This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/16/2016 at 09:48:14 (UTC).

GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6962

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC

Defendants

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BUONCRISTIANI, DAVID MARTIN

Attorney at JONES DAY

555 California St, #26

San Francisco, CA 94104

HEISSE, JOHN RYAN

Attorney at PILLSBURY WINTHROP SHAW PITTMAN LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

HOLBROOK, ERIN

1120 N St (Ms 57), P.O. Box 1438

Sacramento, CA 95812-1438

 

Court Documents

REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 2 OF 10

REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 2 OF 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 3 OF 10

REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 3 OF 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58449703) FILED BY DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Fee:EXEMPT)

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 58407481) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC

ORDER

ORDER ON STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (OVERRULED)

Golden Link Concessionaire LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO 1 (TRANSACTION ID # 58352086) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC HEARING SET FOR JAN-28-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION NOTICE OF DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION HEARING SET FOR DEC-14-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:EXEMPT)

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58568758) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO 1 - THERE WILL BE A FURTHER HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE PRO TEM ON APRIL 7, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M. ON THIS MOTION AND, IF APPROPRIATE, A HEARING WILL BE SCHEDULED BEFORE THE DEPARTMENT 302 JUDGE AT A LATER DATE. THERE WILL NOT BE ANY HEARING BEFORE THE DEPARTMENT 302 JUDGE ON THIS MOTION ON APRIL 7, 2016. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN. CLERK: ROSIE NOGUERA. REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR #5976.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-07-2016 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DISCOVERY 302, PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO 1. THE PARTIES DO NOT STIPULATE TO THE MATTER BEING DECIDED BY THE JUDGE PRO TEM. DISCUSSED AND THE MATTER IS CONTINUED TO APRIL 28, 2016 AT 9:30 AM TO BE HEARD BEFORE JUDGE KAHN. COUNSEL WILL MEET AND CONFER ON A PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED TO THE JUDGE PRO TEM BY APRIL 21, 2016. IF THE PARTIES ARE IN AGREEMENT THAT THE JUDGE PRO TEM MAY SIGN THE STIPULATED ORDER, THE HEARING ON APRIL 28, 2016 MAY BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. JUDGE PRO TEM: VEDICA PURI, CLERK: E. LARNAUTI, NOT REPORTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-07-2016 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO 1 HEARING SET FOR APR-07-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO 1 IS CONTINUED FROM MARCH 23, 2016 TO APRIL 7, 2016 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPT. 302, LAW & MOTION, PER THE MARCH 21, 2016 EMAIL THAT JUDGE KAHN SENT TO THE JUDGE PRO TEM AND THE PARTIES. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: SEAN KANE; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR #5976 (302/HK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-23-2016 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO. 1 IS CONTINUED FROM MARCH 16, 2016 TO MARCH 23, 2016 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPT. 302, LAW & MOTION. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: SEAN KANE; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR #5976 (302/HK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-16-2016 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-09-2016 CONTINUED TO JUN-08-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 6 OF 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 5 OF 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 4 OF 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 3 OF 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 2 OF 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST OF JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 1 OF 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57753796) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION HEARING SET FOR DEC-14-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-23-2015 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-18-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-30-2015 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6962
Case Title:GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Court Date:APR-28-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff Golden Link Concessionaires Llc'S Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set No 1
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON THURSDAY, APRIL 28, 2016, LINE 9Plaintiff Golden Link Concessionaires Llc'S Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set Number 1Off calendar. The parties stipulated to a form of order that the Judge Pro Tem will execute that renders the motion moot. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =302/HK


Case Number:*******6962
Case Title:GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Court Date:APR-07-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set No 1
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON THURSDAY, APRIL 7, 2016, LINE 11, PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC's Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set No 1There will be a further hearing before the judge pro tem on April 7, 2016 at 9 am on this motion and, if appropriate, a hearing will be scheduled before the department 302 judge at a later date. There will not be any hearing before the department 302 judge on this motion on April 7, 2016. = (302/HK)


Case Number:*******6962
Case Title:GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Court Date:MAR-23-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set No 1
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, March 23, 2016, Line 12, PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC'S Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set No 1 is continued to April 7, 2016 at 9:30 a.m., in Dept. 302 per the March 21, 2016 email that Judge Kahn sent to the judge pro tem and the parties. =(302/HK)


Case Number:*******6962
Case Title:GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Court Date:MAR-16-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set No 1
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, March 16, 2016, Line 12, PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC'S Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set No 1 is off calendar. Plaintiff filed a request for dismissal on February 23, 2016. =(302/HK)


Case Number:*******6962
Case Title:GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Court Date:JAN-28-2016 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set No 1
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, January 28, 2016, Line 6, PLAINTIFF GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC'S Motion To Compel Compliance With Requests For Production Of Documents Set No 1.Pro Tem Judge Vedica Puri, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Hearing required.Any party who contests this tentative ruling must send an email to vpuri@pillsburycoleman.comwith a copy to all other parties by 4pm the court day prior to the hearing stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem Judge hearing the motion and the Pro Tem Judge will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6962
Case Title:GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Court Date:DEC-23-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, December 23, 2015, Line 9, DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA's DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTThe demurrer is overruled. Appendix 1 and the amended version both define "claim" to include "a written demandu00BFfor a time extension or payment of money or damagesu00BF" None of that is present in this declaratory relief action. Accordingly, sec. 24.1.4, which controls the timing of litigation, is inapposite. The complaint sufficiently sets forth several actual/prospective controversies that support a claim for declaratory relief under CCP 1060. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/eg


Case Number:*******6962
Case Title:GOLDEN LINK CONCESSIONAIRES LLC VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Court Date:DEC-14-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, December 14, 2015, line 9. DEFENDANT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. Continued to December 23, 2015 to give Defendant the opportunity to comply with Local Rule 2.6B. Defendant must deliver courtesy copies of the moving papers to Department 302, with a cover letter stating the new hearing date, no later than December 14, 2015 at 4:00 pm or the motion will be denied. Any exhibit must be separated by an exhibit tab per CRC 3.1110(f). The court has courtesy copies of the opposition papers. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =(302/HEK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant