This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 18:19:17 (UTC).

Florence Poirier Zouai Vs. Salim Zouai

Case Summary

On 05/08/2001 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Florence Poirier Zouai against Salim Zouai in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1494

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2001

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Zouai, Florence Poirier (pp)

Respondent

Zouai, Salim

Minors

Zouai, Manon

Zouai, Laureen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2003
  • CERTIFICATION (Fee:18.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • JUDGMENT - MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 02/11/02 - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FILED BY PETITIONER ZOUAI, FLORENCE POIRIER (PP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT -DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION FILED BY PETITIONER ZOUAI, FLORENCE POIRIER (PP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION, PRELIMINARY AND FINAL FILED BY RESPONDENT ZOUAI, SALIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION, PRELIMINARY AND FINAL FILED BY PETITIONER ZOUAI, FLORENCE POIRIER (PP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2002
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR DEFAULT HEARING ON MAR-20-2002 OFF CALENDAR - DROPPED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2002
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR DEFAULT HEARING HEARING SET FOR MAR-20-2002 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2001
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECK LIST 1, DECL FOR DEFAULT, PRELIMINARY DECL OF DISCLOSURE, PROPERTY DECLARATION (PETITIONER'S), INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION, REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT, NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2001
  • AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2001
  • SUMMONS FILED (ON SECOND AMENDED PETITION-NO P.O.S. ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED (IN FIRST AMENDED PETITION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2001
  • AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2001
  • SUMMONS FILED (NO P.O.S. ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2001
  • PETITION-DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less