This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2016 at 21:27:12 (UTC).

GEORGE ARTHUR HUNT VS. AC AND S, INC et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2014 GEORGE ARTHUR HUNT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AC AND S, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6256

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR

Defendants

GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

ALFA LAVAL, INC.

GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY

RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION

OWENS-ILLINOIS CORPORATION

SB DECKING, INC.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC.

METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

J.T. THORPE & SON INC.

FRYER KNOWLES, INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.

ELLIOTT COMPANY

M. SLAYEN & ASSOCIATES, INC.

J AND H MARINE & INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING COMPANY

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAROWITZ, STEVEN MARC

Attorney at HAROWITZ & TIGERMAN, LLP

100 First Street 25Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorney

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Substitution Of Attorney - Civil (Without Court Order)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 57889732): OBERG, LISA L SUBSTITUTED FOR FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN AS ATTORNEY FOR J.T. THORPE & SON INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57269773) AS TO DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

Request for dismissal with prejudice as to defendant FMC Corporation only

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH SIDE TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 57086463) AS TO DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION

Request for dismissal with Prejudice for our client Ametek, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56650814) AS TO DEFENDANT AMETEK INC.

DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55591244) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON INC. (Fee:1450.00)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 2

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 55412736) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE AMETEK INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE JT THORPE & SON, INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNA

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLTFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO PLTFFS' COMPLAINT(TRANSACTION ID # 55412736) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 2

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 55399032) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR

DECLARATION OF SARAH E. GILSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGN

DECLARATION OF SARAH E. GILSON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPL FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 55399032) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR

PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTING DEFT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 55399032) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR (Fee:60.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR AS TO DEFENDANT AC AND S, INC. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ALFA LAVAL, INC. ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC. ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD. ASTRA FLOORING BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. CARRIER CORPORATION CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. CRANE CO. CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY ELLIOTT COMPANY FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION FLOWSERVE US INC. FMC CORPORATION FRASER-EDWARDS COMPANY FRASER'S BOILER SERVICE, INC. FRYER KNOWLES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FRYER KNOWLES, INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. IMO INDUSTRIES INC. INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY J AND H MARINE & INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING COMPANY JOHN CRANE INC. M. SLAYEN & ASSOCIATES, INC. METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS CORPORATION PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO SACOMO SIERRA PLANT PRODUCTS & SUPPLY CO. QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC. QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION SB DECKING, INC. SEPCO CORPORATION SYD CARPENTER, MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC. THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION WALDRON, DUFFY, INC. FIRST DOE THROUGH ONE THOUSANDTH DOE, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-16-2015 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON OCT-15-2015 TO DEPT 503 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-21-2016 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503. LISA BROKAW, ESQ., APPEARED FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR #5915, TEL. NO. (510) 451-1580. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 57889732): OBERG, LISA L SUBSTITUTED FOR FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN AS ATTORNEY FOR J.T. THORPE & SON INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57269773) AS TO DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-16-2015 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON OCT-15-2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503. SARAH GILSON APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH SIDE TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 57086463) AS TO DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56650814) AS TO DEFENDANT AMETEK INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55591244) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON INC. (Fee:1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 55412736) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE AMETEK INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE JT THORPE & SON, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLTFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO PLTFFS' COMPLAINT(TRANSACTION ID # 55412736) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 55399032) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SARAH E. GILSON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPL FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 55399032) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTING DEFT AMETEK, INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 1 AND JT THORPE AND SON INC. IN THE PLACE OF DOE DESIGNATION NO. 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 55399032) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUNT, GEORGE ARTHUR AS TO DEFENDANT AC AND S, INC. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ALFA LAVAL, INC. ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC. ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD. ASTRA FLOORING BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. CARRIER CORPORATION CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. CRANE CO. CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY ELLIOTT COMPANY FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION FLOWSERVE US INC. FMC CORPORATION FRASER-EDWARDS COMPANY FRASER'S BOILER SERVICE, INC. FRYER KNOWLES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FRYER KNOWLES, INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. IMO INDUSTRIES INC. INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY J AND H MARINE & INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING COMPANY JOHN CRANE INC. M. SLAYEN & ASSOCIATES, INC. METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS CORPORATION PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO SACOMO SIERRA PLANT PRODUCTS & SUPPLY CO. QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC. QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION SB DECKING, INC. SEPCO CORPORATION SYD CARPENTER, MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC. THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION WALDRON, DUFFY, INC. FIRST DOE THROUGH ONE THOUSANDTH DOE, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-16-2015 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less