This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 16:51:54 (UTC).

GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SQAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED

Case Summary

On 07/06/2012 GMG JANITORIAL, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SQAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARLA J. MILLER, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II and ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2328

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

MARLA J. MILLER

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant

GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Respondents and Defendants

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED CALIFORNIA CITY AND COUNTY

HEARING OFFICER PETER KEARNS, AN INDIVIDUAL IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGE FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, A DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

KEARNS, PETER HEARING OFFICER

OFFICE OF LABOR STANDARS ENFORCEMENT ("OLSE")

OFFICE OF THE CONTROLLER

OFFICE OF THE CONTROLLER, AN OFFICE OF THE CITY AN COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

OFFICE OF LABOR STANDARS ENFORCEMENT, AN OFFICE WITHIN THE DEPARTMENT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES

Interested Parties

ABEA, JAVIER EDUARDO

AGUILAR DOMINGO, FELIX

ABARCA UMANA, JOSE FABRICIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant Attorney

ROBBINS, B. DOUGLAS

Attorney at O'LEARY WOOD & ROBBINS LLP

One Post St., Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

CHHABRIA, VINCE

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY'SFOX PLAZA

1390 Market Street, 5Th. Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94102

COOK, DAVID JULIAN

Attorney at COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, P.L.C.

165 Fell Street, P.O.Box 270

San Francisco, CA 94104-0270

THREET, JERRY J

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEYSFOX PLAZA

1390 Market Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: THE WRIT OF MANDATE IS DENIED; THE OLSE ORDER TO GMG TO PAY 275 OF ITS EMPLOYEES A TOTAL OF $1,339,028.39 IS UPLHELD; RESPONDENTS SHALL RECOVER THEIR COSTS (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF: ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPL FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION; RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S EX PARTE APPL FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED AMD JUDGMENT; DEC OF DEPUTY CITY ATTNY JERRY THREET ISO FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (STIPULATED AMENDED)

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: STIPULATED AMENDED JUDGMENT AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED AMENDED JUDGMENT, DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED AMD JUDGMENT; DEC OF DEPUTY CITY ATTNY JERRY THREET ISO FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUING NOTICE OF MTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER ISSUING WRITS OF EXECUTION AND ABSTRACTS OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS JUDGMENT CRECITOR UNDER CCP 680.240 FOR PURPOSES OF ENFORCEMENT OF THE JUDGMENT DATED 10/16/13 AS A MONEY JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 680.270, BY STIPULATION

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST) FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED CALIFORNIA CITY AND COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, A DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF LABOR STANDARS ENFORCEMENT, AN OFFICE WITHIN THE DEPARTMENT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES OFFICE OF THE CONTROLLER, AN OFFICE OF THE CITY AN COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING OFFICER PETER KEARNS, AN INDIVIDUAL IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGE FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:410.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, A DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT OFFICE OF THE CONTROLLER, AN OFFICE OF THE CITY AN COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT HEARING OFFICER PETER KEARNS, AN INDIVIDUAL IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGE FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED CALIFORNIA CITY AND COUNTY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT OFFICE OF LABOR STANDARS ENFORCEMENT, AN OFFICE WITHIN THE DEPARTMENT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES

ANSWER

ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES OFFICE OF LABOR STANDARS ENFORCEMENT ("OLSE") OFFICE OF THE CONTROLLER KEARNS, PETER HEARING OFFICER (Fee:EXEMPT)

MOTION TO STRIKE

MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR NOV-07-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQ. FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD FILED BY PLAINTIFF GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOS TO PETITIONERS MOTION TO STRIKE REAL PARTIES INTEREST FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2014
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W1614707F005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W2014618M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W2114424M012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W3614304M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W3614304M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W2014303F005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Payment : COSTS ON PREPARING APPEAL; Amount : $240; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2814131A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • Payment : REPORTERS COSTS DEPOSITED; Amount : $325; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2813C13A002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • Payment : NOTICE OF APPEAL - CLERKS DEPOSIT; Amount : $100; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2813C13A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W3613821M004

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REQ. FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD FILED BY PLAINTIFF GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR NOV-07-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES OFFICE OF LABOR STANDARS ENFORCEMENT ("OLSE") OFFICE OF THE CONTROLLER KEARNS, PETER HEARING OFFICER (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT OFFICE OF LABOR STANDARS ENFORCEMENT, AN OFFICE WITHIN THE DEPARTMENT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED CALIFORNIA CITY AND COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT HEARING OFFICER PETER KEARNS, AN INDIVIDUAL IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGE FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT OFFICE OF THE CONTROLLER, AN OFFICE OF THE CITY AN COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, A DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST) FILED BY PETITIONER GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED CALIFORNIA CITY AND COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, A DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF LABOR STANDARS ENFORCEMENT, AN OFFICE WITHIN THE DEPARTMENT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES OFFICE OF THE CONTROLLER, AN OFFICE OF THE CITY AN COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING OFFICER PETER KEARNS, AN INDIVIDUAL IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGE FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:$410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******2328
Case Title:GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SQAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED
Court Date:NOV-07-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, November 7, 2012, Line 8, PLAINTIFF GMG JANITORIAL, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION.Granted. Portions of the Petition naming GMG Employees as real parties in interest are stricken. No opposition filed. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/MJM)


Case Number:*******2328
Case Title:GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SQAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED
Court Date:SEP-16-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Judgment
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Monday, September 16, 2013, Line 4, RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S Notice Of Motion And Motion For JudgmentContinued on the Court's own motion to October 16, 2013 at 9:30 am. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******2328
Case Title:GMG JANITORIAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SQAN FRANCISCO , A CHARTERED
Court Date:OCT-16-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Judgment
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, October 16, 2013, Line 3, RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO's Motion For Judgment.The court grants the motion for judgment. For purposes of the writ, GMG concedes GMG's liability for violating the Health Care Security Ordinance ("HCSO"). The only issue is the propriety of the $1,339,028.39 corrective action. Substantial evidence in the record supports the finding of the corrective action in this amount. Respondent is entitled to judgment as a matter of law. Reg. 9.1 states that respondent "may order any other actions it deems necessary to correct the violation(s) committed. Given that broad discretion, it cannot be said that Respondent's decision was arbitrary or unreasonable under Yamaha Corp. v. State Bd. of Equalization (1998) 19 Cal. 4th 1, 11. The Court will sign the proposed Judgment Denying Writ of Mandate submitted with the moving papers. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. =(302/MJM)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where GMG Janitorial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Administrative Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBBINS, B. DOUGLAS