This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 11:52:42 (UTC).

JOHN TROTTER, TRUSTEE OF THE PG&E FIRE VICTIM TRUST V. WILLIAMS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2017 JOHN TROTTER, TRUSTEE OF THE PG E FIRE VICTIM TRUST filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against WILLIAMS,. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, SAMUEL K. FENG, ANDREW Y.S. CHENG, ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO, TERI L. JACKSON, GARRETT L. WONG and CURTIS KARNOW. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2591

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

SAMUEL K. FENG

ANDREW Y.S. CHENG

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

CURTIS KARNOW

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PG&E CORPORATION AND PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

LENTINE, JEFFREY (CGC-17-562553)

Defendants and Others

WILLIAMS, GEISHA J.

MILLER, FORREST E

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY - NOMINAL DEFENDANT

CHEW, LEWIS

MESERVE, RICHARD A

PG&E CORPORATION - NOMINAL DEFENDANT

KELLY, RICHARD C.

UTILITY - NOMINAL DEFENDANT

WILLIAMS, BARRY LAWSON

MULLINS, ERIC D.

DOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE

HERRINGER, MARYELLEN C.

KIMMEL, ROGER H.

RAMBO, BARBARA L.

FOWLER, FRED J.

EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F

PARRA, ROSENDO G.

Others and Defendants

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY - NOMINAL DEFENDANT

PG&E CORPORATION - NOMINAL DEFENDANT

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBBINS, BRIAN J

Attorney at ROBBINS LLP

5040 Shoreham Place

San Diego, CA 92122

STEPHENS, CONRAD BRANDON

Attorney at STEPHENS & STEPHENS LLP

505 S Mcclelland St

Santa Maria, CA 93454

PITRE, FRANK MARIO

Attorney at COTCHETT, PITRE & MCCARTHY, LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Ste. 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant and Other Attorneys

YOUNGWOOD, JONATHAN K.

Attorney at SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

WEIR, CHARLES E.

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

SCHOLES, STEVEN S.

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY

444 W. Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

BLAKE, STEPHEN P.

Attorney at SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

GOLDIN, NICHOLAS S.

Attorney at SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

HENNESSY, SEAN M.

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

KREISSMAN, JAMES G.

Attorney at SIMPSON THACHER & BARLETT LLP

2475 Hanover St

Palo Alto, CA 94304

BRANDT, JAMES E.

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 100224834

REISS, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 100

Los Angeles, CA 900711560

Other Attorneys

CAMPORA, STEVEN M

Attorney at DREYER BABICH BUCCOLA WOOD CAMPORA LLP

20 Bicentennial Circle

Sacramento, CA 95826

SWOPE, KARIN B.

Attorney at COTCHETT, PITRE & MCCARTHY, LLP

7511 Greenwood Avenue N, Suite 4057

Seattle, WA 98103

DEGHETALDI, DARIO BRUCE

Attorney at COREY, LUZAICH, DE GHETALDI & RIDDLE LLP

700 El Camino Real, P.O. Box 669

Millbrae, CA 940300669

BAGHDADI, KHALDOUN A

Attorney at WALKUP, MELODIA, KELLY & SCHOENBERGER; A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941082615

BOTTINI JR, FRANCIS A

Attorney at BOTTINI & BOTTINI, INC.

7817 Ivanhoe Avenue, Suite 102

La Jolla, CA 92037

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE RE:DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 68768616)

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68768616)

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY PAUL MICHAEL GERAGHTY HELMS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JAN-25-2023

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY CAITLYN M CAMPBELL TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JAN-25-2023

MINUTES FOR FEB-24-2022 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR FEB-24-2022 9:00 AM

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JAMES E. BRANDT TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY NOV-23-2022

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JAMES E. BRANDT TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY NOV-23-2022

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY STEVEN S. SCHOLES TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY NOV-23-2022

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY STEVEN S. SCHOLES TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY NOV-23-2022

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE (TRANSACTION ID # 67821695) FILED BY OTHER LAPORTE, ELIZABETH D. (SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER)

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE (TRANSACTION ID # 67821695) FILED BY OTHER LAPORTE, ELIZABETH D. (SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER)

MINUTES FOR APR-21-2022 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR APR-21-2022 9:00 AM

ORDER & JOINT STIPULATION STAYING CASE IN LIGHT OF ANTICIPATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (TRANSACTION ID #67676606)

ORDER & JOINT STIPULATION STAYING CASE IN LIGHT OF ANTICIPATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (TRANSACTION ID #67676606)

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY NATHAN BULL FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, GEISHA J. EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F HOGAN, PATRICK M. (FROM CASE # 572326) JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER P. (FROM CASE # 572326) DASSO, KE

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY NATHAN BULL FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, GEISHA J. EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F HOGAN, PATRICK M. (FROM CASE # 572326) JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER P. (FROM CASE # 572326) DASSO, KEVIN (FROM CASE # 572326) LEMLER, GREGG L. (FROM CASE # 572326) MALNIGHT, STEVE E. (FROM CASE # 572326)

