This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 06:29:29 (UTC).

GINA SANGUINETTI VS. FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2012 GINA SANGUINETTI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8241

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

SANGUINETTI, GINA

Defendants

TOUPS, WILLI

NEWCOMB, BRENT

FOREST LABORATORIES, INC.

FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

ALIOTO, ANGELA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH L. ALIOTO AND ANGELA ALIOTO

700 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

THOMPSON, RANDALL S.

STALEY, LAURA B.

SKAGGS, JASON M

Attorney at THE LAW OFICES OF JASON M SKAGGS

530 Lytton Ave 2Nd Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94301

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE MOTION TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF 20 PAGES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE: NTOICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC.

ORDER

ORDER (1) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND (2) DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR BIFURCATION OF TRIAL

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SANGUINETTI, GINA TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NEWCOMB, BRENT TOUPS, WILLI DEFENDANTS SHALL RECOVER FROM PLAINTIFF THEIR COSTS OF SUIT (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFTS

ORDER

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BRENT NEWCOMB AND WILLI TOUPS' OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY GINA SANGUINETTI IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (REVISED AFTER HEARING)

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SANGUINETTI, GINA TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NEWCOMB, BRENT TOUPS, WILLI ON THE COMPLAINT, SAID DEFENDANT TO HAVE JUDGMENT THEREON FOR $12,323.27 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $12,323.27, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANGUINETTI, GINA SERVED MAR-12-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TOUPS, WILLI

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. TOUPS, WILLI (Fee:1230.00)

MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

APPLICATION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NEWCOMB, BRENT TOUPS, WILLI (Fee:910.00)

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY RANDALL S. THOMPSON FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NEWCOMB, BRENT TOUPS, WILLI

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-18-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-13-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (WITH FEE)

STIPULATION AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NEWCOMB, BRENT TOUPS, WILLI (Fee:20.00)

Order Continuing Mandatory Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR NOV-06-2012 IS CONTINUED TO DEC-11-2012 AT 1:00 PM IN 212 WITH SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE OFFICER STELLA F. EPLING.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC.

REQUEST FOR CLERKS/REPORTER TRANSCRIPT

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT [8.124 RT ATTACHED]

REMITTITUR

REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A138400 DIV 1

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY LAURA B. STALEY TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAR-25-2015

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • ATTORNEY RANDALL S. THOMPSON INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE. (MAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • ATTORNEY LAURA B. STALEY INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE. (MAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY RANDALL S. THOMPSON TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAR-25-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY LAURA B. STALEY TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAR-25-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A138400 DIV 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • APR-23-2014 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY LAURA B. STALEY - OFF CALENDAR, RENEWAL FEES PAID ON MAR-26-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • APR-23-2014 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY RANDALL S. THOMPSON - OFF CALENDAR, RENEWAL FEES PAID ON MAR-26-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE PAID FOR ATTORNEY RANDALL S. THOMPSON (Fee:500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE PAID FOR ATTORNEY LAURA B. STALEY (Fee:500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY LAURA B. STALEY TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY APR-23-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2012
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF RANDALL S. THOMPSON AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE HEARING SET FOR MAY-18-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANGUINETTI, GINA SERVED APR-17-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-07-2012 ON DEFENDANT NEWCOMB, BRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FILED BY DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NEWCOMB, BRENT TOUPS, WILLI (Fee:500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NEWCOMB, BRENT TOUPS, WILLI (Fee:910.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. TOUPS, WILLI (Fee:1230.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANGUINETTI, GINA SERVED MAR-12-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TOUPS, WILLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANGUINETTI, GINA SERVED FEB-29-2012, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANGUINETTI, GINA SERVED MAR-01-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANGUINETTI, GINA AS TO DEFENDANT FOREST LABORATORIES, INC. FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NEWCOMB, BRENT TOUPS, WILLI DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-13-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-28-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less