This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 04:37:46 (UTC).

GEORGE BUSH JR et al VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2010 GEORGE BUSH JR filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3304

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C

Greenbrae, CA 94904

Defendants

BURKE, ROBYN

CLEMONS, NICHOLAS "NICK"

THE GEO GROUP

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT

CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY

NEWSOM, GAVIN C

SFPD OFFICER KATHLEEN HOLDER

DOMENICI, MARYSOL

MCGUIRE REAL ESTATE

CLINTON GLOBAL INITIATIVE

SWEET, LYNETTE

NDESANDJO, MARK

NEWSOM, JENNIFER SIEBEL

DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

DOES 1 TO 360 MILLION

ACT-UP

DEKREON, GAIL

CHENEY, RICHARD BRUCE

ALBERS, RONALD E

59 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GOWER, HARRY T

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suitee 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

RUSSI, BRADLEY

Attorney at CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

1390 Market St, 6Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94102

GSCHWIND, ANDREW MARTIN

 

Court Documents

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT NEWSOM, GAVIN C

COMPLAINT

FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUSH JR, GEORGE GORE II, ALBERT MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT OFFICE OF THE MAYOR OF SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO POLICE DEPARTMENT SAN FRANCISCO SHERRIFF'S DEPARTMENT NEWSOM, GAVIN C NEWSOM, JENNIFER SIEBEL HARRIS, KAMALA DEVI BARNES, CANDANCE M BURKE, ROBYN DERRYCK, ERICA UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE VAUGHN WALKER YOO, JOHN UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA BERKELEY BOALT SCHOOL OF LAW YALE UNIVERSITY HARVARD UNIVERSITY SFPD OFFICE MR. SANDINO SFPD OFFICER GARY DIQUISTO SFPD OFFICER KATHLEEN HOLDER SFPD SERGEANT KIMBERLY REYNOLDS SFPD CHIEF GEORGE GASCON DELAGNES, GARY SAN FRANCISCO POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION CREDIT UNION PRLAP, INC. MERS, INC. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOAN RECONTRUST CO NATIONAL CLANDESTINE SERVICE CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY PANETTA, LEON CLINTON GLOBAL INITIATIVE CLINTON, WILLIAM JEFFERSON CLINTON, HILLARY RODHAM TYSON FOOD CO. CLEMONS, NICHOLAS "NICK" CONOCO PHILLIPS, INC. CEO MR. MULVA SAN FRANCISCO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT SERGEANT GARY KAZUO NODA TING, PHIL GHENO, MELANIE DAWN NORTH AMERICA MAN BOY LOVE ASSOCIATION ACT-UP DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY NAPOLITANO, JANET FEMA BROWN JR, WILLIE IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT KARNOW, CURTIS E.A. MARSHALL DR, JOE SWEET, LYNETTE BAY AREA RAPID TRANSIT MEHSERLE, JOHANNES PIRONE, TONY DOMENICI, MARYSOL RENO, JANET THE GEO GROUP VANGUARD GROUP VANGUARD PROPERTIES CHENEY, RICHARD BRUCE MCGUIRE REAL ESTATE FARRAH, GIBRAN CHARLES BOWEN, MICHAEL TIMOTHY RICE, LEROY WINGFIELD GILBERT, ADENA SHANA WOOLARD, CHARLOTTE WALTER DEKREON, GAIL ALBERS, RONALD E DENMARK THE NETHERLANDS RIPPEY, RUBY RIPPEY, MICHAEL NDESANDJO, MARK DOES 1 TO 360 MILLION NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-10-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-08-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-26-2011 (Fee:IFP)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C SERVED SEP-17-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C SERVED SEP-17-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

MINUTES FOR DEC-03-2010 11:00 AM

MINUTES FOR DEC-03-2010 11:00 AM

RULING ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES

ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT NEWSOM, GAVIN C

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUSH JR, GEORGE GORE II, ALBERT MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C SERVED SEP-17-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NEWSOM, GAVIN C

NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUSH JR, GEORGE GORE II, ALBERT MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT OFFICE OF THE MAYOR OF SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO POLICE DEPARTMENT SAN FRANCISCO SHERRIFF'S DEPARTMENT NEWSOM, GAVIN C NEWSOM, JENNIFER SIEBEL HARRIS, KAMALA DEVI BARNES, CANDANCE M BURKE, ROBYN DERRYCK, ERICA UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE VAUGHN WALKER YOO, JOHN UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA BERKELEY BOALT SCHOOL OF LAW YALE UNIVERSITY HARVARD UNIVERSITY SFPD OFFICE MR. SANDINO SFPD OFFICER GARY DIQUISTO SFPD OFFICER KATHLEEN HOLDER SFPD SERGEANT KIMBERLY REYNOLDS SFPD CHIEF GEORGE GASCON DELAGNES, GARY SAN FRANCISCO POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION CREDIT UNION PRLAP, INC. MERS, INC. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOAN RECONTRUST CO NATIONAL CLANDESTINE SERVICE CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY PANETTA, LEON CLINTON GLOBAL INITIATIVE CLINTON, WILLIAM JEFFERSON CLINTON, HILLARY RODHAM TYSON FOOD CO. CLEMONS, NICHOLAS "NICK" CONOCO PHILLIPS, INC. CEO MR. MULVA SAN FRANCISCO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT SERGEANT GARY KAZUO NODA TING, PHIL GHENO, MELANIE DAWN NORTH AMERICA MAN BOY LOVE ASSOCIATION ACT-UP DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY NAPOLITANO, JANET FEMA BROWN JR, WILLIE IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT KARNOW, CURTIS E.A. MARSHALL DR, JOE SWEET, LYNETTE BAY AREA RAPID TRANSIT MEHSERLE, JOHANNES PIRONE, TONY DOMENICI, MARYSOL RENO, JANET THE GEO GROUP VANGUARD GROUP VANGUARD PROPERTIES CHENEY, RICHARD BRUCE MCGUIRE REAL ESTATE FARRAH, GIBRAN CHARLES BOWEN, MICHAEL TIMOTHY RICE, LEROY WINGFIELD GILBERT, ADENA SHANA WOOLARD, CHARLOTTE WALTER DEKREON, GAIL ALBERS, RONALD E DENMARK THE NETHERLANDS RIPPEY, RUBY RIPPEY, MICHAEL NDESANDJO, MARK DOES 1 TO 360 MILLION

