This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 13:55:24 (UTC).

FARHAD ZAGHI VS. CECELIA KENNEDY et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2013 FARHAD ZAGHI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CECELIA KENNEDY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD A. KRAMER, CYNTHIA M. LEE, TERI L. JACKSON, GARRETT L. WONG, ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CHARLES F. HAINES, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, RICHARD B. ULMER, ETHAN P. SCHULMAN, RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, JOHN K. STEWART and JEFFREY S. ROSS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2265

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

RICHARD A. KRAMER

CYNTHIA M. LEE

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

CHARLES F. HAINES

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

RICHARD B. ULMER

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

JOHN K. STEWART

JEFFREY S. ROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Cross Defendants

ZAGHI, FARHAD

ZAGHIA, FARHAD (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CUD-13-647226)

STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

AKIL, KARIM AKA SCOTT KINNEY

STEWART TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

DOES 1-10

MOALEMZADEH, SHAHRAM A/K/A SHAWN MOLEM

ZHENG, ANDREW

MOES 1 TO 25

ROES 1-20

PAGE, PETER

Defendant, Appellant and Cross Plaintiff

KENNEDY, CECELIA

Antioch, CA 94531

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KENNEDY, CECILIA

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

KENNEDY, CECELIA

Antioch, CA 94531

DOES 1 TO 10

DIRBAS, MUSA (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CUD-13-647226)

KENNEDY, DOROTHY (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CUD-13-647226)

4600 3Rd Street

San Francisco, CA 94124

KENNEDY MARKET & CHECK CASHING (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CUD-13-647226)

KENNEDY,, CECELIA (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CUD-13-647226)

4600 3Rd Street

San Francisco, CA 94124

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

KENNEDY, CECELIA

Antioch, CA 94531

MAGNA CAPITAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATIO

MOALEMZADEH, SHAHRAM A/K/A SHAWN MOLEM

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CASAS DANIEL L

SINGER, OWEN JAY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF OWEN J. SINGER

152 N. Third Street, Suite 800

San Jose, CA 95112

ZAK, JONATHAN M.

Attorney at WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK, LLP

4665 Macarthur Court, Suite 280

Newport Beach, CA 92660

JOHNSON, NANCY JEAN

Attorney at BERLINER COHEN

10 Almaden Blvd 11Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113

CASAS, DANIEL LAURENCE

Attorney at CASAS RILEY & SIMONIAN, LLP

55 North 3Rd Street

Campbell, CA 95008

ROBIN, PREMA WRIGHT

Attorney at WRIGHT,FINLAY AND ZAK,LLP

4665 Macarthur Ct #280

Newport Beach, CA 92660

GARRETT, ROBERT

Attorney at GARRETT & TULLY, P.C.

225 S. Lake Ave, Ste 1400

Pasadena, CA 91101

BRIAN, ROSALES

Attorney at HARRIS ROSALES & HARRIS

351 St Mary Street

Pleasanton, CA 94566

ATWOOD, STANFORD HOOPER

Attorney at ATWOOD & ASSOCIATES

750 University Ave. Ste. 130

Los Gatos, CA 95032

A., ZAKKARIAIE NILOUFAR

Attorney at ZAKARIAIE & ZAKARIAIE

10100 Santa Monica Blvd, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

ZAKARIAIE, JACK M.

Attorney at ZAKARIAIE & ZAKARIAIE

10100 Santa Monica Blvd.,, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

ROONEY, MICHAEL P.

Attorney at MICHAEL PATRICK ROONEY

580 California Street, 16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

NORMAN, TIFFANY

Attorney at TRN LAW ASSOCIATES

654 Sacramento Street, Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

KALUDI, IKE M.

Attorney at KALUDI INSDORF LAW GROUP

828 San Pablo Ave., Suite 109

Albany, CA 94706

HUMPHREYS, DAVID

870 Market Street, Suite 786

San Francisco, CA 94102

WALLACE, LUKE

870 Market Street, Suite 786

San Francisco, CA 94102

LONERGAN, MARK DOUGLAS

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

ROONEY, MICHAEL P.

Attorney at MICHAEL PATRICK ROONEY

580 California Street, 16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

NORMAN, TIFFANY

Attorney at TRN LAW ASSOCIATES

654 Sacramento Street, Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

KALUDI, IKE M.

Attorney at KALUDI INSDORF LAW GROUP

828 San Pablo Ave., Suite 109

Albany, CA 94706

HUMPHREYS, DAVID

870 Market Street, Suite 786

San Francisco, CA 94102

WALLACE, LUKE

870 Market Street, Suite 786

San Francisco, CA 94102

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

LONERGAN, MARK DOUGLAS

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROONEY, MICHAEL P.

