This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:41:39 (UTC).

GORDON C. LOUIE VS. GIA D. HUYNH et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 GORDON C LOUIE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GIA D HUYNH. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4184

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

HUYNH, GIA D.

San Francisco, CA 94133

WONG, DAVID

San Francisco, CA 94133

DOES 1 TO 20, INCL.

San Francisco, CA 94133

HUYNH, NHAN C. AKA JOHNNY HUYNH

San Francisco, CA 94133

WONG, WILLIAM AKA TAM TRUNG TRAN

San Francisco, CA 94133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, STEVEN C

Attorney at FRIED & WILLIAMS LLP

177 Post St., Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorney

CHEN, JEFFREY A

Attorney at JEFFREY A. CHEN

766 Harrison Street, Suite 101

San Francisco, CA 94107

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 SERVED FEB-13-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT WONG, DAVID

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY WILLIAMS, STEVEN C

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HUYNH, NHAN C. AKA JOHNNY HUYNH (Fee:225.00)

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 AS TO DEFENDANT HUYNH, GIA D. WONG, DAVID

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT HUYNH, GIA D. WONG, DAVID

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 SERVED FEB-13-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT HUYNH, GIA D.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 SERVED FEB-04-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WONG, WILLIAM AKA TAM TRUNG TRAN

Notice to Defendants

NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 AS TO DEFENDANT HUYNH, GIA D. HUYNH, NHAN C. AKA JOHNNY HUYNH WONG, WILLIAM AKA TAM TRUNG TRAN WONG, DAVID DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AS TO GIA D. HUYNH, NHAN C. HUYNH A.K.A. JOHNNY HUYNH AND DAVID WONG

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT WONG, WILLIAM AKA TAM TRUNG TRAN

REQUEST TO SET FOR TRIAL

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 HEARING SET FOR JUL-01-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

DEMAND FOR JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT HUYNH, NHAN C. AKA JOHNNY HUYNH

EX PARTE APPLIC FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 (Fee:20.00)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Settlement Hearing

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR JUN-26-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 501

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2013
  • REMOVED FROM UD COURT TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-08-2013 - CASE SETTLED PURSUANT TO THE PHONE CALL OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • UD COURT TRIAL SET FOR JUL-01-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-08-2013 AT 9:00 AM IN 501 FOR SETTLEMENT PROTECTIVE DATE. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • CONVERT TO COURT TRIAL, NO DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES OR JURY FEE WAIVER ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD, CASE NOT SETTLED. THE TRIAL DATE OF JUL-01-2013 REMAINS ON CALENDAR. (501/JPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-26-2013 01:30 PM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR JUN-26-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 HEARING SET FOR JUL-01-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT HUYNH, GIA D. WONG, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 SERVED FEB-13-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT WONG, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 SERVED FEB-13-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT HUYNH, GIA D.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 AS TO DEFENDANT HUYNH, GIA D. WONG, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT WONG, WILLIAM AKA TAM TRUNG TRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 SERVED FEB-04-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WONG, WILLIAM AKA TAM TRUNG TRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 AS TO DEFENDANT WONG, WILLIAM AKA TAM TRUNG TRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT HUYNH, NHAN C. AKA JOHNNY HUYNH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HUYNH, NHAN C. AKA JOHNNY HUYNH (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AS TO GIA D. HUYNH, NHAN C. HUYNH A.K.A. JOHNNY HUYNH AND DAVID WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LOUIE, GORDON C. AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE LOUIE FAMILY TRUST DATED 11/30/99 AS TO DEFENDANT HUYNH, GIA D. HUYNH, NHAN C. AKA JOHNNY HUYNH WONG, WILLIAM AKA TAM TRUNG TRAN WONG, DAVID DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less