This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/26/2017 at 04:25:10 (UTC).

HIUYAN LAM VS. BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 HIUYAN LAM filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5982

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAM, HIUYAN AN INDIVIDUAL

Respondents

OFFICE OF THE TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

OFFICE OF THE ASSESSOR-RECORDER OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Interested Party

PRESIDIO TERRACE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YOO, TIMOTHY B.

Attorney at BIRD, MARELLA, BOXER, WOLPERT, NESSIM

1875 Century Park East, 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W0917C22F010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION ; VERIFICATION ; DECLARATION OF RAY S. SEILIE IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY PETITIONER LAM, HIUYAN AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO RESPONDENT BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF THE TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF THE ASSESSOR-RECORDER OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5982
Case Title:HIUYAN LAM VS. BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN ET AL
Court Date:MAR-09-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION / Notice Of Motion And Motion To Expunge Lis Pendens
Rulings:Real property/Housing Court Law & Motion Calendar for Mar-9-2018 Line 1 .REAL PARTY IN INTEREST PRESIDIO TERRACE ASSOCIATION MOTION / Notice Of Motion And Motion To Expunge Lis Pendens OFF CALENDAR, re-noticed for March 22, 2018. =(501/GD)


Case Number:*******5982
Case Title:HIUYAN LAM VS. BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN ET AL
Court Date:MAR-22-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, March 22, 2018, Line 2. REAL PARTY IN INTEREST PRESIDIO TERRACE ASSOCIATION'S DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION. Continued to May 4, 2018. Opposing party is ordered to comply with SFLR 2.7B and provide courtesy copy of opposition to Department 501 no later than April 13, 2018 with a cover letter reflecting new hearing date. =(501/REQ)


Case Number:*******5982
Case Title:HIUYAN LAM VS. BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN ET AL
Court Date:MAY-04-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday, May 4, 2018, Line 1. RESPONDENTS SAN FRANCISCO BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR, ASSESSOR-RECORDER'S DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION. OVERRULED. Petition sufficiently states both claims. =(501/REQ)


Case Number:*******5982
Case Title:HIUYAN LAM VS. BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN ET AL
Court Date:JUL-26-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Writ Of Administrative Mandate
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for July 26, 2019 line 1.PETITIONER HIUYAN LAM's Motion For Writ Of Administrative MandateOFF CALENDAR, re-noticed for August 22, 2019. = (501/CFH)


Case Number:*******5982
Case Title:HIUYAN LAM VS. BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN ET AL
Court Date:SEP-17-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Amended Notice Of Hearing Date Re Motion For Writ Of Administrative Mandate
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Sep 17, 2019 line 1.PETITIONER HIUYAN LAM Amended Notice Of Hearing Date Re Motion For Writ Of Administrative MandateTentative Ruling provided to the parties via e-mail.=(501/RBU)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOO TIMOTHY B.