This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 12:05:05 (UTC).

GARY ROSENCRANS ET AL VS. RAHIM MOUKHLIS ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 GARY ROSENCRANS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAHIM MOUKHLIS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4264

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSENCRANS, GARY

ROSENCRANS, JOYCE

GILBERT, ANNA S. (FROM CASE CGC-18-564265)

OBER, DENNIS (FROM CASE CGC-18-564267)

OBER, DEBRA (FROM CASE CGC-18-564267)

Defendants

DOES ONE THROUGH ONE HUNDRED, INCLUSIVE

EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC

MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES

KOSTALI, EL MEHDI

MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES (FROM CASES CGC-18-564265 AND CGC-18-564267)

EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC (FROM CASES CGC-18- 564265 AND CGC-18-564267)

DOES ONE THROUGH ONE HUNDRED (FROM CASES CGC-18- 564265 AND CGC-18-564267)

KOSTALI, EL MEHDI (FROM CASES CGC-18-564265 AND CGC-18-564267)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLY, CONOR

Attorney at WALKUP MELODIA KELLY SCHOENBERGER

650 California St. 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941082615

Defendant Attorney

DAWSON, MARK L

Attorney at NORTON & MELNIK, APC

500 La Gonda Way, Suite 295

Danville, CA 94526

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion t

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1048(A) (TRANSACTION ID # 62327246) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62345976) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61742989), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE SERVED FEB-23-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC

Notice of Related Case

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 61694510) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE

Declaration of Conor M. Kelly In Support of Motion to Consolidate Rela

DECLARATION OF CONOR M. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1048(A) (TRANSACTION ID # 62327246) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62198022) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62515158) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

Defendants Rahim Moukhlis dba Excel Sedan Services, El Mehdi Kostali a

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035402) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC KOSTALI, EL MEHDI

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF CONSOLIDATION OR FOR TRIAL SETTING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100044198) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC KOSTALI, EL MEHDI JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100048092) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC KOSTALI, EL MEHDI JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Notice of Motion and Motion to Consolidate Related Actions Pursuant to

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-18-564267, CGC-18-564265 WITH CASE CGC-18-564264 (TRANSACTION ID # 62327246) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE HEARING SET FOR SEP-07-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040571) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC KOSTALI, EL MEHDI JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-18-564267, CGC-18-564265 WITH CASE CGC-18-564264, ORDER

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-29-2018 CONTINUED TO OCT-17-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE AS TO DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC KOSTALI, EL MEHDI DOES ONE THROUGH ONE HUNDRED, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-10-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-17-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : Y0118813R015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : Y0118813M014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W0118525J006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4918420J025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1350; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4918420F024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1518213F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-10-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-17-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62515158) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • * * * PARTIES/ATTORNEYS FROM CONSOLIDATED CASES CGC-18-564265 AND CGC-18-564267 ADDED TO LEAD CASE CGC-18-564264 FOR MAILING OF COURT NOTICES. * * *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100048092) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC KOSTALI, EL MEHDI JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62198022) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF CONSOLIDATION OR FOR TRIAL SETTING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040571) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC KOSTALI, EL MEHDI JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 62064549) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100035402) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035402) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC KOSTALI, EL MEHDI (Fee:$1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61742989), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE SERVED FEB-23-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 61694510) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSENCRANS, GARY ROSENCRANS, JOYCE AS TO DEFENDANT MOUKHLIS, RAHIM D/B/A EXCEL SEDAN SERVICES EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC KOSTALI, EL MEHDI DOES ONE THROUGH ONE HUNDRED, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.