This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/28/2019 at 11:36:56 (UTC).

GATESMAN, INC. VS. CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by GATESMAN, INC against CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4300

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GATESMAN, INC.

Defendants

CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC. , A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA INVO COCONUT WATER DBA INVO COCONUT WATER, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC

 

Court Documents

General Denial

GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 61845250) FILED BY DEFENDANT CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GATESMAN, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC. , A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA INVO COCONUT WATER DBA INVO COCONUT WATER, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR FEB-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUL-18-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-05-2019 CONTINUED TO MAR-19-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING MAR-19-2019 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE [CONDITIONAL - DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED NO LATER THAN JAN-01-2019] (TRANSACTION ID # 62149853) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GATESMAN, INC.

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033028), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GATESMAN, INC. SERVED FEB-22-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-22-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC. , A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA INVO COCONUT WATER DBA INVO COCONUT WATER, INC.

Proof of Electronic Service

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (FOR GENERAL DENIAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 61845250) FILED BY DEFENDANT CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918403F005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1518213F036

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING MAR-19-2019 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-19-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-05-2019 CONTINUED TO MAR-19-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR FEB-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUL-18-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE [CONDITIONAL - DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED NO LATER THAN JAN-01-2019] (TRANSACTION ID # 62149853) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GATESMAN, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (FOR GENERAL DENIAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 61845250) FILED BY DEFENDANT CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 61845250) FILED BY DEFENDANT CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033028), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GATESMAN, INC. SERVED FEB-22-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-22-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC. , A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA INVO COCONUT WATER DBA INVO COCONUT WATER, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GATESMAN, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT CREATIVE FOOD CONCEPTS, INC. , A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA INVO COCONUT WATER DBA INVO COCONUT WATER, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.