Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:58 (UTC).

FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. VS. ERIC C. KJOME et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 FIA CARD SERVICES N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERIC C KJOME. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8477

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

Defendants

KJOME, ERIC C.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD, ROBERT S

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

2180 Harvard Street Ste.160, P.O.Box 13807

Sacramento, CA 95853

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-22-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-10-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE APR-22-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-10-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-22-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT KJOME, ERIC C. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:370.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. SERVED JUN-13-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KJOME, ERIC C.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-10-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-22-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-10-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE APR-22-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-22-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. SERVED JUN-13-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KJOME, ERIC C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • NON SERVICE RETURN FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT KJOME, ERIC C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • NON SERVICE RETURN FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT KJOME, ERIC C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT KJOME, ERIC C. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less