This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 02:42:39 (UTC).

HYE-YOUNG SHIN VS. NATIONAL SURGICAL

Case Summary

On 10/30/2013 HYE-YOUNG SHIN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NATIONAL SURGICAL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5147

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIN, HYE-KYOUNG AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY

ASPEN SURGERY, LLC

NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELCH, MICHAEL TIMOTHY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL T. WELCH

Four Embarcadero Center, 39Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

ROCUSH, ERICA K

Attorney at OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMAOK & STEWART, P.C.STEUART TOWER, STE 1300SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIN, HYE-KYOUNG AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-02-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-30-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-10-2014 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIN, HYE-KYOUNG AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE ASPEN SURGERY, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED (1ST AMD) TO PLAINTIFF SHIN, HYE-KYOUNG AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC (Fee:450.00)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-02-2014 CONTINUED TO MAY-14-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITAL, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-08-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY-14-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO NTC OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-26-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORER CONTINUING TRIAL FROM JANUARY 26, 2015, TO MARCH 2, 2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL FROM MARCH 2, 2015 TO APRIL 27, 2015 PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2015
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR APR-27-2015 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 12/18/14. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-02-2015 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON APR-27-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER EX PARTE ORDER DATED 11/7/14. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL FROM MARCH 2, 2015 TO APRIL 27, 2015 PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • POS OF EX PARTE APPLICAITON FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, DEC AND STIPULATION FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL FROM MARCH 2, 2015 TO APRIL 28, 2015 FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • STIPULATION CONTINUING TRIAL DATE TO APRIL 28, 2015 FILED BY ASPEN SURGERY, LLC SHIN, HYE-KYOUNG AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-02-2014 CONTINUED TO MAY-14-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DECLARATION OF SHAWNDRA SIMPSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT GUENTHNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC. (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC. HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY, LLC (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED (1ST AMD) TO PLAINTIFF SHIN, HYE-KYOUNG AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIN, HYE-KYOUNG AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE ASPEN SURGERY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIN, HYE-KYOUNG AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL SURGICAL HOSPITALS, INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-02-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-30-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-10-2014 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less