This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/05/2019 at 00:24:40 (UTC).

GLORIA TRAN VS. BAYVIEW CAPITAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2009 GLORIA TRAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BAYVIEW CAPITAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD, LORETTA GIORGI, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, KEVIN M. MCCARTHY, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, ARLENE T. BORICK, HAROLD E. KAHN, CURTIS KARNOW and PAUL H. ALVARADO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6648

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD

LORETTA GIORGI

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

KEVIN M. MCCARTHY

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

ARLENE T. BORICK

HAROLD E. KAHN

CURTIS KARNOW

PAUL H. ALVARADO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TRAN, CHRISTOPHER ,AN INDIVIDUAL, AKA LAM BAO TRAN

ROES 1-10

Defendant and Claimant

FINEGOLD, MARIANN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHENG, CHI-LEUNG AN INDIVIDUAL

BAYVIEW CAPITAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BAYVIEW FUNDING CORP.

CERVANTES, SHIRLEY AN INDIVIDUAL

FINEGOLD, MARIAN

GRADMAN, THEODORE TRUSTEE OF THE THEODORE J. GRADMAN

SARID, KAREN GISHKIN AN INDIVIDUAL

MARIANN FINEGOLD, CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE APPRAISER AN INDIVIDUAL

GUJRAL FAMILY FOUNDATION, A 501 (C) (3 CHARITABLE ORGANIZATION

GISHKEN, RACHEL AN INDIVIDUAL

CERVANTES, SHELLA AN INDIVIDUAL

GUJRAL, ASHOK KUMAR CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE BROKER, AN INDIVIDUAL

PH.D.DEFINED BEFENIF PENSION PLAN

FINEGOLD, MARIANN

GOLDEN WEST FORECLOSURE SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GUJRAL FAMILY FOUNDATION

GISHKIN, RACHEL AN INDIVIDUAL

A 501(C)(3) CHARITABLE ORGANIZATION

HENRY YOUNG, CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE BROKER

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ROONEY, MICHAEL P.

Attorney at MICHAEL PATRICK ROONEY

580 California Street, 16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant and Claimant Attorney

ZISER, GEORGE JOHN

Attorney at LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Ste. 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HAMBURG, BEN IRWIN

Attorney at BEN HAMBURGA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORP.

2625 Alcatraz Avenue, #500

Berkeley, CA 94705

ZISER, GEORGE JOHN

Attorney at LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Ste. 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROUSE, CHERYL CHRISTINE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROUSE & BAHLERT

345 Franklin Street

San Francisco, CA 941020000

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN FAVOR OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS AS TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (NO COPY, NO SASE PROVIDED)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ENTER JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT FINEGOLD, MARIANN (Fee:40.00)

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT FINEGOLD, MARIANN ON THE COMPLAINT, SAID DEFENDANT TO HAVE JUDGMENT THEREON FOR $6,823.04 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,823.04, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

JUDGMENT LIEN FILED BY CLAIMANT FINEGOLD, MARIANN

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

MEMO OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FOR THE PLTF FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

DECLARATION OF GLORIA TRAN IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT YOUNG, HENRY $571,880.99 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $571,880.99, SEE SCANNED DOC

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY DEFENDANT FINEGOLD, MARIANN AS TO PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GISHKIN, RACHEL AN INDIVIDUAL SARID, KAREN GISHKIN AN INDIVIDUAL CERVANTES, SHELLA AN INDIVIDUAL CERVANTES, SHIRLEY AN INDIVIDUAL CERVANTES, MARK SIDNEY AN INDIVIDUAL CHENG, CHI-LEUNG AN INDIVIDUAL CHANG, ALICE AN INDIVIDUAL GUJRAL FAMILY FOUNDATION GRADMAN, THEODORE J. , TRUSTEE (Fee:2920.00)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAY-08-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT BAYVIEW CAPITAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BAYVIEW FUNDING CORP.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT GUJRAL, ASHOK KUMAR CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE BROKER, AN INDIVIDUAL GISHKIN, RACHEL AN INDIVIDUAL SARID, KAREN GISHKIN AN INDIVIDUAL CERVANTES, SHELLA AN INDIVIDUAL CERVANTES, SHIRLEY AN INDIVIDUAL CERVANTES, MARK SIDNEY AN INDIVIDUAL CHENG, CHI-LEUNG AN INDIVIDUAL CHANG, ALICE AN INDIVIDUAL GUJRAL FAMILY FOUNDATION THEODORE GRADMAN, TRUSTEE OF THE THEODORE J. GRADMAN, PH.D. DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN GOLDEN WEST FORECLOSURE SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BAYVIEW CAPITAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BAYVIEW FUNDING CORP. FINEGOLD, MARIANN CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE APPRAISER AN INDIVIDUAL

ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Continued Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-23-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-23-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN 608

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLNTFS MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL TRAN, CHRISTOPHER ,AN INDIVIDUAL, AKA LAM BAO TRAN

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT FINEGOLD, MARIANN

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS RE: OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT FINEGOLD, MARIANN

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT FINEGOLD, MARIANN

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2012
  • Payment : JURY FEE TRANSFER; Payment Type : TRAN/FORF; Receipt Number : B0212416J078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2212118M010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W3612118M017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2111B09J041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1611B08M028

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $410; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W2111104F042

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Amount : $500; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R3510C13S017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W2110B16M053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W2110B16M054

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $370; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2010907F016

    Read MoreRead Less
327 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2009
  • DECLARATION OF SHIRLEY CERVANTES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CERVANTES, SHIRLEY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE: STIPULATION EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (FROM APR-20 TO APR-30-2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • FILING FEE FOR STIPULATION EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CERVANTES, SHIRLEY AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:$385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR PLAINTIFF GLORIA TRAN'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED (PER EX PARTE ORDER OF 04/01/09) HEARING SET FOR APR-20-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (OSC SET FOR 04/20/09)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER -TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION TO STAY FORECLOUSURE; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT AND CERTIFICATION OF NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:$40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BAYVIEW CAPITAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BAYVIEW FUNDING CORP. GUJRAL, ASHOK KUMAR CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE BROKER, AN INDIVIDUAL GISHKIN, RACHEL AN INDIVIDUAL SARID, KAREN GISHKIN AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • COPYING FEES PAID BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:$2.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BAYVIEW CAPITAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BAYVIEW FUNDING CORP. GUJRAL, ASHOK KUMAR CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE BROKER, AN INDIVIDUAL GISHKIN, RACHEL AN INDIVIDUAL SARID, KAREN GISHKIN AN INDIVIDUAL CERVANTES, SHELLA AN INDIVIDUAL CERVANTES, SHIRLEY AN INDIVIDUAL CERVANTES, MARK SIDNEY AN INDIVIDUAL CHENG, CHI-LEUNG AN INDIVIDUAL CHANG, ALICE AN INDIVIDUAL GUJRAL FAMILY FOUNDATION THEODORE GRADMAN, TRUSTEE OF THE THEODORE J. GRADMAN, PH.D. DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN GOLDEN WEST FORECLOSURE SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION MARIANN FINEGOLD, CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE APPRAISER AN INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-28-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-26-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-13-2009 (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less