This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 21:34:26 (UTC).

FRANK RICCO VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2009 FRANK RICCO filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, PETER J. BUSCH and JAMES J. MCBRIDE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5199

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

PETER J. BUSCH

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

 

Party Details

Defendants

OAKFABCO, INC.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, G

VIKING NOPRTHWEST COMPANY

CLEAVER-BROOKS, A DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC.

RILEY POWER INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALTERNATE ENTITY OF BABCOCK BORSIG POWER, INC.; UNION BOILER COMPANY, UNION IRON WORKS, INC.; DB RILEY INC.; RILEY STOKER CORPORATION; BADENHAUSEN; UNION IRON WORKS; UNION IRON WORKS OF SPOKANE, WA

VIKING AUTOMATIC SPRINKLER COMPANY DBA VIKING NORTHWEST COMPANY

GRINNELL LLC

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

TEXTRON INC.

TRANE U.S., INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TRANE U.S., INC., FORMERLY KNOWN AS AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

BETTER-BILT SCAFFOLDS, INC.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

PERINI CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

DURO DYNE CORPORATION

51 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

GOETZ, ANDY J.

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

Other Attorneys

BARRY, NELSON CLYDE

Attorney at BISHOP, BARRY, DRATH

2000 Powell Street, Ste 1425

Emeryville, CA 94608

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP; ATTORNEYS AT LAW

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

VOGL, DAVID ROBERT

Attorney at VOGL AND MEREDITH

456 Montgomery St., 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

AMES, RICHARD

Attorney at CARROL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH LLP

44 Montgomery Street, Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive, Ste 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

WILLIAMS, LISA A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery Street, Sixth Flr

San Francisco, CA 94105

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive,, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

DIESTEL, RICHARD STEPHEN

Attorney at BLEDSOE, CATHCART, DIESTEL, PEDERSEN & TREPPA, LLP

601 California St. 16Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94108

25 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ORDER TO LIFT STAY OR DISMISS ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.'S OPPOS TO PLTF'S MTN FOR ORDER TO LIFT STAY OR DISMISS ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS (TRANSACTION ID # 31922904)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 26844168) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

DECLARATION OF MARC D. CLEAVINGER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO: (1) LIFT DECEMBER 9, 2009, ORDER TO STAY OR DISMISS MATTER ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CON

DECLARATION OF MARC D. CLEAVINGER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO: (1) LIFT DECEMBER 9, 2009, ORDER TO STAY OR DISMISS MATTER ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS; AND (2) REINSTATE THIS CALIFORNIA MATTER TO THE CIVIL ACTIVE DOCKET (TRANSACTION ID # 31654008) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.?S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS MATTER ON THE GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS MATTER ON THE GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS (TRANSACTION ID # 27917848) FILED BY DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. FKA VOLKSWAGEN OF AMERICA, INC.

PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC.?S UNTIMELY AND UNAUTHORIZED SO-CALLED ?JOINDER? TO DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.?S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ON THE GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC'S UNTIMELY AND UNAUTHORIZED SO-CALLED JOINDER TO DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC'S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ON THE GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS (TRANSACTION ID # 28209381) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RICCO, FRANK

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 26819776) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.?S MOTION TO DISMISS MATTER ON THE GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 32737686) FILED BY DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. FKA VOLKSWAGEN OF AMERICA, INC.

PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.?S UNTIMELY AND UNAUTHORIZED SO-CALLED ?JOINDER? TO DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.?S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ON THE GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC'S UNTIMELY AND UNAUTHORIZED SO-CALLED JOINDER TO DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC'S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ON THE GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS (TRANSACTION ID # 28209381) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RICCO, FRANK

Def. CHAMPION INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, INC.s Demand for Trial by Jury and Estimate of Length of Trial.

DEMAND FOR JURY / DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 25609768) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHAMPION INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

202 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2010
  • DocketPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $370; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1210A20F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1410722M010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R0810721M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1410719M012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1210716M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : B5210715M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • DocketPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $370; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4910714F014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5210709M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1210601M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • DocketPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $370; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R0810506F001

    Read MoreRead Less
343 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY / DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 25609842) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25609842) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE / OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 25609768) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHAMPION INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY / DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 25609768) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHAMPION INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25609768) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHAMPION INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25519729) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC. (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25463825) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF RICCO, FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RICCO, FRANK AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, G DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-15-2010 (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIKING NORTHWEST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Viking Automatic Sprinkler Company is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OAKFABCO, INC. is a litigant