This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 11:57:13 (UTC).

George Higgins Vs. Alvin Yuvinhy Blanco Ramirez Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by George Higgins against Alvin Yuvinhy Blanco Ramirez in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4370

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Teri L. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Higgins, George

Defendants

Blanco Ramirez, Alvin Yuvinhy

Blanco, Jessica

Does 1 To 40

Blanco, Jessica Rojas

 

Court Documents

Dismissal to Entire Action

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE *EACH SIDE TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100043913)

Answer (Original)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100039464) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041689) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033181), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE SERVED MAR-11-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAR-14-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 100034886) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033181), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE SERVED MAR-31-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE APR-04-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035426) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Reply

REPLY TO PLTF'S OPPOS ISO MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 100038323) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS

Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 100037215) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS HEARING SET FOR JUN-11-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE (Oppositions)

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 100034439) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE AS TO DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA DOES 1 TO 40 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R7818614J007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : Y0218523R002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : Y0218523F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W0918215F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-22-2019 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 8/1/18. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE *EACH SIDE TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100043913)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041689) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035426) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 100034886) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100039464) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-11-2018 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 100034439) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO PLTF'S OPPOS ISO MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 100038323) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 100037215) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 100037215) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS HEARING SET FOR JUN-11-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033181), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE SERVED MAR-31-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE APR-04-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT BLANCO, JESSICA ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033181), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE SERVED MAR-11-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAR-14-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGGINS, GEORGE AS TO DEFENDANT BLANCO RAMIREZ, ALVIN YUVINHY BLANCO, JESSICA DOES 1 TO 40 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.