This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 01:07:12 (UTC).

GEORGANN CRANE VS. AT & T MOBILITY LLC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 GEORGANN CRANE filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against AT T MOBILITY LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE TONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6215

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE TONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRANE, GEORGANN

Banning, CA 92220

Defendant

AT & T MOBILITY LLC 1 POWELL ST. SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $721.00 FILED BY CRANE, GEORGANN AS TO DEFENDANT AT & T MOBILITY LLC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR DEC-28-2022 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVICE FEE $25 SERVED NOV-18-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT AT & T MOBILITY LLC

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT AT & T MOBILITY LLC

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR MICHELLE GARAY FILED BY DEFENDANT AT & T MOBILITY LLC

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF DEC-28-2022 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT TO FEB-10-2023 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 506; Judge Name: MICHELLE TONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM Off Calendar Dec-16-2022 Continued To Feb-10-23 At 10:00 A.M. In Dept 506; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 506; Judge Name: MICHELLE TONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF DEC-28-2022 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT TO FEB-10-2023 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRAIL DEFENDANT**APPROVED**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR MICHELLE GARAY FILED BY DEFENDANT AT & T MOBILITY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialPayment: REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING; Amount: $10; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W6322C15S001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT AT & T MOBILITY LLC; Fee: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVICE FEE $25 SERVED NOV-18-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT AT & T MOBILITY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialPayment: SMALL CLAIMS <= 1500; Amount: $30; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W0522A27S004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $721.00 FILED BY CRANE, GEORGANN AS TO DEFENDANT AT & T MOBILITY LLC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR DEC-28-2022 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506; Fee: $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant