COURT. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: SONIA WONG, CSR#11288. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER) 2/11, 2/18, 2/25, 3/4, 2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PETITIONER ROSALES, CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER ROSALES, CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER ROSALES, CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER ROSALES, CAROLYN GARCIA LUNA JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less