Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:50 (UTC).

FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. VS. GORDON B. LOW JR. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 FIA CARD SERVICES N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GORDON B LOW JR. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8475

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

Defendants

LOW JR., GORDON B.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD, ROBERT S

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

2180 Harvard Street Ste.160, P.O.Box 13807

Sacramento, CA 95853

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NON SERVICE RETURN FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. SERVED APR-12-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LOW JR., GORDON B.

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LOW JR., GORDON B. $12,820.95 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $12,820.95, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $554.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $1,500.00 AS TO DEFENDANT LOW JR., GORDON B.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION RE: RESEARCH TO DETERMINE MILITARY STATUS OF DEFENDANT(S); NOTICE PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B)(2) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT LOW JR., GORDON B. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:370.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2014
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LOW JR., GORDON B. $12,820.95 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $12,820.95, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: RESEARCH TO DETERMINE MILITARY STATUS OF DEFENDANT(S); NOTICE PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B)(2) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $554.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $1,500.00 AS TO DEFENDANT LOW JR., GORDON B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT LOW JR., GORDON B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. SERVED APR-12-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LOW JR., GORDON B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NON SERVICE RETURN FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT LOW JR., GORDON B. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less