This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 11:41:26 (UTC).

GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA VS. MARK DE JONG et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2010 GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC , A CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARK DE JONG. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6260

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER

Defendants

BARRY, PAMELA A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ALSO KNOWN AS MERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BARRY, DOUGLAS A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL

VERSACE, CHRISTOPHER ROQUE ALSO KNOWN AS ROQUE VERSACE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST

BODE CONCRETE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION

U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK ALSO KNOWN AS USAA FSB

VERSACE, KARINE A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST

ECHARTEA, JUAN ,TRUSTEE

BLOEMENDAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEDSTROM, BRIAN P.

Attorney at GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC.

855 Lakeville Street, Ste 200

Petaluma, CA 94952

Defendant Attorney

KUHNER, CHRIS D.

Attorney at KORNFIELD, PAUL & NYBERG, P.C.

1999 Harrison St., Suite 2675

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-10-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL $15,528.16 PRINCIPAL, $2,825.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $686.61 INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $19,039.77, SEE SCANNED DOC

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER AS TO DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL

COMPLAINT

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER AS TO DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL BLOEMENDAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VERSACE, CHRISTOPHER ROQUE ALSO KNOWN AS ROQUE VERSACE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 23, 2007 VERSACE, KARINE A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 23, 2007 BARRY, PAMELA A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999 BARRY, DOUGLAS A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999 MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ALSO KNOWN AS MERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK ALSO KNOWN AS USAA FSB ECHARTEA, JUAN ,TRUSTEE DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-25-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-29-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-10-2010 (Fee:370.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ALSO KNOWN AS MERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BARRY, DOUGLAS A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BARRY, PAMELA A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER AS TO DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL BLOEMENDAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VERSACE, CHRISTOPHER ROQUE ALSO KNOWN AS ROQUE VERSACE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 23, 2007 VERSACE, KARINE A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 23, 2007 BARRY, PAMELA A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999 BARRY, DOUGLAS A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999 MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ALSO KNOWN AS MERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK ALSO KNOWN AS USAA FSB ECHARTEA, JUAN ,TRUSTEE DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION BODE CONCRETE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ALSO KNOWN AS MERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BARRY, DOUGLAS A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BARRY, PAMELA A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER SERVED MAR-02-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO EIGHTH

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO EIGHTH (8TH) AND NINTH (9TH) CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-10-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BLOEMENDAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketEXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:25.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL $15,528.16 PRINCIPAL, $2,825.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $686.61 INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $19,039.77, SEE SCANNED DOC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • DocketUNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF AUG-12-2010, DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING AS TO DEFENDANT MARK DE JONG, ONLY. GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY LOIS JONES, CSR #3689.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • DocketMINI-MINUTES FOR AUG-12-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 218

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-10-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. THE AUG-09-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER AS TO DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL BLOEMENDAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VERSACE, CHRISTOPHER ROQUE ALSO KNOWN AS ROQUE VERSACE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 23, 2007 VERSACE, KARINE A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 23, 2007 BARRY, PAMELA A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999 BARRY, DOUGLAS A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999 MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ALSO KNOWN AS MERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK ALSO KNOWN AS USAA FSB ECHARTEA, JUAN ,TRUSTEE DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION BODE CONCRETE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BARRY, PAMELA A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BARRY, DOUGLAS A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ALSO KNOWN AS MERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION ON STOP NOTICE CLAIM FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN STATE LUMBER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS SIERRA POINT LUMBER AS TO DEFENDANT DE JONG, MARK ALSO KNOWN AS MARK DE LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL BLOEMENDAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VERSACE, CHRISTOPHER ROQUE ALSO KNOWN AS ROQUE VERSACE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 23, 2007 VERSACE, KARINE A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROQUE AND KARINE A VERSACE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 23, 2007 BARRY, PAMELA A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999 BARRY, DOUGLAS A. ,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE 1999 BARRY FAMILY TRUST, UNDER DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 19, 1999 MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ALSO KNOWN AS MERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK ALSO KNOWN AS USAA FSB ECHARTEA, JUAN ,TRUSTEE DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-25-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-29-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-10-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE LUMBER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant