This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:29:24 (UTC).

HERMAN ROANHORSE VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2007 HERMAN ROANHORSE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4399

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION

RILEY POWER INC.

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP.

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS THE ALTERNATE ENTITY OF BROADWAY PLUMBING CO., INC. AND BROADWAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION , F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

DOES 1-8500

UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

C.H. MURPHY/CLARK-ULLMAN, INC.

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

PHARMACIA CORPORATION WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS PHARMACIA PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

RILEY POWER, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALTERNATE ENTITY BABOCK BORSIG POWER, INC., DB RILEY, INC., RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, BADEN HAUSEN, UNION IRON WORKS, UNION IRON WORKS OF SPOKANE, WA)

TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC.

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KELLER, GEORGE JOSEPH

Attorney at MCMILLAN & SHUREEN LLP

50 Santa Rosa Avenue, Ste 200

Santa Rosa, CA 95404-4952

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

GOETZ, ANDY J.

CAMPAGNE, INGRID A.

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SPOMER III, JOHN E.

Attorney at BULLIVANT HOUSER BAILEY PC

1415 L Street, Suite 1000

Sacramento, CA 95814

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

GILBERT, PETER RAY

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue, P.O. Box 16070

Oakland, CA 94610

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

RHOADES, RALPH

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY, LLP

100 Bush Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

GILHULY, ROBERT MORGAN

Attorney at BARG COFFIN LEWIS & TRAPP, LLP

350 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-1435

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT J.T.THORPE & SON, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17592738) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Pacific Gas and Electric Companys Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17733690) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24251824) AS TO DEFENDANT PHARMACIA CORPORATION WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS PHARMACIA PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF SUJITH DIVAKARAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SWINERTON BUILDERS?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF SUJITH DIVAKARAN IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFT SWINERTON BUILDERS' MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 25703767) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROANHORSE, HERMAN

DEFENDANT SIMPSON PAPER COMPANYa??S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE USE OF DEPOSITIONS TAKEN IN OTHER ACTIONS

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE USE OF DEPOSITIONS TAKEN IN OTHER ACTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 25848279) FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMPSON PAPER COMPANY

SIMPSON PAPER COMPANYa??S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES (TRANSACTION ID # 25848279) FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMPSON PAPER COMPANY

DEFENDANT SIMPSON PAPER COMPANYa??S MOTION REGARDING APPORTIONMENT OF DAMAGES BETWEEN CIGARETTE SMOKING AND ASBESTOS EXPOSURE

MOTION REGARDING APPORTIONMENT OF DAMAGES BETWEEN CIGARETTE SMOKING AND ASBESTOS EXPOSURE (TRANSACTION ID # 25848279) FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMPSON PAPER COMPANY

Request for Dismissal, as to Complaint only, With Prejudice, as to Defendant Consolidated Insulation, Inc. only.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26306246) AS TO DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

Request for Dismissal & POS

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS.(TRANSACTION ID # 27255445) AS TO DEFENDANT SANTA FE BRAUN, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO C.F. BRAUN, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (ASBESTOS)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17520862) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Substitution of Attorney; Proof of Service

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 19150960): CLEAVINGER, MARC D. SUBSTITUTED FOR GOETZ, ANDY J. AS ATTORNEY FOR UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION ONLY

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21765391) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Swinerton Builders Motion for Summary Judgment

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 24046137) FILED BY DEFENDANT SWINERTON BUILDERS FKA SWINERTON & WALBERG CO.,

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 25342341) FILED BY DEFENDANT SWINERTON BUILDERS FKA SWINERTON & WALBERG CO.,

SIMPSON PAPER COMPANYa??S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE CONCERNING THE BANKRUPTCY OF ABSENT DEFENDANTS

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE CONCERNING THE BANKRUPTCY OF ABSENT DEFENDANTS (TRANSACTION ID # 25848279) FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMPSON PAPER COMPANY

SIMPSON PAPER COMPANYa??S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT SPECIAL DAMAGES FOR MEDICAL EXPENSES TO THOSE ACTUALLY PAID

MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT SPECIAL DAMAGES FOR MEDICAL EXPENSES TO THOSE ACTUALLY PAID (TRANSACTION ID # 25848279) FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMPSON PAPER COMPANY

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE WORKERS COMPENSATION RECORDS OF FOSTER WHEELER MIL 18

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE WORKERS COMPENSATION RECORDS OF FOSTER WHEELER MIL 18 (TRANSACTION ID # 32796257) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE RE A CONTINUING DUTY TO WARN AND POST-SALE CONDUCT OR KNOWLEDGE MIL 30

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE RE A CONTINUING DUTY TO WARN AND POST-SALE CONDUCT OR KNOWLEDGE MIL 30 (TRANSACTION ID # 32796257) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

214 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2011
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 23735 FOR TRANSACTION W2109622J026 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1903823897, WARRANT #38200911, DATED JUL-11-2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37645069)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (AS TO DEFENDANTS SIMPSON PAPER COMPANY, HUMBOLDT BAY PULP COMPANY, SIMPSON TIMBER COMPANY, CROWN-SIMPSON PULP COMPANY, AND CROWN-ZELERBACH CORPORATION ONLY) (TRANSACTION ID # 37286909)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37205601) AS TO DEFENDANT SIMPSON PAPER COMPANY HUMBOLDT BAY PULP COMPANY SIMPSON TIMBER COMPANY CROWN-SIMPSON PULP COMPANY CROWN-ZELERBACH CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36901114) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35493368) AS TO DEFENDANT TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
244 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 17521074) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS THE ALTERNATE ENTITY OF BROADWAY PLUMBING CO., INC. AND BROADWAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIAS OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 17521074) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS THE ALTERNATE ENTITY OF BROADWAY PLUMBING CO., INC. AND BROADWAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIAS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 17521074) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS THE ALTERNATE ENTITY OF BROADWAY PLUMBING CO., INC. AND BROADWAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17521074) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS THE ALTERNATE ENTITY OF BROADWAY PLUMBING CO., INC. AND BROADWAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY / DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 17520928) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17520862) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17451112) FILED BY DEFENDANT RILEY POWER, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALTERNATE ENTITY BABOCK BORSIG POWER, INC., DB RILEY, INC., RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, BADEN HAUSEN, UNION IRON WORKS, UNION IRON WORKS OF SPOKANE, WA) (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROANHORSE, HERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROANHORSE, HERMAN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-16-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less