This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/20/2022 at 06:15:46 (UTC).

GODOFREDO PIQUE VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2008 GODOFREDO PIQUE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR, PANG LY, HAROLD E. KAHN, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, EVERETT HEWLETT, PETER J. BUSCH and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4659

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR

PANG LY

HAROLD E. KAHN

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

EVERETT HEWLETT

PETER J. BUSCH

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PIQUE, GREGORY , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED

SANCHEZ, MARLENE , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED

PIQUE, FREDERICK , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

NAVISTAR, INC., FORMERLY KNOWN AS INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT-PRODUCTSMANUFACTURING CO.

TUBE CITY IMS CORPORATION

DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

CRANE CO.

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

SCANDURA, INC.

CSK AUTO, INC.

DEERE & COMPANY

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

KELLY, DANIEL J.

SINUNU, JAMES NAJEEB

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

MAYER, KEVIN COOPER

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

STIMELING, KATHLEEN

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

LANKFORD, PAUL V

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

ROME, HENRY DAVID

HUIE, JEREMY D.

BUTY, MADELINE L

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

SCOTT, STEVEN ROSS

LINDH, PETER ANTHONY

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

GILBERT, PETER RAY

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PERSONAL OPINIONS AND BELIEFS OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL AND EVIDENCE RELATING TO, AND VERDICTS FROM, OTHER ASBESTOS LAWSUITS [MIL #23]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PERSONAL OPINIONS AND BELIEFS OF PLTF'S COUNSEL AND EVIDENCE RELATING TO, AND VERDICTS FROM, OTHER ASBESTOS LAWSUITS [MIL #23] (TRANSACTION ID # 41566786) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Notice of Entry of Order Denying Motion for Trial Preference

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE(TRANSACTION ID # 25773587) FILED BY DEFENDANT DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO FORD MOTOR COMPANY FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFT FORD MOTOR COMPANY TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES ONLY (TRANSACTION ID # 41405917)

DECLARATION OF ROSITA PIQUE UNDER C.C.P. ? 377.32

DECLARATION OF ROSITA PIQUE UNDER C.C.P. 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 32680194) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIQUE, GODOFREDO

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE E.A. MARTIN DOCUMENTS

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE E.A. MARTIN DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 52075698) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIQUE, GODOFREDO PIQUE, ROSITA , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED SANCHEZ, MARLENE , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED PIQUE, GREGORY , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED PIQUE, FREDERICK , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED

Exhibits to the Declaration of Eric D Sentlinger in support of Motion in Limine to regarding Product Identification Based on Hearsay

EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF ERIC D SENTLINGER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE TO REGARDING PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION BASED ON HEARSAY (TRANSACTION ID # 52049129) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO ASSIGNEMNT OF A COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL

DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO ASSIGNEMNT OF A COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 20230533) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

Exhibits to Declaration in support of Honeywell International Inc., fka AlliedSignal, Inc., Successor-In-Interest To The Bendix Corporations Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Consolidate For Trial Wrongful Death Lung Cancer Brayton Cases With Signif

EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR TRIAL WRONGFUL DEATH LUNG CANCER BRAYTON CASES WITH SIGNIFICANT FRICTION EXPOSURES (TRANSACTION ID # 44248115) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

Exhibits to Declaration in support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Causation Testimony and Request for Evidentiary Hearing

EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT CAUSATION TESTIMONY AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 52049129) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

361 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jan-17-2014 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 12/5/13. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Dec-05-2013 Continued To Feb-06-14 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-05-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: RVELUZ/EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54653963)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54394678) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • FinancialPayment: SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE; Amount: $1050.25; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W3613812J011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketSUBSEQUENT JURY FEE [ON 11/12/09, THE COURT GRANTED THE CONSOLIDATION OF THE TWO CASES FOR TRIAL: ROWE (#274238) AND PIQUE (#274659). ORDER FILED ON 12/15/09.] FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIQUE, GODOFREDO PIQUE, GREGORY , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED PIQUE, FREDERICK , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED FEE DEPOSITED BY BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP FOR JURY FEE FOR MAY-13-2013 THROUGH MAY-14-2013 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 611; Fee: $1050.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-01-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, OREN NOAH. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Aug-01-2013 Continued To Dec-05-13 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
530 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 20010119) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20010119) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2008
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $335; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B1408528F015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2008
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $335; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B1408528F014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19993482) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19993482) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIQUE, GODOFREDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $335; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W3208508F017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIQUE, GODOFREDO AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-16-2009; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:CGC08274659
Case Title:GODOFREDO PIQUE VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al
Court Date:DEC-01-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings: ON ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR FOR THURSDAY, DECEMBER 1, 2011 IN DEPARTMENT 503 AT 9:30 A.M., LINE 1, Defendant Honeywell Internationalu00BFs motion for summary adjudication of plaintiffsu00BF request for punitive damages is granted. Defendant sustained its burden of production and plaintiffs did not present sufficient evidence to create a triable issue whether defendant acted with the requisite malice, fraud or oppression by clear and convincing evidence. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:45am. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If a court reporter is needed, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. = (503/TLJ)