Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 05:32:52 (UTC).

HAN YONG CHOI VS. SURE ROOFING SYSTEM, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2011 HAN YONG CHOI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SURE ROOFING SYSTEM, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3069

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOI, HAN YONG

Defendants

DOES 1 THRU 10

SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.

SURE ROOFING SYSTEM, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZYDLIK, JASON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JASON SZYDLIK

5616 Geary Boulevard Suite 212

San Francisco, CA 94121

Defendant Attorney

NELSON, ROBERT S.

Attorney at THE NELSON LAW GROUP

26 West Portal Ave., Ste 1

San Francisco, CA 94127

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG AS TO DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEM, INC. DOES 1 THRU 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-06-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-03-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-22-2011 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC. (Fee:410.00)

ANSWER

AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-09-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-06-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO ROBERT S. NELSON SET FOR APR-26-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM POLICIES AND PROCEDURES NO. 4 (ADMINISTRATIVE FEE). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY NELSON, ROBERT S.

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

MTN FOR JUDGMNT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG HEARING SET FOR JUN-11-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND OTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG HEARING SET FOR JUN-19-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-09-2012. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 6/7/12. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON AUG-28-2012 AT 2:00 PM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-28-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-28-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-09-2012. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 6/7/12. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON AUG-28-2012 AT 2:00 PM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-11-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF HAN CHOI MTN FOR JUDGMNT ON THE PLEADINGS IS OFF CALENDAR PER THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; COURT REPORTER: LAVENA WARD CSR #7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DISCOVERY 302, MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS (SET FOR HEARING ON JUN-19-2012) IS OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND OTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG HEARING SET FOR JUN-19-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MTN FOR JUDGMNT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG HEARING SET FOR JUN-11-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM POLICIES AND PROCEDURES NO. 4. (ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) IS ORDERED OFF CALENDAR AND DISSOLVED/FEE PAID. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-09-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-06-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, PLAINTIFF HANG CHOI'S DEMURRER TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, SET FOR OCT-31-2011, IS OFF CALENDAR PER MOVING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • DEMURRER TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG HEARING SET FOR OCT-31-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC. (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOI, HAN YONG AS TO DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEM, INC. DOES 1 THRU 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-06-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-03-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-22-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NELSON, ROBERT S