This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 05:12:25 (UTC).

FRANKLIN DELANO SCHWAB VS. EPE, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2013 FRANKLIN DELANO SCHWAB filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EPE, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6278

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHWAB, FRANKLIN DELANO

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

EPE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARRESHTEHDARY, AMIR S

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorney

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive,, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 54955372) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC.

Notice of Defendant EPE, Inc.s Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54955372) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAR-06-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:370.00)

Defendant EPE, Inc.s Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to EPE, Inc.s Demurrer

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO EPE, INC.S DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 55236469) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC.

PLAINTIFFa??S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EPE, INC.a??S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFa??S COMPLAINT

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EPE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55217286) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHWAB, FRANKLIN DELANO

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHWAB, FRANKLIN DELANO ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 HOURS

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant EPE, Inc.s Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT EPE, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54955372) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC.

Letter regarding payment of court reporter fee

COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 54955372) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC. (Fee:30.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHWAB, FRANKLIN DELANO

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHWAB, FRANKLIN DELANO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-15-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-15-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE JUN-04-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHWAB, FRANKLIN DELANO ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 HOURS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION, 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. DEFENDANT EPE, INC'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS OFF-CALENDAR PER THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT, NOT REPORTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-23-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-04-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR APR-07-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO EPE, INC.S DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 55236469) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EPE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55217286) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHWAB, FRANKLIN DELANO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT EPE, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55006887) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT CONTINUED FROM MAR-06-2014 TO LAW AND MOTION AT APR-07-2014, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 302 PER MOVING PARTY. (D302)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54980060), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHWAB, FRANKLIN DELANO SERVED JAN-08-2014, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EPE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 54955372) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC. (Fee:30.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 54955372) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT EPE, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54955372) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT (TRANSACTION ID # 54955372) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54955372) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPE, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAR-06-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHWAB, FRANKLIN DELANO AS TO DEFENDANT EPE, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-23-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-18-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-01-2014 (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less