This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/25/2023 at 06:23:50 (UTC).

HENRY SALM VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2008 HENRY SALM filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, HAROLD E. KAHN, PANG LY, CHARLENE P. KIESSELBACH, KATHERINE FEINSTEIN and JAMES J. MCBRIDE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4753

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

HAROLD E. KAHN

PANG LY

CHARLENE P. KIESSELBACH

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALM, HENRY

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

PLANT INSULATION CO.

WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

SCANDURA, INC.

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

SCHLAGE LOCK COMPANY

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

TUBE CITY IMS CORPORATION

BORG-WARNER CORP. BY ITS SII, BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

MARSHCO AUTO PARTS, INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS MARSHCO, INC.

TERRY CORPORATION OF CONNECTICUT

DOES 1-8500

DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FORMERLY KNOWN AS DANA CORPORATION)

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

OBERG, LISA L

LANKFORD, PAUL V

OSTHIMER, CHARLES EDWARD

POLLACK, DEAN

Other Attorneys

HUIE, JEREMY D.

BUTY, MADELINE L

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

OSTERTAG, JAMES J

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

GAMBA, PAUL JOSEPH

ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM HENRY

REYNOLDS, RICHARD LEROY

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

POND, FRANK D

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

GROUPED FOR TRIAL WITH BRAYTON GROUP 540 - DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO ABSENCE OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVES AT TRIAL [MIL #52]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO ABSENCE OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVES AT TRIAL [MIL #52] (TRANSACTION ID # 35323937) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27366699) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGIENISTS, INC. ASBESTOS MANUFACTURING COMPANY AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD. BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY FORCEE MANUFACTURING CORPORATION H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY L.J. MILEY COMPANY LASCO BRAKE PRODUCTS LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP. MAREMONT CORPORATION METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. NATIONAL TRANSPORT SUPPLY, INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. PNEUMO ABEX LLC RITESET MANUFACTURING COMPANY ROSSENDALE-RUBOIL COMPANY SILVER LINE PRDUCTS, INC. SOUTHERN FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. STANDCO, INC. STUART-WESTERN, INC. THE BUDD COMPANY U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY UNDERWRITERS LABORATORIES, INC. UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL; SEVERING CASE FROM GROUP AND ADVANCING TRIAL DATE; AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL; SEVERING CASE FROM GROUP AND ADVANCING TRIAL DATE; AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 31429744) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SALM, HENRY HEARING SET FOR JUL-01-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:40.00)

GROUPED FOR TRIAL WITH BRAYTON GROUP 540 - EXHIBITS B THROUGH K TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL LANNUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS SCIENTIFIC CAUSATION EVIDENCE TO THE EXTENT IT DOES NOT DEMONSTRATE R

EXHIBITS B THROUGH K TO THE DECL OF PAUL LANNUS IN SUPPORT OF MO IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLTF'S SCIENTIFIC CAUSATION EVIDENCE TO THE EXTENT IT DOES NOT DEMONSTRATE RELATIVE RISK GREATER THAN 2.0 [MIL #3] (TRANSACTION ID # 35323937) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Answer of Defendant Quintec Industries, Inc. to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26952296) FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:370.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF (TRANSACTION ID # 36463441) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SALM, HENRY

Dismissal as to Tube City IMS Corporation

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32689829) AS TO DEFENDANT TUBE CITY IMS CORPORATION

DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES (ASBESTOS)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22893129) FILED BY DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant Ford Motor Company; Proof of Service

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 26087779): LANKFORD, PAUL V SUBSTITUTED FOR THOMAS, ANTHONY S. AS ATTORNEY FOR FORD MOTOR COMPANY

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketREFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 26894 FOR TRANSACTION R1610A06J026 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1905838454, WARRANT #38203153, DATED FEB-19-2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • HearingMatter(s): DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Off Calendar Aug-16-2012 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON AUG-16-2012. OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK/R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44294224) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-19-2012 TO AUG-16-2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR #5915, FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • HearingMatter(s): DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Off Calendar Apr-19-2012 Continued To Aug-16-12 At 01:30 P.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 42662489)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO THE ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-19-2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • HearingMatter(s): DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Off Calendar Dec-15-2011 Continued To Apr-19-12 At 01:30 P.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40261642) AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
212 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21713542) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21705940) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CO.; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $335; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B5208924F005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21656747) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUBE CITY IMS CORPORATION; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $335; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B5208923F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21638505) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2008
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF SALM, HENRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2008
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $335; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W3208729F008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SALM, HENRY AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-20-2009; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less