This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 07:29:52 (UTC).

GLORIA SUNCIN et al VS. EDGARDO VIDES et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2009 GLORIA SUNCIN filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against EDGARDO VIDES. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9567

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SUNCIN, GLORIA

MARTINEZ, MARCELLO SUNCIN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BALDINI REAL ESTATE, INC.

LAWRENCE, LEONA AS TRUSTEE OF THE ANITA DAMONTE TRUST

ESTATE OF EDGARDO VIDES, INDIVIDUALLY

DAMONTE, VICTORIA

LAWRENCE, LEONA IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ANITA DAMONTE TRUSTE

E & V RENTALS

LAWRENCE, LEONA

DOES 1 THROUGH 50,INCLUSIVE

MARTINEZ, EDDY A

VIDES, EDGARDO AN INDIVIDUAL DBA E & V RENTALS

VIDES, VICTORIA

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-20

DAMONTE, VICTORIA

THE VICTORIA DAMONTE REVOCABLE TRUST

SUNCIN, GLORIA

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

LAWRENCE, LEONA IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ANITA DAMONTE TRUSTE

LEONA LAWRENCE IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ANITA DAMONTE TRUST T

DAMONTE, ANITA

LAWRENCE, LENOA SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE VICTORIA DAMONTE REVOCABLE TRUST

THE ANITA DAMONTE REVOCABLE TRUST

VIDES, EDGARDO AN INDIVIDUAL DBA E & V RENTALS

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

LIFSCHITZ, ERIC

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ERIC L. LIFSCHITZ

345 Franklin Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PICCININI, DANIEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DANIEL PICCININI

714 Van Ness Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

SILBERSTEIN, MICHAEL FRANCIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL F. SILBERSEIN

851 Irwin Street, Suite 200

San Rafael, CA 94903

WASSERMAN, DAVID

Attorney at WASSERMAN-STERN

2960 Van Ness Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94109-1020

KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ

Attorney at BRENDA CRUZ KEITH LAWYER

1965 Market Street, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SILBERSTEIN, MICHAEL FRANCIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL F. SILBERSEIN

851 Irwin Street, Suite 200

San Rafael, CA 94903

KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ

Attorney at BRENDA CRUZ KEITH LAWYER

1965 Market Street, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

LIFSCHITZ, ERIC

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ERIC L. LIFSCHITZ

345 Franklin Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VIDES, EDGARDO AN INDIVIDUAL DBA E & V RENTALS (Fee:370.00)

Invalid Check Notice

INVALID/RETURNED CHECK FOR TRANSACTION W2209918F002 FOR CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE BALDINI REAL ESTATE, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE CENTURY 21

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SUNCIN, GLORIA

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT CENTURY 21

ORDER

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE ORDER STRIKING FIRST APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT VICTORIA DAMONTE

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAMONTE, VICTORIA LAWRENCE, LEONA IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ANITA DAMONTE TRUSTE

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT E & V RENTALS VIDES, EDGARDO AN INDIVIDUAL DBA E & V RENTALS

Invalid Check Order

MOTION STRICKEN BY COURT ORDER FOR FAILURE TO REDEEM INVALID CHECK FOR TRANSACTION W2209C11M002; NO FURTHER FILINGS ON PART OF DAMONTE, VICTORIA

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, EDDY A

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT VIDES, EDGARDO AN INDIVIDUAL DBA E & V RENTALS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT DAMONTE, VICTORIA

ORDER

ORDER VACATING ORDER STRIKING FLING DUE TO INVALID CHECK FILED AND ENTER JANUARY 26, 2010

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY BALDINI REAL ESTATE, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT DAMONTE, ANITA

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 5 TO BE VIDES, VICTORIA

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARET APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS' TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 5 AND 6; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF ERIC L. LISCHITZ

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO 1- COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); 2- FRO EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNCIN, GLORIA

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-21-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY VIDES, EDGARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY BALDINI REAL ESTATE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR DEC-21-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. OCT-18-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNCIN, GLORIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-19-2010 CONTINUED TO OCT-18-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) DOES 5 AND 6, ESTATE OF EDGARDO VIDES, INDIVIDUALLY, AND VICTORIA VIDES. THE JUL-19-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE DENIED AS MOOT. EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2010
  • FEE PD FOR EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNCIN, GLORIA MARTINEZ, MARCELLO SUNCIN (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF KEITH BRENDA CRUZ ON JUL-02-2010 THROUGH JUL-09-2010 FILED BY DEFENDANT VIDES, EDGARDO AN INDIVIDUAL DBA E & V RENTALS VIDES, EDGARDO AN INDIVIDUAL DBA E & V RENTALS

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2009
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT DAMONTE, VICTORIA LAWRENCE, LEONA IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ANITA DAMONTE TRUSTE HEARING SET FOR OCT-29-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • MOTION TO STRIKE, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT VIDES, EDGARDO AN INDIVIDUAL DBA E & V RENTALS HEARING SET FOR OCT-14-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, EDDY A ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT VIDES, EDGARDO AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SUNCIN, GLORIA ROES 1-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT VIDES, EDGARDO AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SUNCIN, GLORIA ROES 1-20 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VIDES, EDGARDO AN INDIVIDUAL DBA E & V RENTALS (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, EDDY A (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL EVICTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNCIN, GLORIA MARTINEZ, MARCELLO SUNCIN AS TO DEFENDANT VIDES, EDGARDO MARTINEZ, EDDY A E & V RENTALS DAMONTE, VICTORIA DOES 1 THROUGH 50,INCLUSIVE LAWRENCE, LEONA AS TRUSTEE OF THE ANITA DAMONTE TRUST SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-20-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-17-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-05-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less