Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/09/2018 at 16:08:43 (UTC).

IAN LEIPPER VS. THE PEOPLE

Case Summary

On 09/15/2015 IAN LEIPPER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE PEOPLE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN K. STEWART and TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7938

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN K. STEWART

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Appellants and Defendant / Cross Appellants

LEIPPER, IAN

Tiburon, CA 94920

LEIPPER, IAN 4 CIRCLE DRIVE, APT F TIBURON, CA 94920

Defendant

THE PEOPLE

 

Court Documents

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-14-2017 CONTINUED TO FEB-27-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). "NOTE: ANY REQUEST FOR STAY ORDER MUST BE MADE TO DEPARTMENT 302." NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-10-2017 CONTINUED TO APR-11-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

REMITTITUR

REMITTITUR DISMISSED A147633 DIV 1

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN AS TO DEFENDANT THE PEOPLE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-17-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-16-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-25-2016 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:IFP)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN SERVED DEC-21-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE PEOPLE

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-17-2016 CONTINUED TO MAR-30-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-10-2016 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE MAR-30-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-27-2018 CONTINUED TO JUN-26-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). ***NOTE: ANY REQUEST FOR A STAY ORDER MUST BE MADE IN DEPT. 302.*** THE FEB-27-2018 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBSTRUCTION OF JUSTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN SERVED JAN-27-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT THE PEOPLE

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-21-2016 CONTINUED TO SEP-27-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). ** NOTE: PLAINTIFF TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110(I). CORRESPONDENCE IS INSUFFICIENT. ** THE JUN-21-2016 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-10-2016 CONTINUED TO JUN-21-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE MAY-10-2016 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN (Fee:IFP)

NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT LEIPPER, IAN (Fee:IFP)

NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL

NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL FILED BY CROSS-APPELLANT LEIPPER, IAN (Fee:IFP)

ORDER

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 12/22/15 A147337 DIV 1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2016
  • Payment : NOTICE OF APPEAL - CLERKS DEPOSIT; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : R0616126A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Payment : NOTICE OF APPEAL - CLERKS DEPOSIT; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : R2115C30A002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : R4715C28F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : W0815915F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-27-2018 CONTINUED TO JUN-26-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). ***NOTE: ANY REQUEST FOR A STAY ORDER MUST BE MADE IN DEPT. 302.*** THE FEB-27-2018 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OBSTRUCTION OF JUSTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-14-2017 CONTINUED TO FEB-27-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). "NOTE: ANY REQUEST FOR STAY ORDER MUST BE MADE TO DEPARTMENT 302." NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-14-2017 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-17-2016 CONTINUED TO MAR-30-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL FILED BY CROSS-APPELLANT LEIPPER, IAN (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT LEIPPER, IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT LEIPPER, IAN (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN SERVED DEC-21-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT THE PEOPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIPPER, IAN AS TO DEFENDANT THE PEOPLE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-17-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-16-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-25-2016 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less