Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:47:52 (UTC).

GEORGE GARRETT VS. ZERAY G. BERHANE et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 GEORGE GARRETT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZERAY G BERHANE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8447

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARRETT, GEORGE

Defendants

BERHANE, ZERAY G.

PARADIGM GANITORIAL SERVICE

PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE

DOES 1 TO 20, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUBROVSKY, ANNA

Attorney at ANNA DUBROVSKY LAW GROUP, INC.

101 Montgomery Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

BIGLEY, PAUL A.

Attorney at GILBERT, KELLY, CROWLEY & JENNETT LLP

44 Montgomery St. Ste 2080

San Francisco, CA 94104-4602

WOO, ROY S

Other Attorneys

SCHMIDT, DEAN MICHAEL

One Embarcadero Center,, Ste 4100

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-21-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-15-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-03-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G. (Fee:450.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-24-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-21-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE AS TO DEFENDANT PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-24-2014 - CASE SETTLED PER PARTIES AT TRIAL CALL. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON APR-15-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BIGLEY, PAUL A. SUBSTITUTED FOR WOO, ROY S AS ATTORNEY FOR BERHANE, ZERAY G.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-03-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-15-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-03-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-24-2014 - CASE SETTLED PER PARTIES AT TRIAL CALL. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON APR-15-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL (TO JUNE 30, 2014) AND ALL RELATED DATES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR THE HEARING OF A MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G. (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BIGLEY, PAUL A. SUBSTITUTED FOR WOO, ROY S AS ATTORNEY FOR BERHANE, ZERAY G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • OBJECTION TO THE COURT COMMISSIONER ACT AS A TRIAL JUDGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED INCORRECTLY AS PARADIGM GANITORIAL SERVICE TO BE PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2013
  • FEE PAID FOR EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE AS TO DEFENDANT PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE AS TO DEFENDANT PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G. (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G. (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, GEORGE AS TO DEFENDANT BERHANE, ZERAY G. DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. PARADIGM JANITORIAL SERVICE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less