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-10-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR PER OCT-27-2010 SINGLE ASSIGNMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR, DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT ADVANCED FROM

TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR, DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT ADVANCED FROM APR-05-2011 TO TRIAL DEPT. MOTION CALENDAR AT MAR-25-2011 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 414 ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. MATTER TO BE HEARD BY VISITING JUDGE ROBERT BAYSINGER.

Order to Continue Hearing

TRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 414, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT CONTINUED FROM APR-14-2011 TO TRIAL DEPT. MOTION AT MAY-16-2011, 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 414 ON COURTS OWN MOTION

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT NEWSOM, GAVIN C

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT NEWSOM, GAVIN C

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-16-2011 RE: PLAINTIFFS' STANDING AND DISMISSAL OF NON-SERVED NAMED DEFENDANTS. CASE DISMISSED. SEE MINUTES. JUDGE ROBERT BAYSINGER, CLERK C. BANAYAD, REPORTER C. YOUNT (604)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON MAY-16-2011 IN 414, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT - MOOT. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED ON 4/18/11. JUDGE R. BAYSINGER, CLERK C. BANAYAD, REPORTER C. YOUNT (414)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR MAY-16-2011 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT NEWSOM, GAVIN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C. MURAWSKI FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT NEWSOM, GAVIN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF P&A IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C MURAWSKI FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT NEWSOM, GAVIN C

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2010
  • COPYING FEES (10 PAGE) PAID BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C. MURAWSKI FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C SERVED SEP-17-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C SERVED SEP-17-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C. MURAWSKI FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING ORDERED FOR APPLICATION OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES HEARING SET FOR OCT-20-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF BUSH JR, GEORGE GORE II, ALBERT MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUSH JR, GEORGE GORE II, ALBERT MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUSH JR, GEORGE GORE II, ALBERT MURAWSKI, MICHAEL C AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT OFFICE OF THE MAYOR OF SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO POLICE DEPARTMENT SAN FRANCISCO SHERRIFF'S DEPARTMENT NEWSOM, GAVIN C NEWSOM, JENNIFER SIEBEL HARRIS, KAMALA DEVI BARNES, CANDANCE M BURKE, ROBYN DERRYCK, ERICA UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE VAUGHN WALKER YOO, JOHN UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA BERKELEY BOALT SCHOOL OF LAW YALE UNIVERSITY HARVARD UNIVERSITY SFPD OFFICE MR. SANDINO SFPD OFFICER GARY DIQUISTO SFPD OFFICER KATHLEEN HOLDER SFPD SERGEANT KIMBERLY REYNOLDS SFPD CHIEF GEORGE GASCON DELAGNES, GARY SAN FRANCISCO POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION CREDIT UNION PRLAP, INC. MERS, INC. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOAN RECONTRUST CO NATIONAL CLANDESTINE SERVICE CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY PANETTA, LEON CLINTON GLOBAL INITIATIVE CLINTON, WILLIAM JEFFERSON CLINTON, HILLARY RODHAM TYSON FOOD CO. CLEMONS, NICHOLAS "NICK" CONOCO PHILLIPS, INC. CEO MR. MULVA SAN FRANCISCO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT SERGEANT GARY KAZUO NODA TING, PHIL GHENO, MELANIE DAWN NORTH AMERICA MAN BOY LOVE ASSOCIATION ACT-UP DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY NAPOLITANO, JANET FEMA BROWN JR, WILLIE IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT KARNOW, CURTIS E.A. MARSHALL DR, JOE SWEET, LYNETTE BAY AREA RAPID TRANSIT MEHSERLE, JOHANNES PIRONE, TONY DOMENICI, MARYSOL RENO, JANET THE GEO GROUP VANGUARD GROUP VANGUARD PROPERTIES CHENEY, RICHARD BRUCE MCGUIRE REAL ESTATE FARRAH, GIBRAN CHARLES BOWEN, MICHAEL TIMOTHY RICE, LEROY WINGFIELD GILBERT, ADENA SHANA WOOLARD, CHARLOTTE WALTER DEKREON, GAIL ALBERS, RONALD E DENMARK THE NETHERLANDS RIPPEY, RUBY RIPPEY, MICHAEL NDESANDJO, MARK DOES 1 TO 360 MILLION NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-10-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-08-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-26-2011 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.