Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 09:34:47 (UTC).

GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. VS. ATC FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2011 GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ATC FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8903

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST AS RESTATED

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

STOVALL, TONI C INDIVIDUALLY, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TONI C STOVALL SEPARATE TRUST (INCORRECTLY DESIGNATED AS TONI CHASE TRUST

CHASE, GLENN

ATC FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

STOVAL, RONALD SUCCESOR TRUSTEE OF THE TRUST ESTATE OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS COMPLAINANT. TONI C. STOVALL

CHASE, ROBIN

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

RABEL, MERCEDITA

LERNER, VEIT & STANALAND LLP

TONI C. STOVALL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE TONI CHASE TRUST

STOVAL, RONALD IN HIS CAPACITY AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE TONI C. STOVALL SEPARATE TRUST AND THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DECEDENT'S TRUST ESTATE

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-20

CHASE, GLENN

CHASE, ROBIN

RABEL, MERCEDITA

RABEL, LERNER VEIT & STANALAN, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABITLITY PARTNERSHIP

LERNER, VEIT & STANALAND LLP

GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST AS RESTATED

RABEL, MERCEDITAS

Others

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CORPORATION

175 Berkeley Street

Boston, MA 02117

OKEEFFE, GREGORY

San Francisco, CA 94116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

RIFFLE, CHARLES MATTHEW

Attorney at AARON, RIECHERT, CARPOL & RIFFLE,A.P.C.

900 Veterans Boulevard,#600, P.O. Box 5787

Redwood City, CA 94063

ROBELLO, SHEILA

Attorney at SOLAN, PARK, & ROBELLO, LLP

354 Pine St., 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

STANALAND, RUSSELL

Attorney at LERNER, VEIT & STANALAND, LLP

180 Montgomery Street,, Ste 1850

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLER, SEAN PATRICK

Attorney at STUHR & MILLER

5012 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94112

RIFFLE, CHARLES MATTHEW

Attorney at AARON, RIECHERT, CARPOL & RIFFLE,A.P.C.

900 Veterans Boulevard,#600, P.O. Box 5787

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER, SEAN PATRICK

Attorney at STUHR & MILLER

5012 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94112

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER AND IN OPPOSITION TO PTLF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON A PLEADING AS TO FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANT STOVAL, RONALD SUCCESOR TRUSTEE OF THE TRUST ESTATE OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS COMPLAINANT. TONI C. STOVALL

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF S PATRICK MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MEMO P/A IN RESPONSE TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER AND IN OPPOSITION TO PTLF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON A PLEADING AS TO FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANT STOVAL, RONALD SUCCESOR TRUSTEE OF THE TRUST ESTATE OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS COMPLAINANT. TONI C. STOVALL

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF RONALD STOVALL IN SUPPORT OF MEMO P/A IN RESPONSE TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER AND IN OPPOSITION TO PTLF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON A PLEADING AS TO FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANT STOVAL, RONALD SUCCESOR TRUSTEE OF THE TRUST ESTATE OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS COMPLAINANT. TONI C. STOVALL

REPLY

REPLY TO RESPONSE TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER IN OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO 1ST CAUSE OF ACTION OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION (DISSOLUTION OF LIMITED PARTNERSHIP OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED

MEMO OF P&A IN OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR PRELIM INJUNCTION FILED BY

MEMO OF P&A IN OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR PRELIM INJUNCTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ATC FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP TONI C. STOVALL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE TONI CHASE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 7, 2001 (Fee:820.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED SERVED MAY-17-2011, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-18-2011 ON DEFENDANT ATC FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHASE, GLENN CHASE, ROBIN (Fee:820.00)

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-11-2012 CONTINUED TO OCT-16-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT AT ISSUE AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT(S) MERCEDITAS RABEL. THE SEP-11-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-18-2012 CONTINUED TO JAN-29-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. THE DEC-18-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER RE: MOTION FOR INSTRUCTION RE RETENTION OF LITIGATION COUNSEL FOR ATC FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RULE 3.1180

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 56542915) FILED BY OTHER OKEEFFE, GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR RECEIVER IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: SEAN KANE; REPORTER: SHERYL L. SAWYER, CSR #5976; DEPT. 302. (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR RECEIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-31-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY OTHER OKEEFFE, GREGORY (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY OTHER OKEEFFE, GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY OTHER OKEEFFE, GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR RECEIVER, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY OTHER OKEEFFE, GREGORY HEARING SET FOR DEC-31-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • FEE PAID FOR STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER APPOINTING A SUCCESSOR RECEIVER FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED AS TO DEFENDANT STOVAL, RONALD SUCCESOR TRUSTEE OF THE TRUST ESTATE OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS COMPLAINANT. TONI C. STOVALL (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-26-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-15-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2011
  • DECLARATION OF GLENN CHASE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIEF TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF TONI C. STOVALL IN SUPP OF OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR PRELIM INJUNCTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ATC FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP TONI C. STOVALL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE TONI CHASE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 7, 2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF P&A IN OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR PRELIM INJUNCTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ATC FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP TONI C. STOVALL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE TONI CHASE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 7, 2001 (Fee:820.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF AMENDED NTC OF MTN & MTN FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION 301, PLAINTIFF'S NTC AND MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION CONTINUED FROM APR-14-2011 TO LAW AND MOTION AT MAY-03-2011, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 301 PER MOVING PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED AS TO DEFENDANT TONI C. STOVALL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE TONI CHASE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 7, 2001 CHASE, GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED HEARING SET FOR MAY-03-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • NTC AND MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED HEARING SET FOR APR-14-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLENN CHASE, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALLEN L. CHASE TRUST DATED MARCH 14, 2001, AS RESTATED AS TO DEFENDANT ATC FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP TONI C. STOVALL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE TONI CHASE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 7, 2001 DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-05-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-09-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-21-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIFFLE, CHARLES M.