This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 11:38:21 (UTC).

Faragon Restoration, Ltd. Vs. Brian Kaufman Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Faragon Restoration, Ltd against Brian Kaufman in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4376

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Teri L. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faragon Restoration, Ltd.

Defendants

Does 1 To 20, Inclusive

Kaufman, Brian

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons as to Defendant Brian Kaufman

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD. SERVED APR-05-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT KAUFMAN, BRIAN

NOTICE OF ERRATA

NOTICE OF ERRATA (TRANSACTION ID # 61859591) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD.

NOTICE OF ACTION PENDING [LIS PENDENS]

NOTICE OF ACTION PENDING [LIS PENDENS] (TRANSACTION ID # 61737187) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-22-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62305622) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-22-2018 CONTINUED TO NOV-28-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Entry of Default against Defendant William Kaufman.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 62283313) AS TO DEFENDANT KAUFMAN, BRIAN

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-05-2019 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE NOV-28-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD. AS TO DEFENDANT KAUFMAN, BRIAN DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W0918215F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-05-2019 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE NOV-28-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-22-2018 CONTINUED TO NOV-28-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62305622) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 62283313) AS TO DEFENDANT KAUFMAN, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-22-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD. SERVED APR-05-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT KAUFMAN, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ERRATA (TRANSACTION ID # 61859591) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACTION PENDING [LIS PENDENS] (TRANSACTION ID # 61737187) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARAGON RESTORATION, LTD. AS TO DEFENDANT KAUFMAN, BRIAN DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.