This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 06:57:52 (UTC).

FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED VS. NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L P , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3271

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC

NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC DBA AT&T MOBILITY

Cross Plaintiff

NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC DBA AT&T MOBILITY, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY HOWARD

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

235 Pine St.

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BOLANOS, RAYMOND PAUL

Attorney at AT&T LEGAL DEPARTMENT

430 Bush Street

San Francisco, CA 94108

KOEGEL, THOMAS FRANCIS

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

SULLIVAN, DOUGLAS WARREN

Attorney at DOUGLAS W. SULLIVAN LAW OFFICE

61672 Hosmer Lake Dr.

Bend, OR 97702

 

Court Documents

FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P.?S VERIFIED ANSWER TO NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS P

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66910013) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT NEW CINGUL

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66822050) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC DBA AT&T MOBILITY, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66822050) FILED BY DEFENDANT NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC DBA AT&T MOBILITY

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 66738841) TO PLAINTIFF FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 66738841) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66738841) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-01-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-31-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-08-2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66910013) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type : NO FEE ; Receipt Number : W2221804F027

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2221804F026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66822050) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC DBA AT&T MOBILITY, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66822050) FILED BY DEFENDANT NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC DBA AT&T MOBILITY (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 66738841) TO PLAINTIFF FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : H2521728F030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 66738841) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66738841) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRIEDMAN PROPERTIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-01-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-31-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-08-2021 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Cingular Wireless Pcs, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOEGEL THOMAS FRANCIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond P. Bolanos