Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:53:29 (UTC).

ILEKTRA RACHOUITSA VS. RACHEL ELLEN ARAM

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 ILEKTRA RACHOUITSA filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against RACHEL ELLEN ARAM. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3088

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RACHOUITSA, ILEKTRA

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendant

ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

San Francisco, CA 94114

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER TO RECALL ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT ORDER (BENCH WARRANT - ISSUED ON MAY 21, 2014) SIGNED AND FILED.

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE ON BENCH WARRANT - ISSUED MAY 21, 2014;(REMARK:SERVICE WAS UNSUCESSFUL BECAUSE DEFENDANT WAS NOT FOUND) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RACHOUITSA, ILEKTRA AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

Warrant of Attachment

WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT ISSUED, BAIL SET AT $500.00, WARRANT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 506 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW. AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

ORDER TO RECALL BENCH WARRANT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 506 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW & SIGNATURE.

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE HEARING SET FOR MAR-03-2014 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:60.00)

Bench Letter

SMALL CLAIMS OEX CALENDAR OF MAR-03-2014 IS CONTINUED TO APR-28-2014 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 506 BENCH LETTER ISSUED.

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-18-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT TO AUG-30-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

SIGNED AND SEALED (ORIGINAL) BENCH WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT ORDER FORWARDED TO SHERIFF'S DEPT.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 0.00 - SERVED MAR-05-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

Motion - Denied

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY RACHEL ELLEN ARAM ON NOV-22-2013 - DENIED. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: SAMUEL C. LAW. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT(S) REQUEST TO POSTPONE THE MAR-18-2013 SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (DEFENDANT MADE PAYMENT IN FULL TO THE COURT ON AUG-06-2014) AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $3,980.00 FILED BY RACHOUITSA, ILEKTRA AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-18-2013 AT 05:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

Warrant of Attachment Returned by Sheriff

WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT RETURNED BY SHERIFF, UNSERVED, (REMARK:SERVICE WAS UNSUCESSFUL BECAUSE DEFENDANT WAS NOT FOUND) AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE HEARING SET FOR NOV-22-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:20.00)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE ON BENCH WARRANT - ISSUED MAY 21, 2014;(REMARK:SERVICE WAS UNSUCESSFUL BECAUSE DEFENDANT WAS NOT FOUND) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RACHOUITSA, ILEKTRA AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT RETURNED BY SHERIFF, UNSERVED, (REMARK:SERVICE WAS UNSUCESSFUL BECAUSE DEFENDANT WAS NOT FOUND) AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $4,407.61 RE 32833 FOR TRANSACTION W0614807D003 (DEPOSIT OF JUDGMENT), PAYABLE TO ILEKTRA RACHOUITSA, DOC #1906285295, WARRANT #38203428, DATED SEP-11-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S REQUEST FOR FUNDS (COPY FORWARDED TO ACCOUNTING DEPT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RACHOUITSA, ILEKTRA AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO RECALL ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT ORDER (BENCH WARRANT - ISSUED ON MAY 21, 2014) SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO RECALL BENCH WARRANT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 506 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW & SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (DEFENDANT MADE PAYMENT IN FULL TO THE COURT ON AUG-06-2014) AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR OF DEPOSIT OF FILED BY DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DEPOSIT OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR ($4,030.00+$377.61=$4,407.61) BY DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE (Fee:4407.61)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED AND SEALED (ORIGINAL) BENCH WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT ORDER FORWARDED TO SHERIFF'S DEPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE HEARING SET FOR NOV-22-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF RACHOUITSA, ILEKTRA RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE $3,980.00 PRINCIPAL, $50.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,030.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF AUG-30-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF AUG-30-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF AUG-30-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 0.00 - SERVED MAR-05-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-18-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT TO AUG-30-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT(S) REQUEST TO POSTPONE THE MAR-18-2013 SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $3,980.00 FILED BY RACHOUITSA, ILEKTRA AS TO DEFENDANT ARAM, RACHEL ELLEN AKA - CARDIO-TONE ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-18-2013 AT 05:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less