Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:20 (UTC).

IAN CARY VS. CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 IAN CARY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8468

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARY, IAN

Defendants

CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SF INDIEFEST, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

DOES 1 TO 50, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALIVANDIVAFA, ALIREZA

1 Sansome St., Ste 3500, #345

San Francisco, CA 94104-4889

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Alireza Alivandivafa in response to order to show cause

DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100000224) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100009506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN AS TO DEFENDANT SF INDIEFEST, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN AS TO DEFENDANT CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SF INDIEFEST, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN DOES 1 TO 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

Declaration of alireza alivandivafa in response to order to show cause

DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100004232) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100016701), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN SERVED MAR-21-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-07-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE JAN-07-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-03-2015 CONTINUED TO JUN-02-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S); AND FILE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

MINUTE ORDER RE:

MINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE

Declaration fo alireza alivandivafa in support of application to serve

DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 100013971) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100000224) FILED BY ATTORNEY ALIVANDIVAFA, ALIREZA

Declaration of alireza alivandivafa in response to order to show cause

DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100017545) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

REQUEST FOR OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 15151116) AS TO DEFENDANT SF INDIEFEST, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-01-2015 CONTINUED TO MAR-01-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. *** NOTICE: IMPENDING DISCRETIONARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 583.410 AND 583.420 (A(1) *** NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100017545) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100016701), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN SERVED MAR-21-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-01-2016 CONTINUED TO MAY-03-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. *** NOTICE: IMPENDING MANDATORY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 583.210 AND 583.250. *** THE MAR-01-2016 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 100013971) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 100013971) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; (TRANSACTION ID # 100013956) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-01-2015 CONTINUED TO MAR-01-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. *** NOTICE: IMPENDING DISCRETIONARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 583.410 AND 583.420 (A(1) *** NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-01-2015 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100009506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-01-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE AUG-21-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-21-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN SERVED MAR-01-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT SF INDIEFEST, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN SERVED MAR-01-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARY, IAN AS TO DEFENDANT CELLSPACE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SF INDIEFEST, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN DOES 1 TO 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less