Attorney at MICHAEL PATRICK ROONEY

580 California Street, 16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

NORMAN, TIFFANY

Attorney at TRN LAW ASSOCIATES

654 Sacramento Street, Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

KALUDI, IKE M.

Attorney at KALUDI INSDORF LAW GROUP

828 San Pablo Ave., Suite 109

Albany, CA 94706

HUMPHREYS, DAVID

870 Market Street, Suite 786

San Francisco, CA 94102

WALLACE, LUKE

870 Market Street, Suite 786

San Francisco, CA 94102

DISSTON, WILLIAM LEEDS

Attorney at CASALINA & DISSTON

409 13Th St 9Th Fl

Oakland, CA 94612

Other Attorneys

DEAN, ERIC D

Attorney at THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION

2955 Main Street, Second Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

BUCHANAN, ALISON P.

Attorney at HOGE, FENTON, JONES & APPEL, INC.

Sixty South Market Street, Suite 1400

San Jose, CA 951132396

 

Court Documents

Farhad Zaghis Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary JUdgment on Cecl

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CECLIA KENNEDYS CROOS COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS (TRANSACTION ID # 15195008) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ZAGHI, FARHAD HEARING SET FOR OCT-07-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:500.00)

Memorandum of points and Authorties in Support of Farhad Zaghis Motion

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORTIES IN SUPPORT OF FARHAD ZAGHIS MOTION FOR SUMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15195008) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ZAGHI, FARHAD

Declaration of Elizabeth Godbey in Support of Farhad Zaghis Motion for

DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH GODBEY IN SUPPORT OF FARHAD ZAGHIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON CECELIA KENNEDYS CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15195008) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ZAGHI, FARHAD

Declaration of Nancy J Johnson in Support of Farhad Zaghis Motion for

DECLARATION OF NANCY J JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF FARHAD ZAGHIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON KENNEDYS CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15195008) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ZAGHI, FARHAD

Declaration of Farhad Zaghi in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgm

DECLARATION OF FARHAD ZAGHI IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON KENNEDYS CROOS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15195008) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ZAGHI, FARHAD

Declaration of Andrew Zheng in Support of Farhad Zaghis Motion for Sum

DECLARATION OF ANDREW ZHENG IN SUPPORT OF FARHAD ZAGHIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON KENNEDYS CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15195008) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ZAGHI, FARHAD

Certificate of Service

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 15195008) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ZAGHI, FARHAD

Farhad Zaghis Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts and Supporting Ev

FARHAD ZAGHIS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON KENNEDY CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15196100) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD

Certificate of Service

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FARHAD ZAGHIS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON KENNEDY CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57571476) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AS IT RELATES TO CONSOLIDATED CASE# CUD-13-647226

Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Permission to file a F

POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE A FIFTH AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63096746) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT KENNEDY, CECELIA

Notice of Entry of Order on Zaghis Motion to Strike as to Third Amende

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 63072066) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD

Notice of Motion for Permission to file a Fourth Amended Cross-Complai

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE A FOURTH AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63069362) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT KENNEDY, CECELIA

Declaration of Nancy Johnson in Support of Farhad Zaghis Motion to Str

DECLARATION OF NANCY JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE AS TO KENNEDYS THIRD AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63013953) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ZAGHI, FARHAD

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion t

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 63009628) (TRANSACTION ID # 63009628) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD

Motion in Limine #3 of Defendants PLM Loan Management, Priority Postin

MOTION IN LIMINE #3 OF DEFENDANTS PLM LOAN MANAGEMENT, PRIORITY POSTING AND PUBLISHING, INC. AND ANDREW ZHENG TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE CAUSE OF ACTION ABSENT TENDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100058051) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PLM LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. PRIORITY POSTING & PUBLISHING, INC. ZHENG, ANDREW

Statement of Facts in Support of Stewart Title of California Inc.s Mot

STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA INC.S MOTIONS IN LIMINE; DECLARATION OF MAIA MDINARADZE (TRANSACTION ID # 100040614) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100020843) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC. JURY DEMANDED

543 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1519603C021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1719329M008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1719320M012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1419319F030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2019314E009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1619305R007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1619305M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1619304R015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1619304M014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219228M001

    Read MoreRead Less
782 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • MTN FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD HEARING SET FOR JUL-11-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAGHI, FARHAD AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 KENNEDY, CECELIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-20-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-19-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-05-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less