This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 05:06:51 (UTC).

FROILAN GALVAN VS. XEBAT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2013 FROILAN GALVAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against XEBAT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN K. STEWART, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II and CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7927

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN K. STEWART

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALVAN, FROILAN

Defendants

XEBAT CORPORATION

XEBAT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A BOCCE CAFE

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LADVA, ASHWIN V.

Attorney at LADVA LAW FIRM

530 Jackson Street,, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorneys

VELLECA KEITH M

VELLECA, KEITH M

One Market Street, Spear Tower, Ste. 3600

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-18-2014 CONTINUED TO JAN-27-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT. PLEASE SUBMIT FORM OF JUDGMENT TO DEPARTMENT 302. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-27-2015 CONTINUED TO APR-07-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. *** NOTE: A PROPOSED JUDGMENT WAS REJECTED ON DEC-09-2014. *** NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-09-2015 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT. *** NOTE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: AN ORDER AND A JUDGMENT ARE TWO DIFFERENT DOCUMENTS. *** APR-07-2015 CRC 3.1385 OSC IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-09-2015 CONTINUED TO JUL-21-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE JUDGMENT. THE JUN-09-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Plaintiffs Stipulation for Judgment

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57406859) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT XEBAT CORPORATION

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-29-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL. THE JUL-21-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-29-2015 CONTINUED TO NOV-24-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT XEBAT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A BOCCE CAFE $10,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $1,935.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $80.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $12,015.00, SEE SCANNED DOC

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT XEBAT CORPORATION (Fee:450.00)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-13-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-12-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-19-2013 IS CONTINUED TO JAN-07-2014 AT 01:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 525, FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSION, WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MARK PETERS. (4.0)

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-13-2014 - CASE SETTLED WITH SETTLEMENT MANAGER, PANG LY, IN DEPT. 603. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON NOV-18-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT RE: OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN

PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 15019129) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN

Plaintiffs Statement Regarding Order to Show Cause

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 56973029) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-24-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2014
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1714B07M012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113221F053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W0813111F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-24-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT XEBAT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A BOCCE CAFE $10,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $1,935.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $80.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $12,015.00, SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-29-2015 CONTINUED TO NOV-24-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 57916789) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-29-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL. THE JUL-21-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57406859) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT XEBAT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-09-2015 CONTINUED TO JUL-21-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE JUDGMENT. THE JUN-09-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-19-2013 IS CONTINUED TO JAN-07-2014 AT 01:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 525, FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSION, WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MARK PETERS. (4.0)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-19-2013 AT 01:00 PM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MARK PETERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • REVIEW FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-13-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-12-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT XEBAT CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT XEBAT CORPORATION (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN SERVED JAN-24-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT XEBAT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A BOCCE CAFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALVAN, FROILAN AS TO DEFENDANT XEBAT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A BOCCE CAFE DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-12-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-12-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-28-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less