This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:12:07 (UTC).

GENE JACKSON VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2007 GENE JACKSON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4020

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

TRANE US INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

VIAD CORP, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ALLEGED SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GRISCOM-RUSSELL COMPANY

VIAD CORP.

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

EL CAJON AUTO PARTS, INC.

NAVISTAR, INC., F/K/A INTERNATIONAL TRUCK & ENGINE CORPORATION

SCANDURA, INC.

AMERICAN TRACTOR EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

TAYLOR HAYES, INC.

LIPE AUTOMATION CORPORATION, A DISSOLVED CORPORATION

CHRYSLER LLC FKA DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

HAM BROS. CONSTRUCTION, INC.

LIPE AUTOMATION CORP.

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

LYMAN, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119, 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94604

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

DAVIS, WHITNEY A

Attorney at CHARTER DAVIS, LLP

1730 I Street, Suite 240, P.O. Box 15408

Sacramento, CA 95851

ROSENFELD, MARIA S.

Attorney at JACOBSON MARKHAM, LLP

8880 Cal Center Dr., Ste 100

Sacramento, CA 95826

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

REYNOLDS, RICHARD LEROY

Attorney at BENNETT, SAMUELSEN, REYNOLDS & ALLARD

1301 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 300

Alameda, CA 94501-1084

Other Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KEELE, CHRISTOPHER A.

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

PFALZER, THOMAS E

Attorney at MCNAMARA, DODGE, NEY, BEATTY, SLATTERY, PFALZER, BORGES & BROTHERS LLP

1211 Newell Avenue, P.O. Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

NELSON, EVAN CRAIG

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

ELAM, III, HENRY LARRY

Attorney at THE VENARDI ELAM FIRM, LLP

2033 N. Main St.,, Ste 750-Two Ygnacio Ctr.

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

WASSERMAN, STEVEN DAVID

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETER, MORAN &. ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Stuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT GROUPS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT GROUPS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 19258415) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT GROUP IMPROPERLY SUED AS FMC CORPORATION

Answer of El Cajon Auto Parts, Inc., a dissolved California corporation

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19269278) FILED BY DEFENDANT EL CAJON AUTO PARTS, INC. A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT TRANE US INC. fka AMERICAN STANDARD INC.???S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF???S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19359082) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRANE US INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC. (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22127305) AS TO DEFENDANT HEICO HOLDING, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to Ford Motor Company

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS, FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 25696911) AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Defendant Bucyrus International, Inc.?s Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 25852818) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Defendant Bucyrus International, Inc.?s Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication

DEFENDANT BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 25852818) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT VIAD CORP ? PART 7 OF 12

VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT VIAD CORP PART 7 OF 12 (TRANSACTION ID # 25860253) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIAD CORP, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ALLEGED SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GRISCOM-RUSSELL COMPANY

VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT VIAD CORP ? PART 12 OF 12

VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT VIAD CORP PART 12 OF 12 (TRANSACTION ID # 25860253) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIAD CORP, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ALLEGED SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GRISCOM-RUSSELL COMPANY

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON, GENE AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-20-2007 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:335.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Defendant Ford Motor Companys Answer to Complaint for Damages

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14118916) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 20083574) AS TO DEFENDANT HAM BROS. CONSTRUCTION, INC.

LIPE AUTOMATION ANSWER TO GENE JACKSON COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20323002) FILED BY DEFENDANT LIPE AUTOMATION CORPORATION, A DISSOLVED CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF BORG-WARNER CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 25817591) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT VIAD CORP ? PART 6 OF 12

VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT VIAD CORP PART 6 OF 12 (TRANSACTION ID # 25860253) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIAD CORP, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ALLEGED SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GRISCOM-RUSSELL COMPANY

VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT VIAD CORP ? PART 10 OF 12

VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT VIAD CORP PART 10 OF 12 (TRANSACTION ID # 25860253) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIAD CORP, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ALLEGED SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GRISCOM-RUSSELL COMPANY

Request for Dismissal without prejudice AS TO COMPLT as to defendant Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC only

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27361157) AS TO DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 58003121) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON, GENE AS TO DEFENDANT EL CAJON AUTO PARTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-02-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ATTY. JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-04-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-02-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, SHAMIKA K. BAINS. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-07-2014 TO SEP-04-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-07-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERRI L. JACKSON; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-05-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ATTORNEY JAMES NEVIN. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-04-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON, CLERK: D. LOK, MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-06-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-04-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, OREN NOAH. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • CONTINUED ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-25-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-06-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14118916) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14118916) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • EATON ELECTRICAL INC.S OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEM AND OR COMMISSIONER ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 14102339) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14102339) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLINATION OF STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14005921) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14005921) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13925740) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON, GENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON, GENE AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-20-2007 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less