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY MARA THEOPHILA FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, GEISHA J. EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F HOGAN, PATRICK M. (FROM CASE # 572326) JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER P. (FROM CASE # 572326) DASSO,

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY MARA THEOPHILA FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, GEISHA J. EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F HOGAN, PATRICK M. (FROM CASE # 572326) JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER P. (FROM CASE # 572326) DASSO, KEVIN (FROM CASE # 572326) LEMLER, GREGG L. (FROM CASE # 572326) MALNIGHT, STEVE E. (FROM CASE # 572326)

MINUTES FOR MAY-11-2022 2:00 PM

MINUTES FOR MAY-11-2022 2:00 PM

ORDER STAYING CASE (TRANSACTION ID #67611956)

ORDER STAYING CASE (TRANSACTION ID #67611956)

MINUTES FOR FEB-24-2022 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR FEB-24-2022 9:00 AM

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY MARA THEOPHILA (TRANSACTION ID #67601883) FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, GEISHA J. EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F HOGAN, PATRICK M. (FROM CASE # 572326) DASSO, KEVIN (FROM CAS

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY MARA THEOPHILA (TRANSACTION ID #67601883) FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, GEISHA J. EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F HOGAN, PATRICK M. (FROM CASE # 572326) DASSO, KEVIN (FROM CASE # 572326) LEMLER, GREGG L. (FROM CASE # 572326) MALNIGHT, STEVE E. (FROM CASE # 572326) JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY NATHAN BULL (TRANSACTION ID #67601883) FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, GEISHA J. EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F HOGAN, PATRICK M. (FROM CASE # 572326) DASSO, KEVIN (FROM CASE #

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY NATHAN BULL (TRANSACTION ID #67601883) FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, GEISHA J. EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F HOGAN, PATRICK M. (FROM CASE # 572326) DASSO, KEVIN (FROM CASE # 572326) LEMLER, GREGG L. (FROM CASE # 572326) MALNIGHT, STEVE E. (FROM CASE # 572326) JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER

492 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY PAUL MICHAEL GERAGHTY HELMS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY STEVEN S. SCHOLES; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JAMES E. BRANDT; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY NATHAN BULL; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY NICHOLAS S. GOLDIN; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY MARA THEOPHILA; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY NATHAN BULL; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY MARA THEOPHILA; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY SEAN M. HENNESSY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
877 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANTS PGE CORPORATION AND PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (TRANSACTION ID # 61477939) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION - NOMINAL DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY - NOMINAL DEFENDANT; Fee: $900.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 61480175) (TRANSACTION ID # 61480175) (TRANSACTION ID # 61480175) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILLER, FORREST E MESERVE, RICHARD A CHEW, LEWIS KIMMEL, ROGER H. PARRA, ROSENDO G. FOWLER, FRED J. KELLY, RICHARD C. SMITH, ANNE SHEN MULLINS, ERIC D. RAMBO, BARBARA L. JOHNSON, JEH C. WILLIAMS, BARRY LAWSON HERRINGER, MARYELLEN C.; Fee: $13,650

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • FinancialPayment: MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W1717C15M003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION (TRANSACTION ID # 61467947) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PG&E CORPORATION AND PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION (TRANSACTION ID # 61467947) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PG&E CORPORATION AND PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • FinancialPayment: JURY FEES; Amount: $150; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W0817B20J011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketJURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PG&E CORPORATION AND PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY; Fee: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $1450; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W0817B20F010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PG&E CORPORATION AND PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, GEISHA J. EARLEY JR., ANTHONY F STAVROPOULOS, NICKOLAS MILLER, FORREST E MESERVE, RICHARD A CHEW, LEWIS KIMMEL, ROGER H. PARRA, ROSENDO G. FOWLER, FRED J. KELLY, RICHARD C. SMITH, ANNE SHEN MULLINS, ERIC D. RAMBO, BARBARA L. JOHNSON, JEH C. WILLIAMS, BARRY LAWSON HERRINGER, MARYELLEN C. PG&E CORPORATION - NOMINAL DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY - NOMINAL DEFENDANT SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-25-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-19-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-02-2018 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE; Fee: $1450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******2591
Case Title:JOHN TROTTER, TRUSTEE OF THE PG&E FIRE VICTIM TRUST V. WILLIAMS, ET AL.
Court Date:JAN-23-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-17-562553 WITH CASE CGC-17-562591
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, January 23, 2018, Line 9, PLAINTIFF FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-17-562553 WITH CASE CGC-17-562591.Off calendar for department 302. Per the order dated January 9, 2017, the case has been singly assigned to department 304. =(302/HEK)



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS is a litigant

Latest cases where PG&E CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAGHDADI KHALDOUN