Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 21:43:15 (UTC).

HONG ONG VS. SALON BELLE LINDA, A BUSINESS ENTITY et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2010 HONG ONG filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SALON BELLE LINDA, A BUSINESS ENTITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2089

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONG, HONG

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

THUY LE, DBA SALON BELLE LINDA

DAO, TONY

SALON BELLE LINDA, A BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, DOUGLAS A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS A. KAHN

1299 Fourth Street, Suite 307

San Rafael, CA 94901

Defendant Attorney

SIMONIAN, GREGORY CHARLES

Attorney at CASAS RILEY & SIMONIAN, LLP

One First Street, Suite 2

Loa Altos, CA 94022

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONG, HONG AS TO DEFENDANT SALON BELLE LINDA, A BUSINESS ENTITY DAO, TONY DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-30-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-01-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-15-2010 (Fee:370.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONG, HONG SERVED AUG-04-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-24-2010 ON DEFENDANT DAO, TONY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONG, HONG SERVED AUG-04-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-24-2010 ON DEFENDANT SALON BELLE LINDA, A BUSINESS ENTITY

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAO, TONY THUY LE, DBA SALON BELLE LINDA (Fee:740.00)

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR FEB-23-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-01-2011 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 503. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-18-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-30-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAO, TONY THUY LE, DBA SALON BELLE LINDA

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR APR-12-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. FEB-23-2011 MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-12-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2011
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-18-2011 VACATED. A DISMISSAL WAS FILED ON 3/11/11. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-01-2011 - DISMISSAL ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-12-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR APR-12-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. FEB-23-2011 MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAO, TONY THUY LE, DBA SALON BELLE LINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-01-2011 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 503. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-18-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-30-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR FEB-23-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONG, HONG JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAO, TONY THUY LE, DBA SALON BELLE LINDA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAO, TONY THUY LE, DBA SALON BELLE LINDA (Fee:740.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONG, HONG SERVED AUG-04-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-24-2010 ON DEFENDANT SALON BELLE LINDA, A BUSINESS ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONG, HONG SERVED AUG-04-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-24-2010 ON DEFENDANT DAO, TONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONG, HONG AS TO DEFENDANT SALON BELLE LINDA, A BUSINESS ENTITY DAO, TONY DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-30-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-01-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-15-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less